Bryan v. Hickenlooper et al

Defendant: Lance Miklich, Burl McCullar, Jennifer Castner, Dave Tessier, Paula J. Frantz, Amy Cosner, Meghan Reed, Renee Jordan, Rae Timme, Larry Reed, Tony Carochi, John Hickenlooper, Peat Pierce, Matt Winden and Daril R. Proffet
Plaintiff: David Guy Bryan
Case Number: 1:2013cv01192
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/6/13. Defendants Anthony A. DeCesaro, Tim Hand, John Hickenlooper, Adrienne Jacobson, Renee Jordan, Burl McCullar, Lance Miklich, Daril R. Proffet, Rick Raemisch, Meghan Reed, Larry Reid, Rae Timme, Kelly Wasco, Matt Winden, Jennifer Castner, and Amy Cosner are dismissed. (dkals, )
September 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The court's Order dated September 20, 2013 (Doc. # 26 ) is WITHDRAWN. 2. Mr. Bryan's "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to: Order to Dismiss in Part and Draw Case" (filed September 18, 2013) (Doc. # 22 ) is DENIED as unnecessary. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 09/24/13. (alvsl)
July 9, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 46 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in its entirety. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 28 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 34 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin and for Declaratory Relief 49 is DENIED. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/14.(jdyne, )
May 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency; ORDER denied as unnecessary 4 Motion to the Clerk of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/07/2013.(skl)
December 12, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 12/12/2014. ORDERED: MOTION 63 to Compel Disclosure/Discovery Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions is DENIED AS MOOT. MOTION 70 to F urther Compel Disclosure and to Answer Interrogatories, and Request for Admissions is DENIED. The Plaintiff is given leave to serve 5 additional interrogatories and 1 additional request for production on each defendant to serve as follow up to their responses. MOTION 62 for Subpoena Duces Tecum is DENIED. MOTION 68 for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Plaintiff is GRANTED. Plaintiff is REQUIRED to file his proposed second amended complaint with the court. One the proposed second amended compla int is filed, it will be deemed as an attachment to MOTION 71 for Leave to Add Defendants to Case. The Defendants are REQURIED to file their response to the second amended complaint 10 days after they receive it. The discovery cut-off is extended until January 31, 2015 and the dispositive motion deadline is extended until February 27, 2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Hickenlooper et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Miklich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl McCullar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Castner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Tessier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula J. Frantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Cosner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Timme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Carochi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickenlooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peat Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Winden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daril R. Proffet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guy Bryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]