Kelley v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Dorraine R. Kelley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2013cv01125
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default and denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment. This case shall go forward. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/8/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 27, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court overrules Pla's 39 Objections to the Report. Court adopts 37 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Pla 's request for a remand to consider new evidence submitted with her motion for summary judgment and opposition to Dft's cross-motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/27/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of service of this order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/20/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorraine R. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]