Lornes the III v. Arapho Police Department, et al

Defendant: Galardo, Arapho Police Department and Denver Police Department
Plaintiff: William Lee Lornes the III
Case Number: 1:2013cv00714
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; GRANTING 15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and DENYING AS MOOT the following Motions for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; 5 , 6 , 7 , 8 , 9 , 10 , 11 , 12 , 13 , 14 , 16 , 17 , 18 , 19 , 20 and 33 , by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/23/2013(skl)
April 25, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Final Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/25/2013. (skl)
May 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/24/13. (dkals, )
March 19, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/19/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lornes the III v. Arapho Police Department, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapho Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Lornes the III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]