WINDSTEAD et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Plaintiff: JAMES WINDSTEAD, JUANITA IRVING, PATRICIA HAYDEN, SHEILA OWENS, RUBY DAVIS, DENISE DOWNING, LOUIS BEALE, GEORGE MORGAN, MARY WALEY, TARA ROGERS, PATRICIA NEWBY, ESTATE OF REGINALD RASHEED and ESTATE OF JOHN LYLES
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ANTHONY WILLIAMS and JAMES JACOBS
Amicus: LIGHTFOOT PLAINTIFFS
 
Case Number: 1:2004cv00887
Filed: February 16, 2010
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Facciola
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 109 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as moot 89 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 90 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 91 Motion to Stay; denying 92 Motion for Order; granting nunc pro tunc 94 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 99 Motion for Protective Order; denying 102 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 103 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 107 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 2/16/10. (SP, )
July 2, 2010 132 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 111 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 07/02/2010. (lcjmf1)
January 6, 2012 212 Featured Case FINDINGS OF FACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/6/12. (SP, )
January 6, 2012 213 Featured Case CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/6/12. (SP, )
January 26, 2009 80 Featured Case VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 06/03/09.....MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/26/09. (SP, ) Modified on 6/3/2009 (ldc, ).
June 3, 2009 86 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 6/3/09. (SP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WINDSTEAD et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WINDSTEAD
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA IRVING
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA HAYDEN
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA OWENS
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBY DAVIS
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE DOWNING
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS BEALE
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE MORGAN
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY WALEY
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA ROGERS
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA NEWBY
Represented By: Kirk D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF REGINALD RASHEED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHN LYLES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Ellen A. Efros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Ellen A. Efros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES JACOBS
Represented By: Ellen A. Efros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: LIGHTFOOT PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Duncan Norman Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]