UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THOMSON CORPORATION et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: THOMSON CORPORATION and REUTERS GROUP, PLC
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00262
Filed: February 19, 2008
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Thomas F. Hogan
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon completion of all terms of the Final Judgment, the parties shall jointly file a notice of completion along with a proposed order to close the case. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/12/09. (lctfh4)
September 19, 2008 27 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Chapman, Travis)
September 12, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's ruling of 5/30/08 (docket # 17 ) granting the parties' joint motion to seal filed 5/29/08 (docket # 16 ), the Court denies as moot the motion to seal filed 2/19/08 (docket # 3 ). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 09/12/08. (lctfh4)
August 22, 2008 26 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Chapman, Travis)
August 22, 2008 25 Featured Case ORDER; granting 24 Motion for Order,Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/21/08. (hs)
August 20, 2008 24 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Modify Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Final Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order to Modify Final Judgment)(Chapman, Travis)
August 11, 2008 23 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Chapman, Travis)
August 5, 2008 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Richard Chapman on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Chapman, Travis)
July 21, 2008 21 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahnke, Robert)
July 14, 2008 20 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahnke, Robert)
June 26, 2008 19 NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DIVESTITURE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahnke, Robert)
June 17, 2008 18 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against The Thomson Corporation and Reuters Group PLC with Schedules 1 and 5; (FILED UNDER SEAL -Schedules 2 through 4). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/17/08. (jeb, )
May 30, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER; granting 16 Joint Motion To Seal, Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/29/08. (hs)
May 29, 2008 16 Joint MOTION Sealing of Schedules 2, 3 and 4 to the [proposed] Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Filing under Seal)(Mahnke, Robert)
May 29, 2008 15 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 [proposed] Final Judgment, # 2 Certificate of Compliance with the Tunney Act)(Mahnke, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2008 (jeb, ).
May 27, 2008 14 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by THOMSON CORPORATION, REUTERS GROUP, PLC. (Collins, Wayne)
May 27, 2008 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Dale Collins on behalf of all defendants (Collins, Wayne)
April 14, 2008 12 Featured Case ORDER; granting 8 Motion for Order to Appoint Monitoring Trustees, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/11/08. (hs)
March 27, 2008 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries 10 Affidavit, 11 MOTION for Order [Proposed], 9 Memorandum were entered in error as separate entries and have been added to Docket Entry 8 Motion for Order. (nmw, )
March 26, 2008 11 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Order [Proposed] by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahnke, Robert) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
March 26, 2008 10 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT re 8 MOTION for Order to Appoint Monitoring Trustees by Robert P. Mahnke by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mahnke, Robert) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
March 26, 2008 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM re 8 MOTION for Order to Appoint Monitoring Trustees filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mahnke, Robert) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
March 26, 2008 8 MOTION for Order to Appoint Monitoring Trustees by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahnke, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (nmw, ).
February 22, 2008 7 Featured Case ASSET PRESERVATION STIPULATION AND ORDER, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/20/08. (hs)
February 19, 2008 6 NOTICE Proposed Final Judgment and Proposed Asset Preservation Stipulation and Order (Redacted) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Asset Preservation Stipulation and Order (Redacted))(lc, )
February 19, 2008 5 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (lc, )
February 19, 2008 4 MEMORANDUM concerning Tunney Act Procedures required before entry of final judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (lc, )
February 19, 2008 3 Stipulated MOTION to Place Under Seal Schedules 2, 3 and 4 to the Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, )
February 19, 2008 SUMMONS Not Issued as to THOMSON CORPORATION, REUTERS GROUP, PLC (lc, )
February 19, 2008 2 COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (lc, )
February 19, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against THOMSON CORPORATION, REUTERS GROUP, PLC filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service)(lc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THOMSON CORPORATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert P. Mahnke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMSON CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REUTERS GROUP, PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]