Hopkins v. Paramo et al

Defendant: K. Seibel, Daniel Paramo, R. Olson and Anil Kaushal
Plaintiff: Randell Albert Hopkins
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01019
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to proceed IFP (Doc. 4 ) is GRANTED. The Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 balance of the fili ng fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds & #036;10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. However, Plaintiff's Motion to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. 6 ) is GRANTED and Pl aintiff has thirty (30) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/5/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 First Amended Complaint form also was mailed to Plaintiff.) (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR; per Order, a printed copy also was mailed to Secretary of CDCR.) (mdc)
August 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Extension Of Time To Amend (Re Doc. 15 ): Plaintiff's Amended Complaint must be received no later than 9/16/2013. If Plaintiff elects not to file an Amended Complaint, this case shall remain dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/12/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
May 7, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice For Failing To Pay Filing Fee Required By 28 U.S.C. Section 1914(a) And/Or Failing To Move To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a): The Court GRANTS Plaintiff forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is filed to: (a) prepay the entire $350 civil filing fee and $50 administrative fee in full; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP. If Plaintiff chooses to file a Motion to Proceed IFP which the Court later grants, the $50 administrative fee will be waived. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/7/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank IFP motion form also was mailed to Plaintiff.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hopkins v. Paramo et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Seibel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anil Kaushal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randell Albert Hopkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]