Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Cusi et al

Defendant: Raymond Regno, Raquel Regno, Michael E. Cusi and CGC Brazilian Jiu Jitsu, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00935
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim; and Denying 14 Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim. For the reasons stated herein, the Court Grants Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendants' counterclaim. If they so choose, Defendants may submit an amended counterclaim within 14 days of this order. The Court Denies Plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/31/2013. (leh)
May 14, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 37 ; Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 42 . The Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's federal claims, denies Plaintiff' ;s cross motion for summary judgment, and declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Accordingly, this order disposes of all claims and concludes the litigation in the matter. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/14/2014. (vam)
May 14, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's federal claims, denies Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, and declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Accordingly, this order disposes of all claims and concludes the litigation in the matter.(vam)
May 15, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff's federal claims, denies Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, and declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Accordingly, this order disposes of all claims and concludes the litigation in the matter.(vam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Cusi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Regno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Regno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Cusi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGC Brazilian Jiu Jitsu, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]