ARMENIAN GENOCIDE MUSEUM AND MEMORIAL INC v. CAFESJIAN FAMILY FOUNDATION INC

Plaintiff: ARMENIAN GENOCIDE MUSEUM AND MEMORIAL INC
Defendant: CAFESJIAN FAMILY FOUNDATION INC
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv01259
Filed: July 16, 2007
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 134 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION (redacted). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2010. (lcckk1)
March 22, 2010 137 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION (unredacted). An unredacted version of the Court's March 9, 2010, Memorandum Opinion is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 22, 2010. (lcckk1)
October 22, 2010 204 Featured Case PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. This Memorandum Opinion and Order is intended to review and summarize the discussions and rulings made on the record during the Pretrial Conference held on October 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 22, 2010. (lcckk1)
January 26, 2011 248 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2011.(lcckk1)
May 9, 2011 308 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 9, 2011. (lcckk1)
May 9, 2011 310 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 9, 2011. (lcckk1)
September 12, 2011 343 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 12, 2011. (lcckk1)
February 20, 2013 370 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/20/13. (lcckk2)
February 20, 2013 372 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/20/13. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-01259-CKK, 1:08-cv-00255-CKK, 1:08-cv-01254-CKK(lcckk2)
February 5, 2009 66 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 5, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 15, 2009 92 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 15, 2009. (lcckk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ARMENIAN GENOCIDE MUSEUM AND MEMORIAL INC v. CAFESJIAN FAMILY FOUNDATION INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMENIAN GENOCIDE MUSEUM AND MEMORIAL INC
Represented By: David Taylor Case
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAFESJIAN FAMILY FOUNDATION INC
Represented By: Ty Cobb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]