Miller et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Interested_party: U.S. Trustee and United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
In_re: Jamileh Miller and Mark Miller
Appellant: Mark Miller and Jamileh Miller
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03279
Filed: December 17, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 9 MOTION for 20 Day Extension of Time to Submit Appellants' Opening Brief to and including February 28, 2013. In light of Appellee's opposition to the extension of time requested, appellee shall file a response to the motion on or before 2/13/13. Briefing is tolled pending receipt of the response and until further order of the Court, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/8/13. (sgrim)
September 4, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The December 4, 2012 Order and Judgment of the United States Bankruptcy Court [Docket No. 8-2 at 220, 247] are affirmed. The 21 Motion to Strike in Accordance with Rule 12(F) (Fed. R. Civ. P.) is denied as moot. This case is dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/4/13.(mnfsl, )
September 6, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 29 . by Clerk on 9/6/2013. (trlee, )
November 13, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 32 Motion for New Trial Under Rule 59 (Reopening Evidence), Rule 50(b) or Alternatively, Motion to Set-Aside Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60 (B) for Fraud, Mistake, or Inadvertence is denied. The 40 Objection to Late Response Filed by Deutshe [sic] Bank National Trust Company on October 15, 2013, and October 16, 2013 (With Motion to Strike) is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/13/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miller et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Jamileh Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Mark Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jamileh Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Susan Jean Hendrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]