Sansing v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Bobby Sansing
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03195
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/24/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 7/24/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/8/2013 by Judge John L. Kane on 05/13/13. (jjhsl, )
January 28, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff was not disabled is AFFIRMED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/28/15. (kpreu)
December 7, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Judge John L. Kane on 12/07/12. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sansing v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Sansing
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]