FOLLIARD v. INSIGHT ENTERPRISES, INC. et al

Plaintiff: BRADY FOLLIARD
Defendant: SYNNEX CORPORATION, EMTEC FEDERAL, GOVERNMENT ACQUISITIONS, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD, GOVCONNECTIONS, INC., GOV PLACE, FORCE 3 and GTSI CORP.
Movant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00719
Filed: April 20, 2007
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 114 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 19, 2011. (lcrcl5)
May 3, 2012 156 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/3/2012.(lcrcl5/intdw)
July 31, 2012 163 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 31, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl5)
March 18, 2013 171 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION explaining the Court's reasoning as to 170 , its Order granting Govplace summary judgment as to the remaining product numbers in dispute, and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/18/2013. (lcrcl4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: FOLLIARD v. INSIGHT ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADY FOLLIARD
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNNEX CORPORATION
Represented By: Lisa Freiman Fishberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMTEC FEDERAL
Represented By: Christopher Michael Loveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT ACQUISITIONS, INC.
Represented By: John M. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEWLETT-PACKARD
Represented By: Kirstin D. Dietel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVCONNECTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Alan I. Baron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOV PLACE
Represented By: Christopher Michael Loveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORCE 3
Represented By: Jessica C. Abrahams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTSI CORP.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Loveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Laurie J. Weinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]