SIMMS v. BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: BRYAN H. SIMMS
Defendant: BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER and BRIAN K. DAVIS
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00177
Filed: January 30, 2008
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 58 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz (Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2009 57 Featured Case ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT for the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/14/09. (lcrwr2)
May 14, 2009 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION granting the plaintiff's motion for entry of judgment 52 and denying the defendants' motion 48 to modify the March 11, 2009 order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/14/09. (lcrwr2)
April 20, 2009 55 REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 MOTION for Judgment filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Daniel H. Aiken)(Reff, Alisa)
April 13, 2009 54 Memorandum in opposition to re 52 MOTION for Judgment filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2009 53 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 48 MOTION for Order to Modify Order filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 51 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment was entered in error and refiled as 52 with correct event type. (jf, )
April 3, 2009 52 MOTION for Judgment by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Daniel H. Aiken, # 3 Exhibit A)(Reff, Alisa)
March 31, 2009 50 REPLY to opposition to motion re 48 MOTION for Order to Modify Order filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2009 49 Memorandum in opposition to re 48 MOTION for Order to Modify Order ---Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify the Court's Order filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reff, Alisa)
March 17, 2009 48 MOTION for Order to Modify Order by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2009 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/11/09. (lin, )
March 9, 2009 46 REPLY to opposition to motion re 44 Supplemental MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Sosnowsky, Mark)
March 2, 2009 45 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 Supplemental MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to enforcement the settlement agreement 41 be, and hereby is, DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in light of the plaintiff's supplemental motion seeking more comprehensive relief.Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/27/09. (lcrwr2)
February 19, 2009 44 Supplemental MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Reff, Alisa)
February 3, 2009 43 Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2009 42 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2009 41 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Fannon, James)
December 31, 2008 40 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/30/08. (lin, )
December 30, 2008 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal Consent Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice and Retaining Jurisdiction For Purpose of Enforcing Settlement by BRYAN H. SIMMS, BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Fannon, James)
November 26, 2008 38 Featured Case ORDER referring case to mediation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/25/08. (lcrwr2)
November 14, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts: Status Conference held on 11/14/2008, ( Plaintiff's Response to counterclaim due by 1/16/2009, Defendant's Reply to opposition to motion to dismiss due by 1/16/2009., Status Report due by 1/16/2009). Dispositive motion deadline suspended. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (lin, )
November 7, 2008 37 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION to Dismiss BALL STREET FUND, Brian K. Davis and Christian Laettner as parties to the action and to dismiss COUNTS II and COUNTS III of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Fannon, James)
October 30, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' unopposed motion 36 for leave to file exhibit A to defendants' statement of points and authorities in support of its motion to dismiss under seal be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file a properly redacted version of the exhibit on the public docket. The clerk is directed to seal Exhibit A, the second attachment to defendants' motion 34 to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/30/08. (lcrwr2)
October 28, 2008 36 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibits A to Defendants' Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service 10-28-08, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2008 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BRYAN H. SIMMS, BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Fannon, James)
October 27, 2008 34 MOTION to Dismiss BALL STREET FUND, Brian K. Davis and Christian Laettner as parties to the action and to dismiss COUNTS II and COUNTS III of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of their Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Defendants Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/28/2008 (tr).
October 27, 2008 33 ANSWER to 32 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC. Related document: 32 Amended Complaint filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate Of Service 10-27-08)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2008 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS.(jf, )
October 7, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion 25 for leave to file a first amended complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED, as plaintiff may amend the complaint with respect to defendants Davis, Laettner, and Ball Street Fund as of right, and plaintiff's additional amendments have gone unopposed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the first amended complaint [25-2] as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/6/2008.(lcrwr2)
October 3, 2008 31 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service 10-03-2008)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2008 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Fannon, James)
August 8, 2008 29 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard W. Roberts of proceedings held on 7-11-2008; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance:8-8-2008. Court Reporter Email Address : Scottlyn01@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.(Wallace, Scott)
August 6, 2008 28 Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Order, # 6 Certificate of Service 08-06-2008)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2008 27 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/29/08. (lin, )
July 25, 2008 26 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service 08-cv-00177)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2008 25 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Fannon, James)
July 17, 2008 24 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALTY by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Fannon, James)
July 11, 2008 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/11/08. (lcrwr2)
July 11, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2008, Motion to dismiss granted in part and denied in part; (Granted as to Defendants Davis, Laettner and Ball Street Fund); Motion to dismiss counts 2 and 3 of complaint denied without prejudice; Initial disclosures due 7/25/08; Plaintiff's expert witness designation due 9/9/08; Defendant's expert witness designation due 10/9/08; Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2008., Discovery due by 11/10/2008., Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2008., Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2008., Status Conference set for 11/14/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts.). (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (lin, )
July 9, 2008 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney R. Abbott on behalf of BRYAN H. SIMMS (Abbott, Courtney)
June 12, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
June 11, 2008 21 Featured Case ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for July 11, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/11/08. (lcrwr2)
June 4, 2008 20 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2008 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 19 MOTION to Dismiss was modified as a Notice of Filing of exhibits to 13 . Exhibit A was placed under, pursuant to Court's Minute Order dtd. 5/19/08. To view the Redacted Version of Exhibit A, see entry 18 .(jf, )
May 28, 2008 19 NOTICE of filing of exhibits to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by BALL STREET FUND, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Statement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Certificate of Service, # 9 Order)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2008 (jf, ).
May 20, 2008 18 NOTICE of Court's Minute Order Regarding Sealing of Document by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS re 11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, 14 Memorandum in Opposition, 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted Version), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' consent motion 17 to seal Exhibit A [13-3] as filed with defendants' answer and counterclaims and motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants are INSTRUCTED to file a redacted version of Exhibit A on the public docket. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/19/08. (lcrwr2)
May 15, 2008 17 MOTION Seal Document Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibit A and Supporting Points and Authorities by BALL STREET FUND, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Order)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2008 16 Plaintiff Bryan Simms' ANSWER to 11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by BRYAN H. SIMMS. Related document: 11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC.(Reff, Alisa)
May 12, 2008 15 REPLY re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2008 14 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unreported Case, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Reff, Alisa)
April 24, 2008 13 MOTION to Dismiss by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A-F, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2008 12 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2008 11 Defendants Ball Street Ventures, LLC and Ball Street Partners, LLC ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against BRYAN H. SIMMS by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/25/2008. (lin, )
March 26, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/25/2008. (lin, )
March 24, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' consent motion 5 for an extension of time until April 25, 2008 to respond to plaintiff's complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/24/08. (lcrwr2)
March 19, 2008 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRYAN H. SIMMS. BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2008, answer due 4/4/2008. (Fannon, James)
March 19, 2008 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRYAN H. SIMMS. BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2008, answer due 4/4/2008. (Fannon, James)
March 19, 2008 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRYAN H. SIMMS. BALL STREET FUND, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2008, answer due 4/4/2008. (Fannon, James)
March 19, 2008 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRYAN H. SIMMS. BRIAN K. DAVIS waiver sent on 2/4/2008, answer due 4/4/2008. (Fannon, James)
March 19, 2008 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRYAN H. SIMMS. CHRISTIAN LAETTNER waiver sent on 2/4/2008, answer due 4/4/2008. (Fannon, James)
March 18, 2008 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to by BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey) Modified to enter the names of the filers on 3/18/2008 (tg, ).
March 18, 2008 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz on behalf of BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS (Jacobovitz, Jeffrey) Modified to enter the names of the parties being represented on 3/18/2008 (tg, ).
February 21, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motions 2 3 to permit Thomas J. Barton and James G. Fannon, respectively, to appear pro hac vice be, and hereby are, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/21/08. (lcrwr2)
February 4, 2008 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James G. Fannon, :Firm- Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, :Address- One Logan Square, 18th & Cherry Streets, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - 215-988-2863. Fax No. - 215-988-2757 by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James Fannon, # 2 Text of Proposed Order granting James Fannon admission pro hac vice)(Reff, Alisa)
February 4, 2008 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas J. Barton, :Firm- Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, :Address- One Logan Square, 18th & Cherry Streets, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - 215-988-2834. Fax No. - 215-988-2757 by BRYAN H. SIMMS (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Thomas Barton, # 2 Text of Proposed Order admitting Thomas Barton pro hac vice)(Reff, Alisa)
January 30, 2008 SUMMONS (7) Issued as to BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, (ks, )
January 30, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC, BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC, BALL STREET FUND, LLC, CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 41616009893) filed by BRYAN H. SIMMS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ks, ) Modified on 2/7/2008 (ks, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SIMMS v. BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN H. SIMMS
Represented By: Alisa Helene Reff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALL STREET VENTURES, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALL STREET PARTNERS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALL STREET FUND, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN LAETTNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN K. DAVIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]