Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Joel Tenenbaum Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee: SONY BMG MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware general partnership, WARNER BROS RECORDS INC, a Deleware Corporation, ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation, ARISTA RECORDS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company and UMG RECORDINGS INC., a Delaware corporation
Defendant - Appellant: JOEL TENENBAUM
Amicus Curiae: NASHVILLE SONGWRITERS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL, SONGWRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, BERKMAN CENTER FOR INTERNET & SOCIETY AT HARVARD LAW SCHOOL and FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION
Intervenor: UNITED STATES
 
Case Number: 10-1947
Filed: August 16, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
September 16, 2011 Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Joel Tenenbaum
October 5, 2011 Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Joel Tenenbaum

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2011 76 MANDATE issued. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
November 17, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge denying petition for panel rehearing; denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (TS)
October 31, 2011 74 PETITION for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 10/31/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
October 7, 2011 73 Featured Case ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge mooting motion to clarify and denying conditional motion to withdraw motion for remittitur or new trial in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
October 5, 2011 72 ERRATA to opinion (published) [71] filed. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (SBT)
October 4, 2011 71 RESPONSE filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052 to motion to clarify [73], motion to withdraw document [73]. Certificate of service dated 10/04/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (SRM)
September 29, 2011 70 MOTION to clarify judgment, to withdraw (conditionally) motion for remittitur or new trial filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
September 16, 2011 69 JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. The district court's finding of liability against defendant Joel Tenenbaum and in favor of plaintiffs is affirmed. The district court entry of injunctive relief is affirmed. The district court's due process damages ruling is vacated, and the district court's reduction of the jury's statutory damages award is reversed. The jury's award of damages is reinstated. The matter is remanded to the district court for consideration of plaintiff's motion for common law remittitur based on excessiveness and for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Costs are awarded to plaintiffs. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (FP)
September 16, 2011 68 Featured Case OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Published. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (FP)
August 26, 2011 67 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
July 14, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel filed filed by Jason S. Harrow in 10-1883, 10-1947 and 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
July 13, 2011 65 LETTER regarding withdrawal as counsel filed by Attorney Jason S. Harrow for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
April 4, 2011 CASE argued. Panel: Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Julie A. Ahrens for Electronic Frontier Foundation, Paul D. Clement for UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC, Charles R. Nesson for Joel Tenenbaum and Jeffrey A. Clair for US, Jason S. Harrow for Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 63 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Julie A. Ahrens arguing for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 62 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Ahrens for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file notice of appearance filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 28, 2011 60 MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Julie A. Ahrens to enter an appearance filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAA)
March 25, 2011 59 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
March 25, 2011 58 LETTER regarding Division of Argument Time filed by Attorney Charles R. Nesson for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
March 21, 2011 57 Featured Case ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge denying motion for oral argument filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052, denying motion for oral argument filed by intervenor US in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 18, 2011 56 MOTION for oral argument filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (MB)
March 10, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge granting in part motion to amend caption filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 7, 2011 54 MOTION for oral argument filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
March 7, 2011 53 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
March 7, 2011 52 CERTIFICATE of service for designation form [5531416-2] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 51 CERTIFICATE of service for designation form [5531415-2] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 50 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jason S. Harrow for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 49 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Charles R. Nesson for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 3, 2011 48 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Jason S. Harrow for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 3, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge granting motion for leave to file appearance form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 2, 2011 46 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/02/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
February 25, 2011 45 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement for Appellants/Cross-Appellees UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC in 10-1883, 10-1947, Attorney Paul D. Clement for Not Parties UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
February 25, 2011 44 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jeffrey A. Clair for Not Party US in 10-1883, Attorney Jeffrey A. Clair for Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
February 25, 2011 43 SUPPLEMENT in support of MOTION for leave to allow law student to file an appearance form [40] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
February 25, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [42] submitted by. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 23, 2011 41 CASE calendared: 04/04/2011 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 03/09/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
February 18, 2011 40 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/17/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 17, 2011 39 BRIEF tendered by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/17/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
February 17, 2011 38 MOTION for leave to allow law student to file an appearance form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
February 1, 2011 ELEVEN (11) paper copies of reply brief [5522836-2] submitted by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 1, 2011 36 REPLY/RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. Reply brief due 02/17/2011 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/08/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 31, 2011 35 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
January 28, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [5521646-2] submitted by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 26, 2011 33 REPLY/RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/02/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 26, 2011 32 BRIEF tendered by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
January 10, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [5517055-2] submitted by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 6, 2011 30 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052 in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 01/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/13/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 6, 2011 29 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Michael Barclay for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 6, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 3, 2011 27 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Electronic Frontier Foundation. Certificate of service dated 01/03/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (MB)
December 27, 2010 26 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 12/27/2010. Reply brief due 01/31/2011 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc., Warner Bros Records Inc and United States [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
December 27, 2010 25 BRIEF tendered by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 12/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
November 5, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Brief due 12/27/2010 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052] (AS)
November 4, 2010 23 MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2010. [10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052] (CRN)
November 2, 2010 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [5499367-2] submitted by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 21 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2010. Brief due 12/02/2010 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Appellant/Cross-Appellee is directed to submit nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief so that they are received by the court on or before 11/05/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 20 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 19 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 18 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
October 28, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER directing Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/10/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
October 28, 2010 JOINT APPENDIX filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc., Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1947. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 28, 2010 PLEADING tendered: Paper Copies of Appellants' Brief (9) filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 27, 2010 14 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052]--[Edited 10/28/2010 by BLC] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. RE-FILE DUE DATE NOVEMBER 1, 2010 (11/1/10) [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JSB)
October 7, 2010 13 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Jeffrey S. Bucholtz. Certificate of service dated 10/07/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JSB)
October 7, 2010 12 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement. Certificate of service dated 10/07/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
September 28, 2010 11 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052 indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947]--[Edited 09/28/2010 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAC)
September 28, 2010 10 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947]--[Edited 09/28/2010 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAC)
September 28, 2010 9 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Jeffrey Clair. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (JAC)
September 17, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 10-2052 (Consolidated started 09/17/2010) with 10-1883; extending time to file brief and appendix. Brief due 10/27/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. Appendix due 10/27/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
August 31, 2010 7 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schdule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief due 10/12/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. Appendix due 10/12/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. [10-1883, 10-1947] (AS)
August 27, 2010 6 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 08/27/2010. [10-1947] (AS)
August 27, 2010 5 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1947] (AS)
August 27, 2010 4 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883 filed by Attorney Charles Nesson. Certificate of service dated 08/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
August 24, 2010 3 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947 filed by Attorney Jeffrey Clair. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947] (JAC)
August 19, 2010 2 Featured Case ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. [10-1883, 10-1947] (AS)
August 16, 2010 1 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Docketing Statement due 08/30/2010. Transcript Report/Order form due 08/30/2010. Appearance form due 08/30/2010. [10-1947] (AS)
Search for this case: Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Joel Tenenbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: SONY BMG MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware general partnership
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: WARNER BROS RECORDS INC, a Deleware Corporation
Represented By: Eve G. Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: ARISTA RECORDS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: UMG RECORDINGS INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: JOEL TENENBAUM
Represented By: Matthew H. Feinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NASHVILLE SONGWRITERS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SONGWRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BERKMAN CENTER FOR INTERNET & SOCIETY AT HARVARD LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: Diane Cabell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Theodore Griswold Fletcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]