Nurre v. Astrue

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Brenda R Nurre
Case Number: 1:2012cv03060
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/20/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/19/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/5/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/15/13. (sgrim)
March 31, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff was not disabled is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. On remand, the ALJ shall consider the VAs finding of disability and determine how much weight to accord it based on the particular facts of this case by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/31/14. (jhawk, )
March 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security that plaintiff was not disabled is reversed and remanded. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant. ORDERED that plaintiff BRENDA R. NURRE is AWARDED her costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 03/31/14. (jhawk, )
July 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that this award is without prejudice to the right of plaintiffs counsel to seek attorney fees under § 206(b) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), subject to the o ffset pr ovisions of the EAJA. ORDERED that if it is determined upon effectuation of this Order that plaintiff does not owe a debt that is subject to offset under the Treasury Offset Program, and the Commissioner agrees to accept the assignment, the fee awarded herein shall be made payable to plaintiffs attorney. If there is such a debt, any fee remaining after offset will be payable to plaintiff and delivered to plaintiff's attorney by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/21/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nurre v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda R Nurre
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]