HAGERMAN et al v. THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA Featured Case

Case Number: 1:2002cv02147
Filed: October 31, 2002
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Henry H. Kennedy
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 108 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 7, 2009. (lchhk2.)
May 5, 2009 107 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS re 106 Order to Show Cause,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Netburn, Sarah)
April 27, 2009 106 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' show cause response is due May 5, 2009. The Order to Show Cause 105 docketed on April 22, 2009 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 27, 2009. (NP)
April 22, 2009 105 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' show cause response is due May 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 22, 2009. (NP)
April 7, 2009 104 NOTICE Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
November 7, 2008 103 STATUS REPORT by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Curran, Christopher)
September 26, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 102 United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the time for the United States to intervene in this action or to inform the court of its decision not to intervene is extended until November 25, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 26, 2008. (NP)
September 25, 2008 102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to To Intervene Or To Inform Court That The United States Has Elected Not To Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
September 23, 2008 101 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua E. Gardner on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Steven Bressler (Gardner, Joshua)
August 12, 2008 100 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Erb, Nicole)
July 30, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 99 United States' Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene. Accordingly, the time for the United States to intervene in this action or to inform the court of its decision not to intervene is extended until September 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 30, 2008. (NP)
July 28, 2008 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) Modified on 7/29/2008 (nmw, ).
July 16, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Motion to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Newly Raised Argument. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 16, 2008. (NP)
July 15, 2008 98 Memorandum in opposition to re 97 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Newly Raised Argument filed by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Curran, Christopher)
July 14, 2008 97 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Newly Raised Argument by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Netburn, Sarah)
July 11, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 96 Motion to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Newly Raised Argument. The movants did not comply with LCvR 7(m), which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to " include [in the motion] a statement that the required discussion occurred and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 11, 2008. (NP)
July 10, 2008 96 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Netburn, Sarah)
July 2, 2008 95 REPLY to opposition to motion re 83 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum 1)(Curran, Christopher)
July 2, 2008 94 REPLY to opposition to motion re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Lewis, Eric)
June 27, 2008 93 NOTICE of Filing of Recent Authority by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Simon v. Republic of Iraq)(Erb, Nicole)
June 26, 2008 92 NOTICE and Confirmation of Service by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES re 91 Order (Erb, Nicole)
June 17, 2008 91 Featured Case ORDER certifying to the Attorney General of the United States that there is a constitutional challenge to a federal statute in this case. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 17, 2008. (NP)
June 12, 2008 90 Memorandum in opposition to re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 83 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part I, # 2 Declaration Part 2, # 3 Declaration Part 3)(Netburn, Sarah)
June 4, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Attorney Dante Mattioni. Attorney Dante Mattioni terminated. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 4, 2008. (NP) Modified on 6/5/2008 (nmw, ).
June 3, 2008 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Mattioni, Dante)
June 3, 2008 NOTICE re 88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; emailed to dmattion@mattioni.com, cc'd 14 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Two Memorandums of law were filed instead of Motion to Withdraw (tr, )
June 2, 2008 88 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Mattioni, Dante) Modified on 6/3/2008 (tr, ).
June 2, 2008 Featured Case ORDER granting 87 Consent Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Accordingly, plaintiffs' opposition is due on or before June 12, 2008, and all defendants' replies are due on or before July 2, 2008. It is further ordered that plaintiffs' brief shall not exceed 75 pages. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 2, 2008. (NP)
May 30, 2008 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 82 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 83 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Netburn, Sarah)
May 29, 2008 86 NOTICE of Challenge to the Constitutionality of a Federal Statute by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erb, Nicole)
May 16, 2008 85 Featured Case ORDER granting the parties' 84 joint motion regarding plaintiffs' De Bene Esse Depositions and the stipulations and agreements of the parties. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 5/14/08. (tj )
May 15, 2008 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 81 Stipulation was entered in error and has been refiled as Docket Entry 84 Motion. (nmw, )
May 14, 2008 84 Joint MOTION Regarding Plaintiffs' De Bene Esse Depositions by ETHEL HURST, MARY DIAMOND, JAMES MULROY, SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
May 14, 2008 83 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
May 14, 2008 82 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Eric)
May 14, 2008 81 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' De Bene Esse Depositions by ALL PLAINTIFFS, SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher) Modified on 5/15/2008 (nmw, ).
May 5, 2008 All defendants' answers to the Second Amended Complaint are due on or before May 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 5, 2008. (NP)
May 5, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Joint Motion to Revise and Establish a Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Responses to the Second Amended Complaint. Accordingly, defendants' responses to the Second Amended Complaint are due on or before May 14, 2008; plaintiffs' opposition, if any, is due on or before June 5, 2008; defendants' reply papers, if any, are due on or before June 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 5, 2008. (NP)
May 1, 2008 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses to the Second Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS, SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
April 25, 2008 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Leslie Lewis on behalf of ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Lewis, Eric)
April 15, 2008 78 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH, JOHN DOES #1-20 filed by ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, ALL PLAINTIFFS, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, JAMES MULROY.(nmw, )
April 15, 2008 77 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. 71 The clerk of court will enter the second amended complaint in the docket as of the date of this order. It is further ordered that the briefing schedule for any motion to dismiss shall be as follows: Defendant's motion due by 5/8/08; Plaintiffs response to be filed by 5/29/08; Defendant's reply to be filed by 6/12/08. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 4/14/08. (ztj, )
April 11, 2008 76 RESPONSE re 71 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
April 7, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Arman Dabiri's Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Accordingly, attorney Arman Dabiri is terminated. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 7, 2008. (NP)
April 7, 2008 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
April 4, 2008 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A. Vasquez, Jr on behalf of SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Vasquez, Francis)
April 4, 2008 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Erb on behalf of SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Erb, Nicole)
April 4, 2008 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Curran on behalf of SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Curran, Christopher)
March 28, 2008 71 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Netburn, Sarah)
February 26, 2008 70 NOTICE by ALL PLAINTIFFS re 53 Memorandum in Opposition,, Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, 51 MOTION for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Netburn, Sarah)
February 22, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 67 plaintiffs' motion for leave to take videotaped de bene esse depositions of plaintiffs Mary Diamond, John Mulroy, and Ethel Hurst. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 22, 2008. (NP)
February 21, 2008 69 RESPONSE re 67 MOTION to Take Deposition from Mary Diamond, John Mulroy, Ethel Hurst MOTION for Trial ANSWER TO MOTION TO CONDUCT VIDEOTAPED DE BENE ESSE DEPOSITIONS FOR A DAMAGES HEARING filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Mattioni, Dante)
February 19, 2008 68 NOTICE by ALL PLAINTIFFS re 67 MOTION to Take Deposition from Mary Diamond, John Mulroy, Ethel Hurst MOTION for Trial (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Netburn, Sarah)
February 15, 2008 67 MOTION to Take Deposition from Mary Diamond, John Mulroy, Ethel Hurst, MOTION for Trial by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Netburn, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 66 REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Dabiri, Arman)
October 9, 2007 65 Memorandum in opposition to re 64 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah)
September 24, 2007 64 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - SCCRC Release# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
September 13, 2007 63 Order denying 46 defendants' motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 13, 2007. (FL, )
August 24, 2007 62 REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 MOTION Motion for Relief from Judgment and Stay of Proceedings re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, Defendant Al-Megrahi's Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Relief from Judgement and Stay of Proceedings and Certificate of Service filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante)
August 15, 2007 61 Memorandum in opposition to re 60 MOTION Motion for Relief from Judgment and Stay of Proceedings re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah)
August 3, 2007 60 MOTION Motion for Relief from Judgment and Stay of Proceedings re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI (Mattioni, Dante)
April 9, 2007 59 Order denying 50 defendants motion for certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 9, 2007. (FL, )
March 22, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 57 Response to any document, was entered in error and has been refiled correctly by the Court in docket entry 58 . (lc, )
March 22, 2007 58 REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, 51 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (lc, )
March 22, 2007 57 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Libya's Motion for the Court to Treat as Conceded its Motion for Reconsideration filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante) Modified on 3/23/2007 (lc, ).
March 19, 2007 56 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 55 Reply to opposition to Motion, Plfs' Opposition to Defendant Libya's Motion for the Court to Treat as Conceded its Motion for Reconsideration filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah) Modified on 3/20/2007 (zlc, ).
March 18, 2007 55 REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dabiri, Arman)
March 15, 2007 54 Memorandum in opposition to re 50 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, 51 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah)
March 15, 2007 53 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION for Reconsideration and Vacate the Court's Order of February 1, 2007 and Dismiss Pursuant to the Statute of Limitations or in the Alternative to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to Rule 54(b) MOTION for Reconsideration and Vacate the Court's Order of February 1, 2007 and Dismiss Pursuant to the Statute of Limitations or in the Alternative to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to Rule 54(b), 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1)(Netburn, Sarah)
March 5, 2007 52 NOTICE of Proposed Case Management Plan of Defendant Al-Megrahi filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante) Modified on 3/6/2007 (lc, ).
March 5, 2007 51 MOTION for Reconsideration by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law# 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mattioni, Dante)
March 5, 2007 50 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum# 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mattioni, Dante)
March 2, 2007 49 MOTION for Order to defer ruling on statute of limitations by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1)(Netburn, Sarah)
March 2, 2007 48 STATUS REPORT regarding Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1)(Netburn, Sarah)
March 2, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 45 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (lc, )
March 2, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 44 MOTION for Reconsideration and Vacate the Court's Order of February 1, 2007 and Dismiss Pursuant to the Statute of Limitations or in the Alternative to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to Rule 54(b) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with documents in the correct order and with the correct categories selected. (lc, )
March 1, 2007 47 STATUS REPORT re Case Management by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Dabiri, Arman)
March 1, 2007 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Memorandum & Opinion of February 1, 2007 by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
March 1, 2007 45 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT regarding Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah) Modified on 3/2/2007 (lc, ).
March 1, 2007 44 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Reconsideration and Vacate the Court's Order of February 1, 2007 and Dismiss Pursuant to the Statute of Limitations or in the Alternative to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Mattioni, Dante) Modified on 3/2/2007 (lc, ).
February 1, 2007 Reset Hearings: Status conference currently scheduled for 2/9/07 @ 10am is now canceled. (tj )
February 1, 2007 43 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 1, 2007. (FL, )
December 11, 2006 Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently set for 12/18/06 is OFF and rescheduled for 2/9/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (ztj, )
October 6, 2006 NOTICE of Hearing: Status conference currently scheduled for 10/27/06 is rescheduled for 12/18/2006 @ 10:15 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
June 19, 2006 Minute order re 42 granting motion for admission pro hac vice. Dante Mattioni and Francis X. Kelly are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant, Al-Megrahi in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 19, 2006. Official paperless order(FL, ) Modified on 6/20/2006 (lc, ).
June 19, 2006 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Francis X. Kelly and Dante Mattioni. :Address- 399 Market Street, 2d FLoor, Philadelphia, PA 19106. Phone No. - 215-629-1600. Fax No. - 215-923-2227 by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Francis Kelly# 2 Exhibit Declaration of Dante Mattioni# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Arman Dabiri# 4 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(Dabiri, Arman) Modified on 3/2/2007 to reflect correct party represented. (lc, ).
June 19, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as a Motion with the signature and ECF login matching. (lc, )
June 16, 2006 41 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dante Mattioni & Francis Kelly. :Address- 399 Market Street, 2nd Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19106. Phone No. - 215-629-1600. Fax No. - 215-923-2227 by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Arman Dabiri# 2 Exhibit Declaration of Dante Mattioni# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Francis Kelly# 4 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(Dabiri, Arman) Modified on 6/19/2006 (lc, ).
June 12, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 37 Memorandum in Opposition,, 38 Response to any document were entered in error and have been refiled by the Court in the correct categories (see docket entries 39 and 40). (lc, )
June 9, 2006 40 REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit -Part 2)(lc, )
June 9, 2006 39 REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(lc, )
June 9, 2006 38 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit part 2)(Dabiri, Arman) Modified on 6/12/2006 (lc, ).
June 9, 2006 37 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kelly, Francis) Modified on 6/12/2006 (lc, ).
June 9, 2006 36 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT by ALL PLAINTIFFS 35 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,. (Netburn, Sarah)
June 9, 2006 35 REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of brief)(Netburn, Sarah)
May 31, 2006 34 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT by ALL PLAINTIFFS 33 Memorandum in Opposition filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9)(Netburn, Sarah)
May 31, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 29 Response to any document, 30 Response to any document were entered in error and have been added as attachments to docket entry #31. (lc, )
May 31, 2006 33 Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION to Dismiss, 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 3# 2 Part 3 of 3)(Netburn, Sarah)
May 30, 2006 32 Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Dabiri, Arman)
May 30, 2006 31 Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Kelly, Francis) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2006 (lc, ).
May 30, 2006 30 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Kelly, Francis) Modified on 5/31/2006 (lc, ).
May 30, 2006 29 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Plaintiffs Summary Judgement Motion filed by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Kelly, Francis) Modified on 5/31/2006 (lc, ).
May 18, 2006 28 RESPONSE to 27 Defendant Al-Megrahi's Notice of Related Case filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Netburn, Sarah) Modified on 5/19/2006 (lc, ).
May 18, 2006 27 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. Case related to Case No. 96-1029. (Kelly, Francis)
May 2, 2006 26 AFFIDAVIT of Allistair Bonnington re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4# 4 Part 5# 5 Part 6# 6 Part 7# 7 Part 8)(nmw, )
May 2, 2006 25 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Netburn re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4# 4 Part 5# 5 Part 6# 6 Part 7# 7 Part 8# 8 Part 9# 9 Part 10)(nmw, )
May 1, 2006 24 MOTION to Dismiss by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
May 1, 2006 23 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Plaintiffs' Proposed Order for Summary Judgment by ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, JAMES MULROY 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JODI HAGERMAN,, ELIZABETH VRENIOS,, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS,, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS,, E. PETER GABOR,, IVAN R. GABOR,, ETHEL HURST,, SPENCER HURST,, MITCHELL HURST,, SHARON HURST,, MARY DIAMOND,, GWENNTH FORDE,, VICTORIA PORTER,, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS,, OLGA HUSBANDS,, VERNON DRUSES,, RANDOLPH PORTER,, CHARLES LINCOLN,, ROSEMARY DOYLE,, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES,, JAMES MULROY,, ELEANOR HUDSON,, WILLIAM D. HUDSON,, STEPHEN P. HUDSON,, PAUL J. HUDSON,, WILLIAM B. HUDSON,, DAVID J. ROSSI,. (Netburn, Sarah)
May 1, 2006 22 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute by ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, JAMES MULROY 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JODI HAGERMAN,, ELIZABETH VRENIOS,, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS,, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS,, E. PETER GABOR,, IVAN R. GABOR,, ETHEL HURST,, SPENCER HURST,, MITCHELL HURST,, SHARON HURST,, MARY DIAMOND,, GWENNTH FORDE,, VICTORIA PORTER,, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS,, OLGA HUSBANDS,, VERNON DRUSES,, RANDOLPH PORTER,, CHARLES LINCOLN,, ROSEMARY DOYLE,, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES,, JAMES MULROY,, ELEANOR HUDSON,, WILLIAM D. HUDSON,, STEPHEN P. HUDSON,, PAUL J. HUDSON,, WILLIAM B. HUDSON,, DAVID J. ROSSI,. (Netburn, Sarah)
May 1, 2006 21 MEMORANDUM re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JODI HAGERMAN,, ELIZABETH VRENIOS,, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS,, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS,, E. PETER GABOR,, IVAN R. GABOR,, ETHEL HURST,, SPENCER HURST,, MITCHELL HURST,, SHARON HURST,, MARY DIAMOND,, GWENNTH FORDE,, VICTORIA PORTER,, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS,, OLGA HUSBANDS,, VERNON DRUSES,, RANDOLPH PORTER,, CHARLES LINCOLN,, ROSEMARY DOYLE,, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES,, JAMES MULROY,, ELEANOR HUDSON,, WILLIAM D. HUDSON,, STEPHEN P. HUDSON,, PAUL J. HUDSON,, WILLIAM B. HUDSON,, DAVID J. ROSSI, by CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, CHARLES LINCOLN, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, JAMES MULROY, ELEANOR HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, JODI HAGERMAN, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, DAVID J. ROSSI, ELIZABETH VRENIOS, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS. (Netburn, Sarah)
May 1, 2006 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, CHARLES LINCOLN, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, JAMES MULROY, ELEANOR HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, JODI HAGERMAN, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, DAVID J. ROSSI, ELIZABETH VRENIOS, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS. (Netburn, Sarah)
May 1, 2006 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss by ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI. (Kelly, Francis)
February 27, 2006 18 Scheduling Order. The status conference set for March 3, 2006, is vacated, and a date for a status conference will be set by the Clerk of the Court in October 2006, when the business of the court permits. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 27, 2006. (FL, )
February 27, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2006. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2006. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2006. (rew, )
February 27, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3-3-06 at 10:30 AM is OFF and reset for 10/27/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, )
February 8, 2006 17 STATUS REPORT by Parties by THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabiri, Arman)
January 12, 2006 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES, ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH, JOHN DOES #1-20filed by ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, JAMES MULROY.(nmw, )
January 12, 2006 15 NOTICE of Filing of First Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, RANDOLPH PORTER, CHARLES LINCOLN, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, JAMES MULROY, ELEANOR HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, JODI HAGERMAN, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, DAVID J. ROSSI, ELIZABETH VRENIOS, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS (Netburn, Sarah)
December 12, 2005 Minute order granting 14 plaintiffs' motion for admission pro hac vice. Richard D. Emery, Jonathan S. Abady, and Sarah Netburn are permitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter, on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on December 12, 2005. (FL, )
December 12, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Status Conference held on 12/12/2005. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint by 1/12/2006. Further Status Conference set for 3/3/2006 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (rew, )
December 10, 2005 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ricahrd Emery. :Address- 545 Madison Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - 212 763 5000. Fax No. - 212 763 5001 and Jonathan Abady, Esq. and Sarah Netburn, Esq. by E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, ELEANOR HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, JODI HAGERMAN, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq.# 2 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Emery, Esq.# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Abady, Esq.# 4 Exhibit Declaration of Sarah Netburn)(Zaid, Mark)
December 9, 2005 13 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Mark S. Zaid on behalf of E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, ETHEL HURST, SPENCER HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, MARY DIAMOND, GWENNTH FORDE, OLGA HUSBANDS, VERNON DRUSES, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, ELEANOR HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, JODI HAGERMAN, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON Substituting for attorney Patrick O'Donnell (Zaid, Mark)
November 18, 2005 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arman Dabiri (Dabiri, Arman)
October 21, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/16/2005 at 11:30 AM is OFF and reset for 12/12/2005 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. At the request of counsel Sarah Neckburn. (rew, )
October 11, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/13/2005 at 2:15 AM is OFF and reset for 12/16/2005 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, )
October 7, 2005 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Arman Dabiri on behalf of THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES (Dabiri, Arman)
September 29, 2005 11 CASE REMANDED IN from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Case Number #2:03cv1579 (TCP); (SEALED NON-PUBLIC DOCKET SHEET FILED UNDER SEAL IN VAULT) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Remand Pleadings)(ks, )
September 26, 2005 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/13/2005 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (rew, )
August 15, 2005 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multistrict Litigation: Separation of Claims and Remand Order; that the claims of plaintiffs in this action are separated and remanded from the Eastern District of New York to the District of Columbia. CHAIRMAN, WM. TERRELL HODGES. (ks, )
August 9, 2004 8 LETTER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed 8/6/04 of a certified copy of the MDL Panel's Order deferring Decision of transfer of case. (ks, )
November 5, 2003 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION served on 7/2/2003, answer due 7/22/2003; THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA served on 7/2/2003, answer due 7/22/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit notice of bulky)(bcs, )
July 29, 2003 Receipt and acknowledgement of transfer documents by USDC for the Eastern District of New York on 7/29/03. Other court case number is 03cv1579. (bcs, )
July 29, 2003 Case transferrred out pursuant to order dated 4/16/03 to the United States District for the Eastern District of New York. (bcs, )
April 16, 2003 6 Order granting plaintiff's motion to transfer case to the U.S. District Court of the Eastern District of New York 5 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on April 16, 2003. (FL, )
February 10, 2003 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(c)(ii). by MARY DIAMOND, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, VERNON DRUSES, GWENNTH FORDE, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, JODI HAGERMAN, ELEANOR HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, ETHEL HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, SPENCER HURST, OLGA HUSBANDS, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, CHARLES LINCOLN, JAMES MULROY, RANDOLPH PORTER, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, DAVID J. ROSSI, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, ELIZABETH VRENIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(bcs, )
January 6, 2003 4 AFFIDAVIT Requesting Foreign Mailing by MARY DIAMOND, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, VERNON DRUSES, GWENNTH FORDE, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, JODI HAGERMAN, ELEANOR HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, ETHEL HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, SPENCER HURST, OLGA HUSBANDS, CHARLES LINCOLN, JAMES MULROY, RANDOLPH PORTER, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, DAVID J. ROSSI, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, ELIZABETH VRENIOS. (O'Donnell, Patrick)
November 14, 2002 3 Featured Case PRELIMINARY ELECTRONIC CASE FILING ORDER . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 13, 2002. (FL, )
October 31, 2002 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARY DIAMOND, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, VERNON DRUSES, GWENNTH FORDE, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, JODI HAGERMAN, ELEANOR HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, ETHEL HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, SPENCER HURST, OLGA HUSBANDS, CHARLES LINCOLN, JAMES MULROY, RANDOLPH PORTER, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, DAVID J. ROSSI, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, ELIZABETH VRENIOS. Case related to Case No. 94-5557; Hudson v. Socialist People's Libyan Arab Jamahiriya. (cdw, )
October 31, 2002 1 COMPLAINT against ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI, JOHN DOES #1-20, LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION, THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA ( Filing fee $150 ). Filed by MARY DIAMOND, ROSEMARY DOYLE, MAUREEN DOYLE-GEDDES, VERNON DRUSES, GWENNTH FORDE, E. PETER GABOR, IVAN R. GABOR, JODI HAGERMAN, ELEANOR HUDSON, PAUL J. HUDSON, STEPHEN P. HUDSON, WILLIAM D. HUDSON, WILLIAM B. HUDSON, ETHEL HURST, MITCHELL HURST, SHARON HURST, SPENCER HURST, OLGA HUSBANDS, CHARLES LINCOLN, JAMES MULROY, RANDOLPH PORTER, VICTORIA PORTER, ELFRIEDA PORTER-BACCHUS, DAVID J. ROSSI, ANASTASIOS VRENIOS, CHRISTOPHER VRENIOS, ELIZABETH VRENIOS. (cdw, )
October 31, 2002 SUMMONS (5) Issued as to ABDEL BASSET ALI AL-MEGRAHI ; LAMEN KHALIFA FHIMAH ; LIBYAN ARAB AIRLINES ; LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY ORGANIZATION ; THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA (cdw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAGERMAN et al v. THE SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]