Kaighn v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Kenneth Kaighn
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03027
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/15/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/15/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/30/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/26/13. (sgrim)
February 6, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The decision of the Commissioner is reversed, and the case remanded to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits to Mr. Kaighn. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/6/14. (rbjcd, )
April 22, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/22/14.(jdyne, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaighn v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kaighn
Represented By: Gail C. Harriss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]