Thielemier v. Astrue

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Sherry Thielemier
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2012cv03178
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/21/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/20/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/5/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/10/13. (sgrim)
April 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/21/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/20/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/5/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/11/13. (sgrim)
March 31, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff Sherry Thielemier was not disabled is AFFIRMED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/31/14. (jhawk, )
March 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Carolyn W. Colvin against Sherry Thielemier re: 22 Order by Clerk on 3/31/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thielemier v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Thielemier
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]