Donaldson v. Gupta

Plaintiff: Daquan Lamel Donaldson
Defendant: Gupta
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00802
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis;denying as moot 6 Motion for Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/14/2013.(skl)
June 20, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER dismissing action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/20/13. (dkals, )
June 20, 2013 20 Featured Case JUDGMENT pursuant to 19 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 6/20/13. (dkals, )
March 29, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficienicies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/29/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Donaldson v. Gupta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daquan Lamel Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gupta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]