Rullet et al v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Chris Rullet and Nicole Rullet
Defendant: Target Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00411
Filed: February 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 12 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Amended Complaint 13 is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/1/2013.(rpmcd)
May 24, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER Setting Second Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2013 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person, no parties permitted, initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/24/2013. (rpmcd )
September 9, 2013 28 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 27 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/9/2013. (rpmcd )
September 9, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 in all court filings as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 28 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/9/2013. (rpmcd )
January 16, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER Granting 30 Defendant Target's unopposed motion to obtain independent medical examination(s) and exchange repots after the discovery cutoff, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/16/2014.(rpmcd)
March 13, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and expenses, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/13/2014. (rpmcd)
February 25, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 28, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rullet et al v. Target Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Rullet
Represented By: William C. Marlin
Represented By: Michael T. Leinz
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Represented By: Marshall Cowles Breit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rullet
Represented By: William C. Marlin
Represented By: Michael T. Leinz
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Represented By: Marshall Cowles Breit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Marianne Laborde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]