Thomas v. Astrue

Plaintiff: James K. Thomas
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03096
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 10 Featured Case Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/23/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/23/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/7/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/7/13. (sgrim)
April 18, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that the November 30, 2009 decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff was not disabled is REVERSED. ORDERED that this case is remanded for an award of benefits by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/18/14. (jhawk, )
April 21, 2014 19 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the decision of Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and remanded. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff JAMES K. THOMAS and against defendant CAROLYN W. COLVIN, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. ORDERED that plaintiff JAMES K. THOMAS is AWARDED his costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 04/21/14. (jhawk, )
June 3, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation for EAJA Fees [Docket No. 22] isGRANTED. ORDERED that this award is without prejudice to the right of plaintiff's counsel to seek attorney fees under § 206(b) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), subject to the offset provisions of the EAJA. ORDERED that the EAJA attorney fee award shall be made payable to plaintiff and mailed to plaintiffs attorney pursuant to Manning v. Astrue, 510 F.3d 1246, 1251 (10th Cir. 2007). ORDERED that if it is determined upon effectuation of this Order that plaintiff does not owe a debt that is subject to offset under the Treasury Offset Program, and the Commissioner agrees to accept the assignment, the fee awarded herein shall be made payable to plaintiffs attorney. If there is such a debt, any fee remaining after offset will be payable to plaintiff and delivered to plaintiff's attorney by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/03/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thomas v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Thomas
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]