Al-Muhaimin v. Berkebile et al

Defendant: Lincoln, David B. Berkebile and Eric Holder, Jr.
Plaintiff: Abdulshahid Al-Muhaimin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00865
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/04/13. (nmmsl, )
May 14, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. It is ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the failure of Plaintiff, Abdulshahid Al-Muhaimin, within the time allowed, to cure all the defici encies designated in the order to cure of April 4, 2013, and for his failure to prosecute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/14/2013. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2013 5 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 4 Order of Dismissal. it is hereby ORDERED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/14/2013. (ervsl, )
March 6, 2014 7 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Pro Se Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e), by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/6/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Al-Muhaimin v. Berkebile et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulshahid Al-Muhaimin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]