Wahoo International, Inc. v. Phix Doctor, Inc. et al

Defendant: Phix Doctor, Inc. and Does 1-10
Plaintiff: Wahoo International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01395
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is Denied. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/17/2014. (srm)
May 20, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 40 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/20/2014. (srm)
June 24, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 36 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court Denies Defendant's requests for judicial notice and Sustains 39 Plaintiff's objection to Gowen's declaration. The hearing set for June 27, 2014 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2014. (srm)
July 18, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 50 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas; (2) Directing Parties to Execute a Protective Order; (3) Modifying Plaintiff's Subpoenas. Protective Order due filed with Court on 8/1/2014. The third part ies on whom the subpoenas were served must produce all documents and information responsive to these requests by August 8, 2014. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this order on the five subpoenaed entities by July 23, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/18/2014. (srm)
October 28, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within seven (7) days. The hearing set for October 31, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/28/2014. (srm)
December 2, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Denying as Moot 71 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default; and Granting Plaintiff's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. The default entered on July 18, 2014, (Dkt . No. 54 ), is vacated. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for sanctions in the amount of $9,749.50 in attorneys' fees and costs. The hearing set for December 5, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/2/2014. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahoo International, Inc. v. Phix Doctor, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phix Doctor, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wahoo International, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Michael Wirtz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]