STURDZA v. UNITED ARAB EMIRATES, et al

Plaintiff: ELENA STURDZA
Defendant: UNITED ARAB EMIRATES and VASILIOS DEMETRIOU
Movant: NATHAN LEWIN
 
Case Number: 1:1998cv02051
Filed: August 26, 1998
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Henry H. Kennedy
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2009 208 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION (Kennedy, Henry)
August 6, 2013 282 Featured Case ORDER striking 281 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 8/6/2013. (lcbjr1)
November 5, 2013 305 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 303 Order. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 11/5/13. (lcbjr4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: STURDZA v. UNITED ARAB EMIRATES, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELENA STURDZA
Represented By: Alyza Doba Lewin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED ARAB EMIRATES
Represented By: Guy Hamilton Loeb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VASILIOS DEMETRIOU
Represented By: John Alan King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: NATHAN LEWIN
Represented By: Alyza Doba Lewin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]