Ramos v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Delores Ramos
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03213
Filed: December 10, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/15/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/15/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/30/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/28/13. (sgrim)
May 28, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993). By Judge John L. Kane on 5/28/13.(mnfsl, )
May 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 17 Order. By Clerk on 5/29/13. (mnfsl, )
June 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Stipulated Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $4,482.48. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/18/13.(mnfsl, )
April 2, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/2/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramos v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Ramos
Represented By: Chris R. Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]