e.Digital Corporation v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: e.Digital Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00785
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 73 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 5,842,170, 5,742,737, 5,491,774, re 72 Order on Motion to Dismiss. cc:USPTO (ag) (av1).
December 19, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims. It is therefore ordered that all claims for relief asserted against Apple Inc. by e.Digital Corp. herein are dismissed, with prejudice, and all counterclaims for relief against e.Digital Corp. by Apple Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/18/2013. (aef)
December 18, 2013 71 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion For Voluntary Dismissal Of Claims And Counterclaims by e.Digital Corporation. (Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
December 18, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Pending before the Court are 53 motions to amend or correct stipulated partial judgment and 54 stay pending appeal, filed by Apple, Inc. ("Apple"), Defendant in case no. 13cv785. Defendants in cases no. 12cv2899 and 13cv112 have joined in the motion to amend or correct judgment. Defendants in cases no. 12cv2698, 12cv2701, 12cv2877, 12cv2899, 13cv23, 13cv112, 13cv781, and 13cv7821 have joined in the motion to stay. The motions are set for hearing on Friday, December 20, 2013. The hearing shall be conducted telephonically at 3:00 p.m. No later than 4:00 p.m. Thursday, December 19, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a list of counsel who will be appearing telephonically, and identify the case number and party for which each counsel will be appearing. The list shall be submitted by e-mail to efile_sabraw@casd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/18/2013.(aef)(jrd)
December 13, 2013 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Apple Inc.. (O'Shea, Kevin)(aef).
December 11, 2013 68 RESPONSE re 67 Response - Other,, to e.Digital Corporation's Objections to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend filed by Apple Inc.. (O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
December 9, 2013 67 RESPONSE re 66 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiff e.Digital Corporation's Exhibit A In Support Of Objections And Objections To Portions Of Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion To Amend The Stipulated Partial Judgment To Certify The Collateral Estoppel Order; Portions Of The Declaration Of Kevin J. Oshea In Support Of Reply In Support Of Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion To Amend The Stipulated Partial Judgments To Certify The Collateral Estoppel Order For Immediate Appeal And Exhibits 4-5 Attached Thereto filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Objection to Reply)(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
December 6, 2013 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Judgment, to Certify the Collateral Estoppel Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. O'Shea, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Response to Objections to Kohm Declaration)(O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
December 6, 2013 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Submitted In Support Of Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant e.Digital Corporations Opposition To Defendants Motion To Stay Pending Appeal filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk)(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
December 6, 2013 64 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Application To Compel Production of Documents of Defendant and the parties' Application Regarding A Protective Order to be entered in matter, as made in the Joint Statement For Determination of Dispute Re: Apple's Production of Documents and Protective Order, dated 12/4/2013, is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/6/2013. (mdc)
December 6, 2013 63 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Application To Compel Production of the Huawei Settlement Agreement, as made in the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute dated 12/4/2013, is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/6/2013. (mdc)
December 2, 2013 62 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B (Part 1), # 3 Appendix B (Part 2))(Hedrick, Gabriel) (aef).
November 22, 2013 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Judgment,,,,, to Certify the Collateral Estoppel Order Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Submitted In Support Of Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant d.Digital Corporations Opposition To Apples Notice Of Motion And Motion To Amend The Stipulated Partial Judgment To Certify The Collateral Estoppel Order For Immediate Appeal filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit Z, # 28 Objection to Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm)(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
October 29, 2013 60 Briefing Schedule Re: Defendants' Motions to Amend or Correct Stipulated Partial Judgment. All Defendants intending to file motions to amend or correct stipulated partial judgments shall present their arguments by notice of joinder in the motion already filed in case no. 13cv785. To the extent there are material differences in the specific partial judgments or other material circumstances relevant to the merits of the motion, Defendants are granted leave to present them, together with any related arguments, in their respective notices of joinder. The motion to amend the stipulated partial judgment filed in case no. 13cv112, docket no. 66, is stricken. Defendants are granted leave to file a notice of joinder as provided in this order. No later than November 8, 2013, Defendants shall file their respective notices of joinder, if any, which shall not exceed five pages each. No later than November 22, 2013, Plaintiff shall file one omnibus opposition brief, if any, which shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length. No later than December 6, 2013, Defendants shall file one omnibus reply brief, if any, which shall not exceed ten pages in length. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/29/2013.(aef)(jrd)
October 29, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER Denying 55 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/29/2013. (jao)
October 23, 2013 58 RESPONSE in Support re 55 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Amend Judgment, Motion to Stay filed by Apple Inc.. (O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
October 23, 2013 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Amend Judgment, Motion to Stay Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant e.Digital Corporations Opposition To Ex Parte Motion For Order Shortening Time filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
October 22, 2013 56 DECLARATION re 55 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Amend Judgment, Motion to Stay re compliance with Local Rule 83.3 by Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Claimant Apple Inc.. (O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
October 21, 2013 55 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Amend Judgment, Motion to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Shea, Kevin) Modified on 10/22/2013-QC mailer sent re proposed orders should not be attached (aef).
October 21, 2013 54 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kevin O'Shea, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
October 21, 2013 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Judgment,,,,, to Certify the Collateral Estoppel Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kevin O'Shea, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
October 9, 2013 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 10/9/2013.(Plaintiff Attorney Anton Handal; Pamela Chalk). (Defendant Attorney Kevin O'Shea; Vera Ranieri)(aef)(jrd)
September 30, 2013 51 STIPULATED PARTIAL JUDGMENT. The Court enters this Stipulated Partial Judgment of Non-Infringement (a) in favor of Apple on e.Digital's claim for infringement of independent claims 33 and 34 and dependent claims 2, 10, 15 and 23 of the '774 patent and any other claims depending therefrom, and (b) in favor of Apple on Apple's Counterclaim Count V for non-infringement of independent claims 33 and 34 and dependent claims 2, 10, 15 and 23 of the 774 patent and any other claims depending therefrom. Apple hereby dismisses without prejudice its Counterclaim Count VI for invalidity of the 774 patent, as well as all other defenses with respect to the 774 patent, and reserves the right to re-assert all counterclaims and defenses relating to the 774 patent should e.Digital or any successor in interest accuse Apple of infringement of the 774 patent at any later point in time. This Stipulated Partial Judgment of Non-Infringement is without prejudice to the Parties rights to appeal the Court's Collateral Estoppel Order and/or any prior or future orders issued by the Court in this matter, and is without prejudice to any claim for attorneys fees and/or costs under any basis, including without limitation Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and 54(d), and 35 U.S.C. § 285. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/30/2013.(aef) (jrl).
September 30, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Partial Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/30/2013. (aef) (jrl).
September 27, 2013 49 Joint MOTION for Judgment Joint Motion For Entry Of Stipulated Partial Judgment by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Stipulated Judgment)(Chalk, Pamela) Modified on 9/30/2013-QC mailer sent to atty re proposed orders should not be attached (aef).
September 13, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion To Extend Deadlines Set Forth In The Court's May 30, 2013 Order After Case Management Conference. Plaintiff e.Digital Corporation's Ex Parte Motion is granted and applies to all of the following e.Digital Cases. The claim construction hearing shall be continued to March 18 and 19, 2014 at 9 a.m. All other orders set forth in the May 30, 2013 Order After Case Management Conference shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/13/2013.(aef)(jrd)
August 28, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER Denying 35 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/28/2013. (aef)(jrd)
August 23, 2013 46 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 7/26/2013, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2013. (Transcript includes proceedings held in the following case numbers: 12-cv-02698-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-02701-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-02825-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-02877-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-02891-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-02899-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00023-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00112-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00356-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00780-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00781-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00782-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00783-DMS-WVG, and 13-cv-00785-DMS-WVG.) (akr)
August 21, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Defendants' Motion to Apply Collateral Estoppel. The Court finds the elements of issue preclusion are met and preclude e.Digital from relitigating construction of the sole memory limitation in claims 33 and 34 of the '774 patent and claims 2 and 5 of the '108 patent. Fairness and public policy favor application of issue preclusion here. Accordingly, defendants' motion is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/21/2013. (aef)
August 6, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Pending before the Court in this patent infringement action is Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings under Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The motion is set for hearing on Friday, August 9, 2013, and is suitable for submission without oral argument pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, no appearances are required at this time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/6/2013.(aef)
August 2, 2013 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) (aef).
July 26, 2013 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2013 re 31 MOTION to Apply Collateral Estoppel regarding Claim Construction Ruling in Prior e.Digital Case filed by Apple Inc. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Anton N Handal, Gabriel G Hedrick, Pamela Chalk). (Defendant Attorney Kevin J O'Shea). (no document attached) (jak)
July 26, 2013 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gabriel G. Hedrick, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hedrick, Gabriel) (aef).
July 23, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Apply Collateral Estoppel, which is set for hearing on July 26, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Defendants in the above-captioned cases shall jointly designate one attorney to argue the motion on their behalf. Counsel may appear telephonically or in person. No later than 4:00 p.m. Thursday, July 25, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a list of counsel who will be appearing telephonically, and identify the case number and party for which each counsel will be appearing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/23/2013.(aef)
July 17, 2013 39 NOTICE OF JOINDER filed as - NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 31 MOTION to Apply Collateral Estoppel regarding Claim Construction Ruling in Prior e.Digital Case joining reply filed in case no. 3:13-cv-00356-dms-wvg (Barrows, Sarah) Modified on 7/18/2013-wrong event used (aef).
July 10, 2013 38 RESPONSE re 37 Objection, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Shea, Kevin) (aef).
July 9, 2013 37 OBJECTION by e.Digital Corporation re 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant e.Digital Corporations Objection To Apples Notice Of Motion And Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C); And, Request That The Court Strike The Motion And Take It Off Calendar; Attached Exhibits A-B. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Objection, # 2 Exhibit B to Objection)(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
July 9, 2013 36 NOTICE by e.Digital Corporation re 34 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant e.Digital Corporations Notice Re: Opposition(s) To Collateral Estoppel Motion Filed July 3, 2013 (Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
July 8, 2013 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kevin O'Shea, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(Barrows, Sarah) (aef).
July 3, 2013 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Apply Collateral Estoppel regarding Claim Construction Ruling in Prior e.Digital Case filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gabriel G. Hedrick, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Hedrick, Gabriel)(aef).
June 28, 2013 33 ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff And Counter-Defendant e.Digital Corporations Answer To Counterclaimant Apple Inc., A California Corporations Counterclaims by e.Digital Corporation.(Chalk, Pamela) (aef).
June 25, 2013 32 Featured Case SECOND ORDER regarding Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/25/2013.(aef)
June 19, 2013 31 MOTION to Apply Collateral Estoppel regarding Claim Construction Ruling in Prior e.Digital Case by Apple Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) Modified on 6/20/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed (aef).
June 19, 2013 30 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Kevin J O'Shea appearing for Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Claimant Apple Inc. (vam) (av1).
June 14, 2013 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Ullmer on behalf of Apple Inc. (Ullmer, Stephen) (aef).
June 13, 2013 28 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference is set for 10/9/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/13/2013.(aef)
June 12, 2013 27 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Apple Inc. (Barrows, Sarah) (aef).
June 12, 2013 26 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against e.Digital Corporation by Apple Inc..(Barrows, Sarah) (aef).
June 12, 2013 25 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: James J. DeCarlo appearing for Defendant Apple Inc. (vam) (av1).
June 12, 2013 24 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Douglas Weider appearing for Defendant Apple Inc. (vam) (av1).
June 12, 2013 23 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Michael A. Nicodema appearing for Defendant Apple Inc. (vam)(av1).
June 4, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Discovery. It is hereby ordered that each expert witness to file a report shall be subject to one (1) deposition per issue and per patent upon which he/she will opine. The lead attorney for Defendants shall have a maximum of one (1) day (consisting of 7 hours) for the deposition on a per issue and per patent basis. Non-lead counsel for other Defendants may have an additional two (2) hours of deposition per issue and per patent. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/4/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (av1).
May 30, 2013 21 Order After Case Management Conference. A Case Management Conference was held on 5/29/2013. On February 14, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. the Court will hold a joint telephonic conference to discuss the parties' intended presentations at the claim construction hearing, including any tutorial and testimony. The claim construction hearing will be held on March 11 and 12, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/30/2013.(Modified on 5/31/2013 to replace image; NEF regenerated to all parties in all cases.)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam)(jrd)
May 29, 2013 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Case Management Conference held on 5/29/2013. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Anton N Handal). (Defendant Attorney James DeCarlo). (no document attached) (jak)
May 21, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting In Part Ex Parte Application. For good cause shown pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), Plaintiff's unopposed ex parte application is granted. No later than Tuesday, May 28, 2013, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall file and serve their joint Rule 26 report and discovery plan. The Order Setting Initial Conference, filed May 6, 2013, stays in effect in all other respects.Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/21/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam)(jrd)
May 6, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Setting Initial Conference. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 5/29/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. This order shall also apply to related cases later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. If an order of dismissal is entered in any of the above-captioned cases or a notice of voluntary dismissal is filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), counsel for dismissed parties is excused from attending the May 29, 2013 conference call. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/6/2013.(jao)
May 1, 2013 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Barrows on behalf of Apple Inc. (Barrows, Sarah) (vam).
May 1, 2013 16 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 13cv0785-DMS-WVG. The Court directs plaintiff's counsel, on behalf of the parties, to contact the chambers of the reassigned judge to determine whether the May 17, 2013 case coordination telephone conference will go forward as previously scheduled by the Court.(no document attached) (knb)(jrl).
April 29, 2013 15 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 13CV0785-BEN-WVG. The Court directs plaintiffs counsel, on behalf of the parties, to contact the chambers of the reassigned judge to determine whether the May 17, 2013 case coordination telephone conference will go forward as previously scheduled by the Court.(no document attached) (jao)
April 29, 2013 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response by Defendant Apple Inc. to Complaint by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pamela C. Chalk)(Chalk, Pamela) (jao).
April 29, 2013 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e.Digital Corporation. Apple Inc. served. (Attachments: # 1 Cal Express Certificate of Service, # 2 Pamela Chalk Certificate of Service)(Chalk, Pamela) (jao).
April 26, 2013 12 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been vacated. The new case number is 13CV0785-JLS-WVG. The Court directs plaintiffs counsel, on behalf of the parties, to contact the chambers of the reassigned judge to determine whether the May 17, 2013 case coordination telephone conference will go forward as previously scheduled by the Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 04/26/2013.(yeb)
April 25, 2013 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 10 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Service by e.Digital re: Conference Call Information for May 17, 2013 telephonic hearing and copy of Court's Minute Order (Docket #10) by Pamela Chalk on behalf of e.Digital Corporation (Chalk, Pamela) (yeb).
April 12, 2013 10 MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby sets a telephonic Conference set for 5/17/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo.(yeb)
April 5, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Michael M. Anello, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:12-cv-02543-CAB-WVG. The new case number is 13CV0785-CAB-WVG. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/5/2013.(jao)
April 3, 2013 8 Second NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by e.Digital Corporation of case(s) Case No.3:12-cv-02543-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02571-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-2580-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-2696-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-2698-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02701-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02800- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02801-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02825- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02877- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02879- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02891- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02899-CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:12-cv-02997--CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:13-cv-00023 CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:13-cv-00112- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:13-cv-00356- CAB-WVG; Case No. 3:13-cv-00780-JAH-MDD; Case No. 3:13-cv-00781-LAB-JMA; Case No. 3:13-cv-00782-JAH-KSC; and, Case No. 3:13-cv-00783-GPC-RBB. (Chalk, Pamela) Modified on 4/4/2013 - LNO already prepared (leh).
April 2, 2013 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel G Hedrick on behalf of e.Digital Corporation (Hedrick, Gabriel) (leh).
April 2, 2013 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by e.Digital Corporation of case(s) 12cv2543; 12cv2571; 12cv2580; 12cv2696; 12cv2698; 12cv2701; 12cv2800; 12cv2801; 12cv2825; 12cv2877; 12cv2879; 12cv2891; 12cv2899; 12cv2997; 13cv23; 13cv112; 13cv356-CAB(WVG). Proposed Low Number Order prepared. (leh)
April 2, 2013 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by e.Digital Corporation. (Chalk, Pamela) (leh).
April 2, 2013 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anton N Handal on behalf of e.Digital Corporation (Handal, Anton) (leh).
April 2, 2013 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap).
April 1, 2013 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5,842,170*, *5,742,737*, *5,491,774* cc:USPTO (cxl) (cap).
April 1, 2013 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0974-5762467.), filed by e.Digital Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:13-cv-00785-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Chalk, Pamela)(notified CA of related cases on cover sheet)(cxl) (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: e.Digital Corporation v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: e.Digital Corporation
Represented By: Gabriel G Hedrick
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Pamela Chalk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Barrows
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]