Robertson v. Astrue

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Michael S Robertson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03217
Filed: December 10, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/5/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/4/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/19/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 5/16/13. (mnfsl, )
January 28, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and ORDER. The Commissioner of Social Security's decision is AFFIRMED. The Clerk shall enter a Judgment in accordance herewith. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/28/2014. (klyon, )
January 28, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Michael J. Astrue against Michael S Robertson re: 20 Order by Clerk on 1/28/2014. (klyon, )
January 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 1/7/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robertson v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Robertson
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]