QATAR NATIONAL BANK v. WINMAR, INC.

 
Case Number: 1:2006cv01307
Filed: July 24, 2006
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 130 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order granting in part and denying in part Al Jazeera's Objections to Magistrate Judge Facciola's Report & Recommendation. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/28/11. (CL, )
December 21, 2011 193 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION to various Motions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/21/11. (CL, )
December 28, 2011 197 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order granting in part and denying in part Winmar's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment to Include Attorneys' Fees and Costs Plus Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/28/11. (CL, )
September 4, 2009 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order granting Qatar National Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/3/09. (CL, )
September 29, 2010 67 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order entering judgment in favor of Winmar, Inc.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/29/10. (CL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: QATAR NATIONAL BANK v. WINMAR, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]