Klein v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Christof N. Klein
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03139
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/10/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/10/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/25/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/1/13. (sgrim)
March 13, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Commissioner. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/2014. (klyon, )
March 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Ordered that the conclusion of the Commissioner through the Administrative Law Judge that plaintiff was not disabled is AFFIRMED by Clerk on 03/14/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christof N. Klein
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]