Caro v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Carrie L. Caro
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03069
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to File Answer Out of Time. The Answer is accepted as timely filed on April 15, 2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/15/13.(sgrim)
May 8, 2013 18 Featured Case Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/17/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 7/17/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/1/2013 by Judge John L. Kane on 05/08/13. (jjhsl, )
March 10, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER Affirming Commissioner. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/10/2014. (klyon, )
March 10, 2014 25 Featured Case Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Michael J. Astrue against Carrie L. Caro re: 24 Order by Clerk on 3/10/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Caro v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie L. Caro
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]