POETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: JOSEPH POETT
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL and ROBBIN WEYANT
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv01374
Filed: July 27, 2007
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
 
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 29, 2009. (lcckk2 )
January 18, 2010 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2010. (lcckk2)
September 30, 2010 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/30/10 DENYING (Document No. 38) Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs of Suit.(EW)
March 6, 2012 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/6/12. (lcckk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: POETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH POETT
Represented By: Joan Augusta Harvill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBIN WEYANT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]