CUMMOCK, et al v. SOC. PEOPLE'S LIBYAN, et al Featured Case

Case Number: 1:1996cv01029
Filed: May 3, 1996
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2007 112 Featured Case ORDER. Upon consent of the parties to this litigation, the above-captioned case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE on all claims as to all plaintiffs and defendants. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE these proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 25, 2007. (lcckk1)
June 22, 2007 111 STATUS REPORT by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK, THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (td, )
June 22, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Based on the Parties' representations to the Court, the Court shall deny as moot 94 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 22, 2007. (lcckk1)
June 21, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2007. (dot, )
June 21, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: On June 20, 2007, the Court received notice of Plaintiffs' withdrawal of Motions 99 and 105 in this case. The Court notes that the only pending motion in this case is 94 . The Court requests that the Parties file a Joint Status Report by June 29, 2007, indicating whether the Parties have resolved or are in the process of resolving the issues raised in this motion before the Court addresses the legal issues involved. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 21, 2007. (lcckk1)
June 21, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc Consent 109 Motion to Hold in Abeyance Motions 99 and 105 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 21, 2007. (lcckk1)
June 20, 2007 110 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (FILED UNDER SEAL) (td, )
June 7, 2007 109 Consent MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 105 MOTION for Writ MOTION for Hearing, 99 MOTION to unseal the record before this court by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (Flowers, Jodi) Modified on 6/8/2007 (nmw, ).
June 6, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS): On May 25, 2007, the Court granted Plaintiffs' Consent request to hold in abeyance Motions 99 and 105 until June 1, 2007. The Court has not heard from the Parties as of this date (June 6, 2007). The Court orders that the Parties indicate to the Court forthwith whether they wish to extend their request to hold in abeyance Motions 99 and 105 or to otherwise notify the Court as to the status of these Motions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 6, 2007. (lcckk1)
May 25, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS) granting Plaintiffs' 108 Consent Motion to hold in abeyance Motions 99 and 105 until June 1, 2007. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 25, 2007. (lcckk1)
May 18, 2007 108 Consent MOTION re 105 MOTION for Writ MOTION for Hearing, 99 MOTION to unseal the record before this court by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (Flowers, Jodi)
April 17, 2007 107 REPLY to opposition to motion re 105 MOTION for issuance of a writ, or, in the alternative MOTION for Hearing filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (SEALED) (td, )
April 6, 2007 106 Memorandum in opposition to re 105 MOTION for Writ MOTION for Hearing filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Dabiri, Arman)
March 22, 2007 105 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 6/21/2007..... MOTION for Writ of Execution,or in the Alternative MOTION for an in Camera Status Conference by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 6/22/2007 (nmw, ).
February 2, 2007 104 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flowers, Jodi)
November 27, 2006 103 REPLY in support of re 99 MOTION to unseal the record before this court filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK; (SEALED; FIAT. Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly "Let this be filed under seal" 11/27/06) (td, )
November 27, 2006 102 REPLY in support of re 94 MOTION for penalities and costs filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (SEALED; FIAT. Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly "Let this be filed under seal" 11/27/06) (td, )
November 13, 2006 101 Memorandum in opposition to re 99 MOTION to unseal the record before this court filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH; (SEALED) (td, )
November 13, 2006 100 NOTICE Regarding Sealed Document by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Dabiri, Arman)
October 31, 2006 99 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 6/21/2007..... MOTION to unseal the record before this court by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (SEALED) (td, ) Modified on 6/22/2007 (nmw, ).
October 24, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/24/2006 Replies due by 10/27/2006. (dot, )
October 24, 2006 98 Opposition to 94 MOTION for penalities and costs filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (jf, )
October 24, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless) granting nunc pro tunc 97 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have until and including October 24, 2006, to file their response to Plaintiffs' motion for penalties and costs; Plaintiffs shall have until and including October 27, 2006, to file their reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 24, 2006. (SM)
October 20, 2006 97 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION for penalities and costs by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
October 18, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS) denying as moot 91 Motion to Enforce based on sealed docket entry 95 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 18, 2006. (lcckk1)
October 16, 2006 95 Featured Case SEALED ORDER . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/16/06. (dot, )
October 13, 2006 94 MOTION for penalities and costs by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (SEALED) (td, )
October 2, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held under seal on 10/2/2006. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
October 2, 2006 96 Featured Case SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/2/06. (dot, ) . Modified on 10/17/2006 (dot, ).
October 2, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS) granting unopposed 93 Motion for Leave to File in camera and under seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 2, 2006. (lcckk1)
September 21, 2006 93 MOTION for Leave to File under seal points and authorities in support by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order); EXHIBIT (Memorandum in support; LODGED UNDER SEAL)(td, ) Modified on 9/26/2006 (td, ).
September 21, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 92 Memorandum, was entered in error. Motion for leave to file under seal is pending.(td, )
September 21, 2006 92 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MEMORANDUM in support of motion for in camera hearing and enforcement re 91 MOTION to Enforce and for In Camera Hearing filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK,, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK,, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK,, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK; (SEALED) (td, ) Modified on 9/26/2006 (td, ).
September 20, 2006 91 MOTION to Enforce and for In Camera Hearing by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Elsner, Michael)
July 19, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/2/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
July 19, 2006 90 Featured Case ORDER: Based on oral representations of counsel to the Court, the instant case is STAYED until October 2, 2006. The status conference presently scheduled for August 31, 2006, at 10:30 a.m., is rescheduled for October 2, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 19, 2006. (lcckk1)
April 6, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS): As the Court granted both Parties extensions of time in the filing of their most recent round of briefings, the Status Conference previously scheduled for May 19, 2006, at 11:00 AM is hereby rescheduled for August 31, 2006, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 6, 2006. (lcckk1)
March 27, 2006 89 REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's Order of December 2, 2005 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Elsner, Michael)
March 21, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 88 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's Order of December 2, 2005. Plaintiffs shall have until and including March 27, 2006, to file its Reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 21, 2006. (SM)
March 13, 2006 88 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's Order of December 2, 2005 by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flowers, Jodi)
February 27, 2006 87 NOTICE for Bulk Exhibits by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI re 86 Supplemental Memorandum (Mattioni, Dante)
February 27, 2006 86 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante)
February 10, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY - PAPERLESS ORDER granting 85 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Al-Megrahi to File His Brief Pursuant to the Court's Order of January 18, 2006. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including February 27, 2006, to file his reply brief, and Plaintiffs shall have until and including March 13, 2006, to file their reply papers. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 10, 2006. (SM)
February 8, 2006 85 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief Pursuant to the Court's Order of January 18, 2006 by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante)
January 24, 2006 84 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 63 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's December 2, 2005 Order in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 of 10# 2 Exhibit A part 2 of 10# 3 Exhibit A part 3 of 10# 4 Exhibit A part 4 of 10# 5 Exhibit A part 5 of 10# 6 Exhibit A part 6 of 10# 7 Exhibit A part 7 of 10# 8 Exhibit A part 8 of 10# 9 Exhibit A part 9 of 10# 10 Exhibit A part 10 of 10)(Elsner, Michael) Modified on 1/25/2006 (nmw, ).
January 24, 2006 83 RESPONSE to 75 Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Response to Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Elsner, Michael) Modified on 1/25/2006 (nmw, ).
January 18, 2006 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY - PAPERLESS ORDER granting 82 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's Order of December 2, 2005, in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Response to Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' papers shall be filed on or before January 24, 2006; Defendant Al-Megrahi's opposition papers shall be filed on or before February 14, 2006; and Plaintiffs' reply papers shall be filed on or before February 21, 2006. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2006. (SM)
January 17, 2006 82 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law Pursuant to the Court's Order of December 2, 2005 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Response to Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elsner, Michael)
December 2, 2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/19/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
December 2, 2005 MINUTE ENTRY: Due to the additional briefing required of the Parties as set out by the Court's Order of December 2, 2005, the status hearing originally scheduled for December 9, 2005, shall be moved to May 19, 2006, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 28. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 2, 2005. (lcckk1)
December 2, 2005 81 Featured Case ORDER requiring additional briefing from both Parties related to 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Al-Megrahi; and denying in part and granting in part Plaintiffs' 76 Motion to Strike Supplemental Opposition, denying the motion to strike but allowing Plaintiffs the opportuntity to respond to the issues raised therein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 2, 2005. (lcckk1)
November 18, 2005 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arman Dabiri (Dabiri, Arman)
September 30, 2005 79 Featured Case ORDER vacating status hearing previously scheduled for October 7, 2005, and rescheduling hearing for December 9, 2005, at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 30, 2005. (lcckk1)
August 30, 2005 78 REPLY to opposition to motion re 76 - Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Flowers, Jodi)
August 22, 2005 77 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 76 Striking Defendant's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante)
August 18, 2005 76 MOTION to Strike 75 Supplemental Memorandum - Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Strike Defendant Al-Megrahi's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flowers, Jodi)
August 5, 2005 75 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Corrected Pages from Original Oppo.)(Kelly, Francis)
July 25, 2005 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that 64 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is DENIED nunc pro tunc. Defendant's Motion requests an extension until the "not unreasonably distant future." The Court finds that this request is too open-ended, and accordingly should be denied. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 25, 2005. (lcckk1)
July 22, 2005 74 REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 - Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Flowers, Jodi)
July 21, 2005 73 NOTICE of receipt of records of documentary productions by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Scottish High Court of Justiciary)(Elsner, Michael)
July 11, 2005 72 RESPONSE to 63 plaintiffs' statement of undisputed material facts filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (td, )
July 11, 2005 71 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 63 for summary judgment filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
July 5, 2005 70 NOTICE of Substitution of Title Page of Statement of Material Facts in Dispute by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Title Page# 2 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Francis)
July 1, 2005 69 NOTICE of Response to Request for International Judicial Assistance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Flowers, Jodi)
July 1, 2005 68 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 63 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Francis)
July 1, 2005 67 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 63 filed by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Memorandum of Law# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Dante Mattioni# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Mackenzie# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Article of Professor Black (Part 1)# 6 Exhibit Exhibit C - Article of Professor Black (Part 2)# 7 Exhibit Exhbit C - Article of Professor Black (Part 3)# 8 Exhibit Exhibit D - Article of Professor Koechler (Part 1)# 9 Exhibit Exhibit D - Article of Professor Koechler (Part 2)# 10 Exhibit Exhibit D - Article of Professor Koechler (Part 3)# 11 Exhibit Exhibit D - Article of Professor Koechler (Part 4)# 12 Exhibit Exhibit E - Caldwell v. Wright (Part 1)# 13 Exhibit Exhibit E - Caldwell v. Wright (Part 2)# 14 Exhibit Exhibit F - Mackenzie v. MacKay (Part 1)# 15 Exhibit Exhibit F - Mackenzie v. MacKay (Part 2)# 16 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Francis)
June 29, 2005 66 NOTICE of Proposed Order by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK re 65 Memorandum in Opposition, (Flowers, Jodi)
June 29, 2005 65 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 64 - Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Al-Megrahi's Motion to Extend Time for Filing His Answer to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Force of Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Flowers, Jodi)
June 24, 2005 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment By Force of Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Dante Mattioni# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service# 4 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 1)# 5 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 2)# 6 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 3)# 7 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 4)# 8 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 5)# 9 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 6)# 10 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 7)# 11 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 8)# 12 Exhibit Exhbit A (Part 9)# 13 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 10)# 14 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 11)# 15 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 12)# 16 Exhibit Exhibit B# 17 Exhibit Exhibit C (Part 1)# 18 Exhibit Exhibit C (Part 2)# 19 Exhibit Exhibit C (Part 3)# 20 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 1)# 21 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 2)# 22 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 3)# 23 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 4)# 24 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 5)# 25 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 6)# 26 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 7)# 27 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 8)# 28 Exhibit Exhibit D (Part 9)# 29 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Kelly, Francis)
June 3, 2005 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Collateral Estoppel as to Defendant Abdel Baset Al-Megrahi by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 4)# 4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 4)# 5 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 4)# 6 Exhibit B (Part 4 of 4)# 7 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 3)# 8 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 3)# 9 Exhibit C (Part 3 of 3)# 10 Exhibit D# 11 Exhibit E# 12 Statement of Facts As To Which There Is No Genuine Issue In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment# 13 Exhibit A)(Flowers, Jodi)
June 3, 2005 62 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH. (Attachments: # 1 Verification)(Mattioni, Dante)
April 22, 2005 61 STATUS REPORT - Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK, THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Flowers, Jodi)
April 19, 2005 60 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 8, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollary-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Crystal M. Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
April 19, 2005 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY: Paperless ORDER granting 59 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to serve discovery until and including April 22, 2005. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 19, 2005. (SM)
April 8, 2005 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Discovery by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Flowers, Jodi)
April 5, 2005 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES.(Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
March 8, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held on 3/8/2005. Status Conference set for 10/7/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim.) (dot, )
March 8, 2005 57 Featured Case ORDER requiring Defendant Fhimah to file an answer to the Complaint by April 15, 2005; requiring Plaintiff to file her motion with respect to the collateral estoppel/issue preclusion issue by June 3, 2005; Defendants shall file their oppositions by July 1, 2005; Plaintiff's reply is due July 22, 2005; no extensions will be granted; requiring parties to file a joint request for discovery with respect to Libya and any third parties by April 8, 2005; requiring parties shall appear for a status conference on October 7, 2005, at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 8, 2005. (lcckk1)
March 7, 2005 56 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18)(Flowers, Jodi)
March 4, 2005 55 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to LCvR 16.3 by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK, THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH. (Schiavo, A.)
March 4, 2005 54 NOTICE by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK (Flowers, Jodi)
March 4, 2005 53 Letter Rogatory requesting Judical Assistance issued to the appropriate judicial authority in the Netherlands; certified copy placed in case jacket. (dot, )
March 1, 2005 52 Letter Rogatory requesting Judicial Assistance issued to the appropriate judicial authority in the Netherlands; certified copy placed in case jacket. (dot, )
February 25, 2005 51 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory - Plaintiffs' Request for International Judicial Assistance (Scotland) by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Flowers, Jodi)
February 25, 2005 50 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory - Plaintiffs' Request for International Judicial Assistance (Netherlands) by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK, ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Flowers, Jodi)
February 25, 2005 49 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Local Rule 83.2 by Francis X. Kelly on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Kelly, Francis)
February 25, 2005 48 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Local Rule 83.2 by Eugene Mattioni on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Mattioni, Eugene)
February 25, 2005 47 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Local Rule 83.2 by Dante Mattioni on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Mattioni, Dante)
February 25, 2005 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Dante Mattioni on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Mattioni, Dante)
February 25, 2005 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Mattioni on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Mattioni, Eugene)
February 24, 2005 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI.(Kelly, Francis)
February 11, 2005 43 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on January 28, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Cathryn J. Jones. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
February 10, 2005 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis X. Kelly on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Kelly, Francis)
February 10, 2005 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Kettunen on behalf of ABDEL-BASSET AL-MEGRAHI (Kettunen, Paul) Modified on 2/10/2005 (cp, ).
February 8, 2005 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY: Paperless ORDER granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis X. Kelly, Eugene Mattioni, and Dante Mattioni, contingent on each certifying their familiarity with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 8, 2005. (SM)
February 4, 2005 40 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAHfiled by ASHLEY MICHELLE CUMMOCK, CHRISTOPHER JOHN CUMMOCK, MATTHEW DAVID CUMMOCK, M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK.(nmw, )
February 4, 2005 39 MOTION for Leave of Francis X. Kelly, Eugene Mattioni, and Dante Mattioni to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (For scanned image, see doc. 38 ). (cp, )
February 4, 2005 38 AFFIDAVIT and motion to admit Pro hac vice by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Sworn Declaration# 2 Sworn Declaration# 3 Sworn Declaration)(Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
February 1, 2005 37 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. ("Let it be filed", Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly)(cp, )
February 1, 2005 36 NOTICE by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Flowers, Jodi)
January 30, 2005 35 Featured Case ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file a notice by February 1, 2005, indicating whether on not Plaintiff plans to amend her Complaint; requiring parties to file their 16.3 Report by March 4, 2005; requiring parties to appear for a status conference on March 8, 2005, at 10:00 AM; requiring Plaintiff to file all affidavits of service before the March 8, 2005, status conference; requiring all attorneys who plan to take an active role in this case to register on the Court's ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2005. (lcckk1)
January 28, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held on 1/28/2005. Status Conference set for 3/8/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Catheryn Jones.) (dot, )
January 26, 2005 34 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald L. Motley in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Motley, Ronald)
January 25, 2005 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Motley on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Motley, Ronald)
January 25, 2005 32 AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth Smith in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Smith, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2005 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Smith on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Smith, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2005 30 AFFIDAVIT of Donald A. Migliori in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
January 25, 2005 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Migliori on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Migliori, Donald)
January 25, 2005 28 AFFIDAVIT of Justin B. Kaplan in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Kaplan, Justin)
January 25, 2005 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B. Kaplan on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Kaplan, Justin)
January 25, 2005 26 AFFIDAVIT of Michael E. Elsner in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Elsner, Michael)
January 25, 2005 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Elsner on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Elsner, Michael)
January 25, 2005 24 AFFIDAVIT of Jodi Westbrook Flowers in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Flowers, Jodi)
January 24, 2005 23 STATUS REPORT by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
January 24, 2005 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that the Court will hold the status conferences in 96cv1029 and 02cv2143 together at 3pm on January 28, 2005, rather than separately as originally scheduled. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 24, 2005. (lcckk1)
January 24, 2005 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Allan Gerson by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Schiavo, A.)
January 24, 2005 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Mark S. Zaid by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Schiavo, A.)
January 24, 2005 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Timothy C. Russell by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Schiavo, A.)
January 24, 2005 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Arman Dabiri Abkenari on behalf of THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
January 21, 2005 22 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Letter Rogatory)(cp, )
January 21, 2005 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. 14 through 16 were Entered in Error as these pleadings are Notices of Withdrawal which were filed as Motions. Counsel has been instructed to refile these documents as Notices. (cp, )
January 21, 2005 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 12 was Entered in Error as said pleading is a duplicate of Document No. 11. (cp, ) Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ).
January 21, 2005 17 STATUS REPORT - Plaintiffs' Status Report by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Schiavo, A.)
January 21, 2005 16 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Timothy Russell by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Schiavo, A.) Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ).
January 21, 2005 15 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Mark Zaid by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Schiavo, A.) Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ).
January 21, 2005 14 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Allan Gerson by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Schiavo, A.) Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ).
January 21, 2005 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Westbrook Flowers on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Flowers, Jodi)
January 21, 2005 12 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory - Plaintiffs' Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory) by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Letter Rogatory)(Schiavo, A.) Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ). Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ). Modified on 1/24/2005 (cp, ).
January 21, 2005 11 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory - Plaintiffs' Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory) by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Letter Rogatory)(Schiavo, A.)
January 11, 2005 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that the parties must submit with their status report due January 21, 2005, a copy of the docket for the proceedings in this case from the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 11, 2005. (lcckk1)
January 11, 2005 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, contingent on each attorneys filing an affidavit stating that the attorney is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; and that any attorneys who intend to appear in front of this Court shall immediately register on the Electronic Case Filing System and enter an appearance on the docket for this case, so that they will receive immediate notification of any filings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 11, 2005. (lcckk1)
December 30, 2004 9 Featured Case ORDER requiring parties to submit a status report by January 21, 2005, requiring parties shall appear for a status conference on January 28, 2005 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 30, 2004. (lcckk1)
November 3, 2004 Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Stanley Sporkin no longer assigned to the case. (jf, )
October 26, 2004 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket # 4 was entered as a notice of attorney appearance and should have been entered as a motion to appear pro hac vice. Please see Docket entry #7 as the corrected entry. (adc)
October 14, 2004 7 MOTION for Leave to appear pro hac vice by Ronald l. Motley, Donald A. Migliori, Jodi Westbrook Flowers, Michael E. Elsner, Elizabeth Smith and Justin B. Kaplan for this case by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)(adc)
October 14, 2004 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by A. Mary Schiavo on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1# 2 Attachment 2# 3 Attachment 3# 4 Attachment 4# 5 Attachment 5# 6 Attachment 6)(Schiavo, A.) Modified on 10/26/2004 (adc, ).
October 12, 2004 3 NOTICE by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK of withdrawal of counsel. (Rosenthal, Douglas)
October 8, 2004 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK. Case related to Case No. 02-2134. (adc)
October 8, 2004 5 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Mary Schiavo on behalf of M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (adc)
June 25, 2004 Case transferred in from USDC for the Eastern District of New York (Long Island Office)Division Case Number 9:96cv2993(TCP).. (bcs, )
June 22, 2004 8 Notice of certified copy of Remand Order filed 6/16/04 by the MDL Panel, remanding this case from the Eastern District of New York to the the District of Columbia. (ks, )
July 5, 1996 RECEIPT and acknowledgment of transfer documents by USDC for Eastern District of New York . Other Court Case No.: . (green certifed card signed but undated) (bjsp) Modified on 07/08/1996
June 21, 1996 ORIGINAL FILE and certified copy of docket entries and Order transmitted to Clerk of USDC for Eastern District of New York pursuant to order dated 5/17/96 by direction of the MDL Panel and upon receipt of letter from tranferor Court (bjsp)
June 21, 1996 2 LETTER from Clerk, U.S.D.C., for the Eastern District of New York enclosing a certified copy of the Transfer Order, filed 5/17/96 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer of the original file and certified copy of docket sheet. (bjsp)
May 3, 1996 MAILED CJRA brochure, Meet and Confer list, and Notice regarding dismissal to plaintiff M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK . (bjsp)
May 3, 1996 SUMMONS (5) issued for defendant SOC. PEOPLE'S LIBYAN, defendant LIBYAN EXTERNAL SEC., defendant LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, defendant ABDEL-BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, defendant LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH (bjsp)
May 3, 1996 1 COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff M. VICTORIA CUMMOCK (bjsp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUMMOCK, et al v. SOC. PEOPLE'S LIBYAN, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]