Guinn v. Jefferson County Deputy District Attorney et al

Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
Defendant: Jefferson County Combined Courts, Davita, Jefferson County Deputy District Attorney and Jefferson County District Attorney's Office
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00693
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 9 Motion to Toll Civil Action UntilJudicial Remedies are Exhausted; denying as moot 10 Unopposed Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Objection to District Court's Order of Dismissal by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/13.(sgrim)
March 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994), and to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/19/13. (mjgsl, )
March 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 5 Order of Dismissal (mjgsl, )
April 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. ORDERED that Mr. Guinns Objection to the District Courts Order of Dismissal 7 filed on April 8, 2013, is construed as filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/15/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guinn v. Jefferson County Deputy District Attorney et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Combined Courts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Deputy District Attorney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County District Attorney's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]