Estela Lebron v. Donald Rumsfeld Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: ESTELA LEBRON, for herself and as Mother and Next Friend of Jose Padilla and JOSE PADILLA
Defendant - Appellee: DONALD H. RUMSFELD, Former Secretary of Defense, CATHERINE T. HANFT, Former Commander Consolidated Brig, MELANIE A. MARR, Former Commander Consolidated Brig, LOWELL E. JACOBY, Vice Admiral, Former Director Defense Intelligence Agency, PAUL WOLFOWITZ, Former Deputy Secretary of Defense and WILLIAM HAYNES, Former General Counsel Department of Defense
Defendant: JOHN ASHCROFT, Former Attorney General, ROBERT M. GATES, Secretary of Defense in his official and individual capacities, MICHAEL H. MOBBS, Special Advisor to Undersecretary of Defense for Policy, JOHN DOES, 1-48, in their individual capacities, MACK D. KEEN, Senior Chief Consolidated Brig, CRAIG NOBLE, Dr., SANDY SEYMOUR, Technical Director Consolidated Brig and STEPHANIE L. WRIGHT, Commander Consolidated Brig
 
Case Number: 11-6480
Filed: April 13, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 113 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 11-6480 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 2:07-cv-00410-RMG. Entered on Docket Date: 01/23/2012. [998770510] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [11-6480] (DSD)
January 19, 2012 111 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. [998768497]. [11-6480] Alexander Abdo
January 12, 2012 110 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998764160]. [11-6480] Richard Klingler
January 11, 2012 109 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998763359]. [11-6480] Richard Klingler
November 4, 2011 108 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees William Haynes, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998717367]. [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
October 31, 2011 107 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998712928]. [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
October 26, 2011 106 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable J. Harvie Wilkinson, III, Diana Gribbon Motz and Allyson K. Duncan. Attorneys arguing case: Benjamin Elihu Wizner for Appellants Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Richard Douglas Klingler for Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, and Paul Wolfowitz, and Mr. David Boris Rivkin for Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld. Courtroom Deputy: Sarah Carr. [998709653] [11-6480] (SCC)
September 27, 2011 105 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998687591]. [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
September 27, 2011 104 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998687588]. [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
September 26, 2011 103 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. [998686345]. [11-6480] Jacqueline Cooper
September 23, 2011 102 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz. Counsel arguing: Richard Klingler and David B. Rivkin, Jr. Opening argument time: 20 minutes, divided equally between the attorneys [998684871] [11-6480] David Rivkin
September 2, 2011 101 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr and Paul Wolfowitz. [998670402]. [11-6480] Frank Bowman
August 29, 2011 100 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld. [998665713]. [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
August 26, 2011 99 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr and Paul Wolfowitz. Counsel arguing: Richard Klingler [998664957] [11-6480] Richard Klingler
August 26, 2011 98 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld. Counsel arguing: David B. Rivkin, Jr. [998664858] [11-6480] David Rivkin
August 24, 2011 97 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Counsel arguing: Ben Wizner [998662468] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
August 24, 2011 96 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. [998662462]. [11-6480] Alexander Abdo
August 24, 2011 95 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. [998662438]. [11-6480] Alexander Abdo
August 22, 2011 94 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 10/26/2011. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30 a.m.. [11-6480] (JLC)
August 10, 2011 93 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew G. McBride for William P. Barr, Edwin Meese, III, Michael B. Mukasey and Dick Thornburgh.[998651832] [11-6480] Andrew McBride
August 10, 2011 92 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Amici Supporting Appellee William P. Barr, Edwin Meese, III, Michael B. Mukasey and Dick Thornburgh re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g))... [11-6480] (TAF)
August 9, 2011 91 BRIEF by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/04/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998651003] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
August 9, 2011 89 Docket correction requested from Alexander Abraham Abdo for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Jonathan Marc Freiman for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Hope Richardson Metcalf for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Michael Patrick O'Connell for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Ms. Tahlia Townsend for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron and Benjamin Elihu Wizner for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron. Re: [87], reply. Access to reply has been restricted to case participants... [11-6480] (TAF)
August 8, 2011 88 NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Argument Session: 10/11 Days you are available: 10/26/11, 10/27/11, 10/28/11 [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
August 4, 2011 90 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Number of pages: [49]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 08/09/2011. [998650976] [11-6480] (TAF)
August 4, 2011 87 REPLY-ENTRY STRUCK- [48]. [11-6480]--[Edited 08/09/2011 by TAF] Benjamin Wizner
August 1, 2011 86 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 10/25/11 - 10/28/11 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 08/08/2011 [11-6480] (JLC)
July 29, 2011 85 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellee Leon E. Panetta. [998643844]. [11-6480] August Flentje
July 20, 2011 82 COURT ORDER filed [998636480] granting Motion to exceed length limitations [80] Total Words or Total Pages:10,000 Copies to all parties.. Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride, Barbara L. Herwig, Michael F. Hertz. [11-6480] (TAF)
July 20, 2011 81 Featured Case ORDER filed [998635535] granting Motion to extend filing time [80] Copies to all parties.. Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride, Barbara L. Herwig, Michael F. Hertz. [11-6480] (TAF)
July 19, 2011 84 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of US. Number of pages: [39]. Entered on Docket Date: 07/25/2011.[998639325] [11-6480] (TAF)
July 19, 2011 83 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of William P. Barr, Edwin Meese, III, Michael B. Mukasey and Dick Thornburgh. Number of pages: [37]. Entered on Docket Date: 07/21/2011.[998637392] [11-6480] (TAF)
July 19, 2011 80 MOTION by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla to extend filing time for reply brief until 8/04/11, to exceed length limitations for reply. Date and method of service: 07/19/2011 ecf [998635243] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
July 19, 2011 79 Docket correction requested from Mr. Andrew Gerald McBride for William P. Barr, Edwin Meese, III, Michael B. Mukasey and Dick Thornburgh... Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride, Barbara L. Herwig, Michael F. Hertz. [11-6480]--[Edited 07/19/2011 by TAF]. Reason for Edit: Documents Added/Replaced. (TAF)
July 19, 2011 78 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by August E. Flentje for US.[998634897] [11-6480] August Flentje
July 19, 2011 77 Featured Case ORDER filed [998634882] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Amicus brief due: Amicus brief due 08/03/2011 Copies to all parties.. Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride, Barbara L. Herwig, Michael F. Hertz. [11-6480] (TAF)
July 19, 2011 76 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Amicus Supporting Appellee US re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 07/29/2011 from August E. Flentje, Michael F. Hertz, Barbara L. Herwig and Robert Mark Loeb. Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride, Barbara L. Herwig, Michael F. Hertz. [11-6480] (TAF)
July 19, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER filed [998634859] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Amicus brief due: Amicus brief due 08/03/2011 Copies to all parties.. Mailed to: Andrew Gerald McBride. [11-6480] (TAF)
July 18, 2011 74 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by United States in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/19/2011. [998634428] [11-6480] August Flentje
July 18, 2011 73 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Former Attorneys General William P. Barr, Edwin Meese III, Michael B. Mukasey, and Dick Thornburgh as Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/19/2011. [998634427] [11-6480] William Consovoy
July 14, 2011 71 Featured Case ORDER filed [998631995] substituting party (FRAP 43) Leon E. Panetta substituted for Robert M. Gates Copies to all parties... [11-6480] (TAF)
July 13, 2011 68 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [998631140] [11-6480] Armand Derfner
July 13, 2011 67 --[Edited 07/14/2011 by TAF]. Reason for Edit: Incorrect Entry Struck Armand Derfner
July 11, 2011 72 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Leon E. Panetta. Number of pages: [17]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 07/14/2011. [998632016] [11-6480] (TAF)
July 11, 2011 70 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr and Paul Wolfowitz. Number of pages: [69]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 07/14/2011. [998631963] [11-6480] (TAF)
July 11, 2011 69 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Donald H. Rumsfeld. Number of pages: [33]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 07/14/2011. [998631947] [11-6480] (TAF)
July 11, 2011 66 BRIEF by Appellees Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr and Paul Wolfowitz in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/11/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998629148] [11-6480] Richard Klingler
July 11, 2011 65 BRIEF by Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/11/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998629039] [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
July 11, 2011 64 BRIEF by Appellee Robert M. Gates in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/11/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998629032] [11-6480] August Flentje
June 28, 2011 63 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Mr. Armand Georges Derfner, Esq. for Erwin Chemerinsky, Stephen I. Vladeck, Norman Dorsen, David Golove, Lee B. Kovarsky, Alan B. Morrison, Sheldon H. Nahmod, Alexander Reinert, Kermit Roosevelt, III, Michael E. Tigar, Carl W. Tobias and William Van Alstyne failure to file corrected brief Counsel will be ordered to show cause why default should not be referred to Standing Disciplinary panel if default is not cured within 15 days.. [11-6480] (TAF)
June 27, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER filed [998620136] granting Motion to reconsider [56], to file separate briefs (Local Rule 28(d)) [62] Copies to all parties... [11-6480] (TAF)
June 24, 2011 61 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla to notice requesting response [57], Motion to reconsider [56]. [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
June 23, 2011 60 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew M. Grossman for Donald H. Rumsfeld.[998618170] [11-6480] Andrew Grossman
June 17, 2011 57 NOTICE ISSUED to Alexander Abraham Abdo for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Jonathan Marc Freiman for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Hope Richardson Metcalf for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Michael Patrick O'Connell for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Ms. Tahlia Townsend for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron and Benjamin Elihu Wizner for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron requesting response to Motion to reconsider [56]Response due:.[998614615].. [11-6480] (BHR)
June 17, 2011 56 MOTION by Appellees Robert M. Gates, Catherine T. Hanft, William Haynes, Lowell E. Jacoby, Melanie A. Marr, Donald H. Rumsfeld and Paul Wolfowitz to reconsider order [44]. Date and method of service: 06/17/2011 ecf [998614268] [11-6480] August Flentje
June 15, 2011 54 Docket correction requested from Mr. Armand Georges Derfner, Esq. for Erwin Chemerinsky, Stephen I. Vladeck, Norman Dorsen, David Golove, Lee B. Kovarsky, Alan B. Morrison, Sheldon H. Nahmod, Alexander Reinert, Kermit Roosevelt, III, Michael E. Tigar, Carl W. Tobias and William Van Alstyne. Re: [51],amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants... [11-6480] (TAF)
June 15, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER filed [998612316] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties... [11-6480] (TAF)
June 14, 2011 59 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Erwin Chemerinsky, Norman Dorsen, David Golove, Lee B. Kovarsky, Alan B. Morrison, Sheldon H. Nahmod, Alexander Reinert, Kermit Roosevelt, III, Michael E. Tigar, Carl W. Tobias, William Van Alstyne and Stephen I. Vladeck. Number of pages: [40]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/20/2011.[998615450] [11-6480] (TAF)
June 14, 2011 55 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of James P. Cullen, Morris D. Davis, Eugene R. Fidell, Evelyn P. Foote, Don Guter, Leif H. Hendrickson, John D. Hutson, David R. Irvine, Claudia J. Kennedy, Merrill A. McPeak, Richard O'Meara, Charles Otstott, Kermit Roosevelt, III and Stephen N. Xenakis. Number of pages: [36]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/15/2011.[998612463] [11-6480] (TAF)
June 14, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER filed [998611962] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties... [11-6480] (TAF)
June 14, 2011 51 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/14/2011. [998611790] [11-6480]--[Edited 07/14/2011 by TAF]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. A Armand Derfner
June 14, 2011 50 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Armand Derfner for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998611772] [11-6480] Armand Derfner
June 14, 2011 49 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/14/2011. [998611734] [11-6480] Eric Lewis
June 13, 2011 58 CORRECTED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla correcting and superseding. Number of pages [71]. Select type of brief: opening. Entered on Docket Date: 06/20/2011. [998615439] [11-6480] (TAF)
June 13, 2011 48 Corrected BRIEF by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/13/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998610404] [11-6480] Alexander Abdo
June 13, 2011 47 Docket correction requested from Alexander Abraham Abdo for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Jonathan Marc Freiman for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Hope Richardson Metcalf for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Michael Patrick O'Connell for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Ms. Tahlia Townsend for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron and Benjamin Elihu Wizner for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron. Re: [46],opening Brief. Access to opening Brief has been restricted to case participants... [11-6480] (TAF)
June 8, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER filed [998607711] denying Motion to file separate brief (Local Rule 28(d)) [41]; denying Motion for leave to file [38] Copies to all parties.. Mailed to: Glenn S. Greene, Mary Hampton Mason,. [11-6480] (TAF)
June 7, 2011 46 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Number of pages: [71]. Sufficient: NO. Entered on Docket Date: 06/13/2011. [998610127] [11-6480] (TAF)
June 7, 2011 45 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 3. Total number of pages in all volumes: 1123. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Entered on Docket Date: 06/13/2011. [998610092] [11-6480] (TAF)
June 7, 2011 43 NOTICE OF PAPER FILING by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Type of paper document filed: appendix Date paper copies mailed, dispatched or delivered to court: 06/07/2011 Method of filing paper copies: mail [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
June 7, 2011 42 -[Edited 06/20/2011 by TAF]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. BRIEF by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998607279] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
June 7, 2011 41 MOTION by Appellee Robert M. Gates to file separate briefs (Local Rule 28(d)) [41]. Date and method of service: 06/07/2011 ecf [998606696] [11-6480] August Flentje
June 7, 2011 40 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul W. Butler for Paul Wolfowitz.[998606664] [11-6480] Paul Butler
June 2, 2011 39 NOTICE ISSUED to Alexander Abraham Abdo for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Jonathan Marc Freiman for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Hope Richardson Metcalf for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Michael Patrick O'Connell for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Ms. Tahlia Townsend for Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron, Mr. Darin Bartram for Donald H. Rumsfeld, Lee Berlinsky for Robert M. Gates, Mrs. Barbara Murcier Bowens for Robert M. Gates, Mr. Frank Gregory Bowman for William Haynes, Mr. Lee Alfred Casey for Donald H. Rumsfeld, Mary Hampton Mason for Robert M. Gates, Mr. Andrew S. Oldham for Lowell E. Jacoby, Mr. Henry L. Parr, Jr. for Lowell E. Jacoby, Mr. Edward Charles Reddington for William Haynes and Mr. David Boris Rivkin for Donald H. Rumsfeld requesting response to Motion for leave to file [38]Response due: 06/16/2011.[998604242].. [11-6480] (TAF)
June 2, 2011 38 MOTION by Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld leave to file a Separate Brief. Date and method of service: 06/02/2011 ecf [998604118] [11-6480] David Rivkin
June 1, 2011 37 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Alexander Abdo for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998602605] [11-6480] Alexander Abdo
May 27, 2011 36 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) by Appellee Robert M. Gates. Name of lead counsel: August E. Flentje. [11-6480] August Flentje
May 25, 2011 35 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Hope Richardson Metcalf for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998597961] [11-6480] Hope Metcalf
May 11, 2011 34 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by August E. Flentje for Robert M. Gates.[998588056] [11-6480] August Flentje
May 10, 2011 33 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Appellee Robert M. Gates re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 05/20/2011 from Jennifer Aldrich, Assistant U. S. Attorney, Lee Berlinsky, Barbara Murcier Bowens, Assistant U. S. Attorney, Glenn S. Greene and Mary Hampton Mason. Mailed to: Glenn S. Greene, Mary Hampton Mason. [11-6480] (TAF)
May 9, 2011 32 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Name of lead counsel: Ben Wizner. [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
May 2, 2011 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Tahlia Townsend for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998580383] [11-6480] Tahlia Townsend
April 28, 2011 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Appellee Melanie A. Marr. Related documents: [24],appearance of counsel , [29], disclosure statement [11-6480] William Coates
April 28, 2011 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Melanie A. Marr. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998578191] [11-6480] William Coates
April 28, 2011 28 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael P. O'Connell for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998578038] [11-6480] Michael O'Connell
April 28, 2011 27 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael P. O'Connell for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998578004] [11-6480]--[Edited 04/28/2011 by TAF]. Reason for Edit: Duplicate Entry Struck. Michael O'Connell
April 28, 2011 26 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: David Rivkin, Edward Charles Reddington, Glenn S. Greene, Jamil N. Jaffer, Joseph Parkwood Griffith Jr., Mary Hampton Mason. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/07/2011. Response Brief due 07/11/2011 [11-6480] (TAF)
April 28, 2011 25 Notice issued re: caption. Mailed to: Darian Ronald Bartram, David Rivkin, Edward Charles Reddington, Glenn S. Greene, Jamil N. Jaffer, Joseph Parkwood Griffith Jr., Mary Hampton Mason. . [11-6480] (TAF)
April 28, 2011 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William A. Coates for Melanie A. Marr.[998577714] [11-6480] William Coates
April 27, 2011 23 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
April 27, 2011 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David B. Rivkin for Donald H. Rumsfeld.[998577506] [11-6480] David Rivkin
April 27, 2011 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jonathan M. Freiman for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998577458] [11-6480] Jonathan Freiman
April 27, 2011 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lee A. Casey for Donald H. Rumsfeld.[998577415] [11-6480] Lee Casey
April 27, 2011 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Donald H. Rumsfeld. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998577410] [11-6480] Darin Bartram
April 27, 2011 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Darin R. Bartram for Donald H. Rumsfeld.[998577408] [11-6480] Darin Bartram
April 27, 2011 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Paul Wolfowitz. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998577322] [11-6480] Kevin Amer
April 27, 2011 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kevin R. Amer for Paul Wolfowitz.[998577316] [11-6480] Kevin Amer
April 26, 2011 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998576677] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
April 26, 2011 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Benjamin Wizner for Estela Lebron and Jose Padilla.[998576675] [11-6480] Benjamin Wizner
April 26, 2011 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard D. Klingler for Catherine T. Hanft.[998576105] [11-6480] Richard Klingler
April 26, 2011 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Henry L. Parr, Jr. for Lowell E. Jacoby.[998576055] [11-6480] Henry Parr
April 25, 2011 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Lowell E. Jacoby. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998575175] [11-6480] Wan Kim
April 25, 2011 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew S. Oldham for Lowell E. Jacoby.[998575166] [11-6480] Andrew Oldham
April 25, 2011 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kevin B. Huff for Lowell E. Jacoby.[998575160] [11-6480] Kevin Huff
April 25, 2011 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Wan J. Kim for Lowell E. Jacoby.[998575141] [11-6480] Wan Kim
April 22, 2011 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Catherine T. Hanft. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998574251] [11-6480] Jacqueline Cooper
April 22, 2011 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jacqueline G. Cooper for Catherine T. Hanft.[998574245] [11-6480] Jacqueline Cooper
April 22, 2011 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Frank Gregory Bowman for William Haynes.[998574231] [11-6480] Frank Bowman
April 22, 2011 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee William Haynes. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998574228] [11-6480] Frank Bowman
April 22, 2011 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Edward C. Reddington for William Haynes.[998574227] [11-6480] Frank Bowman
April 14, 2011 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:07-cv-00410-RMG. Mailed to: Alexander Abraham Abdo, Darian Ronald Bartram, David Rivkin, Frank Gregory Bowman, Glenn S. Greene, Email Jacqueline Gerson, Jamil N. Jaffer, Joseph Parkwood Griffith Jr., Lee Casey, Mary Hampton Mason, Matthew R. Hubbell, Tahlia Townsend, Wan Joo Kim. [11-6480] (TAF)
April 13, 2011 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:07-cv-00410-RMG. Case manager: TFischer. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/05/2011 [11-6480] (TAF)
Search for this case: Estela Lebron v. Donald Rumsfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ESTELA LEBRON, for herself and as Mother and Next Friend of Jose Padilla
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: JOSE PADILLA
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: DONALD H. RUMSFELD, Former Secretary of Defense
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: CATHERINE T. HANFT, Former Commander Consolidated Brig
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MELANIE A. MARR, Former Commander Consolidated Brig
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: LOWELL E. JACOBY, Vice Admiral, Former Director Defense Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: PAUL WOLFOWITZ, Former Deputy Secretary of Defense
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: WILLIAM HAYNES, Former General Counsel Department of Defense
Represented By: Jennifer Aldrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ASHCROFT, Former Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT M. GATES, Secretary of Defense in his official and individual capacities
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL H. MOBBS, Special Advisor to Undersecretary of Defense for Policy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-48, in their individual capacities
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK D. KEEN, Senior Chief Consolidated Brig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG NOBLE, Dr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDY SEYMOUR, Technical Director Consolidated Brig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE L. WRIGHT, Commander Consolidated Brig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]