NAEGELE v. ALBERS et al

Case Number: 1:2003cv02507
Filed: December 8, 2003
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 2/21/12. (lcrmu2)
April 18, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff Timothy D. Naegele (Plaintiff or Naegele) is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why the Court should not STAY this action in its entirety pending the r esolution of parallel and/or overlapping California state court litigation surrounding the same fee dispute at the center of this action. Plaintiff shall also SHOW CAUSE as to why the Court should not find that he willfully fail[ed] to appear at the arbitration hearing before the Los Angeles Bar Associations Dispute Resolution Services, within the meaning of California Business and Professions Code § 6204(a).Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that:Naegele shall SHOW CAUSE in writing: (1) as to why this Court should not STAY this action in its entirety pending a decision from the California Court of Appeals Second Appellate District in Case No. B240455; and (2) as to why this Court should not find that Naegele willfully failed to appear at the arbitration hearing within the meaning of Section 6204(a). Naegeles response shall be filed by no later than May 10, 2013, and shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Naegele and to each of the Defendants at their address of record on file with the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/18/2013. (tcb)
July 18, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiff's 110 Motion for Reconsideration and the Court's 114 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/18/2013. (lcrlw3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAEGELE v. ALBERS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]