Ruth v. Astrue

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Jamie N. Ruth
Case Number: 1:2012cv03059
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Park
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/21/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/22/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/7/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/26/13. (sgrim)
February 27, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/21/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/22/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/7/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/27/13. (sgrim)
March 17, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The decision of the Commissioner is reversed, the case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/17/14. (rbjcd, )
April 17, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA). by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/17/14. (jdyne, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie N. Ruth
Represented By: Patrick C.H. Spencer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.