Smith et al v. USA

Plaintiff: David L. Smith and M. Julia Hook
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01156
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Action affecting property on which US has lien
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Second) Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 [# 78 ] is DENIED. Plaintiffs' (Second) Motion for a SchedulingConference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and D.C. Colo. LcivR 16.1 [ # 84 ] is DENIED as moot. Defendant's Motion to Consolidate [# 93 ] is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' Verified Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or a Preliminary Injunction, and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing [# 96 ] i s DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement [] Their Verified Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or a Preliminary Injunction, and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing [# 98 ] is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/11/2014.(klyon, )
July 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 12 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Other Equitable Relief, and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing and 13 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The parties shall submit briefing on the Motions [# 12 ,# 13 ] in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1C. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/26/2013. (klyon, )
August 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 23 Motion for Joinder; denying 24 Motion to Supplement. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/29/13.(trlee, )
November 20, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion to Delay Requirements ofFed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and granting 49 Motion for Entry of a Protective Order. The parties shall conduct a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conferencewithin thirty days of resolution of Defendant' ;s Motion to Dismiss [# 9 ], if necessary. Until the Rule 26(f)(1) conference is held,there is no deadline to make disclosures and no party is permitted to conduct discovery. Until the Rule 26(f)(1) conference is held,there is no deadline to make disclosures and no party is permitted to conduct discovery. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/20/2013.(klyon, )
February 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion for Joinder; and 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 45 Motion to Supplement; 53 Motion for Sanctions; 56 Motion to Supplement. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/6/2014.(klyon, )
March 28, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION TO DISMISS: The Plaintiffs' Objections 62 are overruled and the Court ADOPTS the Recommendation 60 that the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 9 be GRANTED. All claims are DISMISSED wit hout prejudice. The Plaintiffs are granted 14 days in which to file an amended complaint, curing the pleading deficiencies identified in this opinion. Failure to do so will result in closure of this case. The Plaintiffs' Verified Motion to Vacate the Reference of Dispositive Motions to United States Magistrate Judge 55 is DENIED. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/28/14.(msklc2, )
June 2, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion to Disqualify, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/2/2014.(trlee, )
June 30, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/30/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Julia Hook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]