Gallegos v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Maria L Gallegos
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv02978
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/30/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/30/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/14/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/21/13. (sgrim)
March 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reversing Disability Decision and Remanding to Commissioner. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/6/2014. (klyon, )
March 6, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Maria L. Gallegos against Michael J. Astrue re: 24 Order by Clerk on 3/6/2014. (klyon, )
October 6, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/2014.(alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria L Gallegos
Represented By: Rachael Adair Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.