IN RE: GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION Featured Case

Coordinates and manages all cases involving Guantanamo Bay detainees that have been filed or may be filed in the future.

 
Case Number: 1:2008mc00442
Filed: July 2, 2008
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Thomas F. Hogan
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 1977 NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITIONER'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT ON THE RECORD by MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH (Butler, Jeff)
October 18, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER updating the active case number list. The parties shall ensure that only active civil case numbers are used when filing documents that are intended to be docketed in this miscellaneous case AND all active individual civil cases. As of today's date, the Court's records reflect that the case numbers for the active civil cases are as follows: 02-cv-0828, 04-cv-1136, 04-cv-1164, 04-cv-1194, 04-cv-1254, 04-cv-1937, 04-cv-2022, 04-cv-2215, 05-cv-0023, 05-cv-0247, 05-cv-0270, 05-cv-0280, 05-cv-0329, 05-cv-0359, 05-cv-0392, 05-cv-0492, 05-cv-0520, 05-cv-0526, 05-cv-0569, 05-cv-0634, 05-cv-0748, 05-cv-0764, 05-cv-0877, 05-cv-0883, 05-cv-0889, 05-cv-0892, 05-cv-0993, 05-cv-0994, 05-cv-0999, 05-cv-1048, 05-cv-1124, 05-cv-1189, 05-cv-1220, 05-cv-1244, 05-cv-1353, 05-cv-1429, 05-cv-1457, 05-cv-1490, 05-cv-1497, 05-cv-1504, 05-cv-1555, 05-cv-1592, 05-cv-1601, 05-cv-1607, 05-cv-1623, 05-cv-1638, 05-cv-1645, 05-cv-1646, 05-cv-1971, 05-cv-1983, 05-cv-2088, 05-cv-2104, 05-cv-2185, 05-cv-2186, 05-cv-2199, 05-cv-2249, 05-cv-2349, 05-cv-2367, 05-cv-2371, 05-cv-2379, 05-cv-2380, 05-cv-2384, 05-cv-2385, 05-cv-2386, 05-cv-2387, 05-cv-2479, 06-cv-1668, 06-cv-1684, 06-cv-1690, 06-cv-1761, 06-cv-1765, 06-cv-1766, 06-cv-1767, 07-cv-1710, 07-cv-2337, 07-cv-2338, 08-cv-1101, 08-cv-1207, 08-cv-1224, 08-cv-1228, 08-cv-1233, 08-cv-1235, 08-cv-1237, 08-cv-1238, 08-cv-1360, 08-cv-1440, 08-cv-1789, 08-cv-1805, 08-cv-1828, 08-cv-1923, 08-cv-2019, 08-cv-2083, 09-cv-0031, 09-cv-0745, 09-cv-0873, 09-cv-0904, 09-cv-1332, 09-cv-1385, 09-cv-2368, 10-cv-0407. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 18, 2010. (lctfh2)
October 7, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Partially Closed hearing held on 10/7/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (lin, )
October 5, 2010 1976 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Rashkind, Paul)
October 1, 2010 1975 STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK H. OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa)
September 28, 2010 1974 NOTICE of Sealed Filing (Reply to Resps. Oppn. to Mot. to Lift Stay) by AHMED BEN BACHA, NABIL (Crider, Cori)
September 15, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER staying the Court's July 27, 2010 Order 1967 pending the hearing scheduled to take place on October 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 15, 2010. (lctfh2)
September 1, 2010 1973 NOTICE of Filing MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING ACCESS TO CLASSIFIED NATIONAL SECURITY INFORMATION & ACKNOWLEDGMENT by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Rashkind, Paul)
August 27, 2010 1972 Featured Case SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/27/10.(jeb, )
August 24, 2010 1971 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rashkind, Paul)
August 20, 2010 1970 MOTION to Lift Stay and Set Schedule for Proceeding to Hearing in these Cases by AHMED BELBACHA, and NABIL HADJARAB (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(dr)
August 19, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmm, )
August 19, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER scheduling a hearing regarding the pending Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns 1942 . The hearing shall take place on October 7, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on August 19, 2010. (lctfh2)
August 18, 2010 1969 NOTICE of Filing of Mahika Roy of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
July 30, 2010 1968 NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 27, 2010 1967 Featured Case ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. (lin, )
July 13, 2010 1966 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Remes, David)
July 9, 2010 1965 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
July 7, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1963 Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 7, 2010. (lctfh2)
July 1, 2010 1964 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 1, 2010 1963 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 29, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1962 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/2010. (lctfh2)
June 23, 2010 1962 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 16, 2010 1961 Featured Case Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 1959 Notice of Appeal,. (dr)
June 15, 2010 1960 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (re: Dkt. No. 178 in Case No. 08-cv-1153) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE (Dixon, J.)
June 15, 2010 1959 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order, (174 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK) Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Dixon, J.)
June 9, 2010 1958 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PETITIONERS, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA. Attorney Anna Elizabeth Cross terminated. (Cross, Anna)
June 9, 2010 1957 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING OF RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISASSOCIATION (ISN 893) by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George)
June 9, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to ensure that only active civil case numbers are used when filing documents that are intended to be docketed in this miscellaneous case AND all active individual civil cases. As of today's date, the Court's records reflect that the case numbers for the active civil cases are as follows: 02-cv-0828, 04-cv-1136, 04-cv-1164, 04-cv-1194, 04-cv-1254, 04-cv-1937, 04-cv-2022, 04-cv-2215, 05-cv-0023, 05-cv-0247, 05-cv-0270, 05-cv-0280, 05-cv-0329, 05-cv-0359, 05-cv-0392, 05-cv-0492, 05-cv-0520, 05-cv-0526, 05-cv-0569, 05-cv-0634, 05-cv-0748, 05-cv-0764, 05-cv-0877, 05-cv-0883, 05-cv-0889, 05-cv-0892, 05-cv-0993, 05-cv-0994, 05-cv-0999, 05-cv-1048, 05-cv-1124, 05-cv-1189, 05-cv-1220, 05-cv-1244, 05-cv-1353, 05-cv-1429, 05-cv-1457, 05-cv-1490, 05-cv-1497, 05-cv-1504, 05-cv-1555, 05-cv-1592, 05-cv-1601, 05-cv-1607, 05-cv-1623, 05-cv-1638, 05-cv-1645, 05-cv-1646, 05-cv-1971, 05-cv-1983, 05-cv-2088, 05-cv-2104, 05-cv-2185, 05-cv-2186, 05-cv-2199, 05-cv-2249, 05-cv-2349, 05-cv-2367, 05-cv-2371, 05-cv-2379, 05-cv-2380, 05-cv-2384, 05-cv-2385, 05-cv-2386, 05-cv-2387, 05-cv-2479, 06-cv-1668, 06-cv-1684, 06-cv-1690, 06-cv-1761, 06-cv-1765, 06-cv-1766, 06-cv-1767, 07-cv-1710, 07-cv-2337, 07-cv-2338, 08-cv-1101, 08-cv-1207, 08-cv-1224, 08-cv-1228, 08-cv-1233, 08-cv-1235, 08-cv-1237, 08-cv-1238, 08-cv-1360, 08-cv-1440, 08-cv-1789, 08-cv-1805, 08-cv-1828, 08-cv-1923, 08-cv-2019, 08-cv-2083, 09-cv-0031, 09-cv-0745, 09-cv-0873, 09-cv-0904, 09-cv-1332, 09-cv-1385, 09-cv-2368. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 9, 2010. (lctfh2) Modified on 6/25/2010 to remove two case number that are not GTMO cases. (lctfh2).
June 4, 2010 1956 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINT EXHIBIT LIST by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George)
June 3, 2010 1955 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Joint Response by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re 1942 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.)
June 1, 2010 1954 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information By Vicki Werneke by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
May 14, 2010 1953 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING OF JOINT PRE-HEARING STATEMENT WHICH INCLUDES NOTIFICATION OF PETITIONERS PARTICIPATION by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George)
May 13, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1952 Respondents' Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors. Accordingly, the respondents' consolidated reply brief shall be due to be filed on or before June 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 13, 2010. (lctfh2)
May 12, 2010 1952 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors re (254 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
May 4, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Respone to the Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. Accordingly, the petitioners consolidated response shall be due to be filed on or before June 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 4, 2010. (lctfh2)
May 3, 2010 1951 Featured Case RESPONSE re 1942 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Filing of Coordinated Motion: Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns filed with permission by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Schulz)(Bead, Jeanette)
April 30, 2010 1950 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin)
April 19, 2010 1947 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Clarke, Rachael)
April 19, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By Monday, May 3, 2010, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns [Dkt. No. 1942, 08-mc-442]. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 19, 2010 1946 Featured Case SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zlin, )
April 19, 2010 1945 Featured Case SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10.(zlin, )
April 19, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's April 1, 2010 Memorandum Opinion [Dkt. No. 119, 08-mc-0444], the habeas petition filed by Petitioner Mohammed Sulaymon Barre (ISN 567) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Any non-habeas claims included in his habeas petition are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 19, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Based on Judge Hogan's order denying Petitioner Belbacha's (ISN 290) Motion for Reconsideration, the following motions are hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT: Joint Motion Regarding Briefing Schedule [Dkt. No. 174, 05-cv-2349]; Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Administrative Stay [Dkt. No. 181, 05-cv-2349]. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 19, 2010 1944 Featured Case ORDER denying Petitioner Ahmed Belbacha's (ISN 290) Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 19, 2010 1943 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 7, 2010 Featured Case MANDATE RECALLED dated 4/17/09 re 1769 USCA Mandate, and returned to U.S. Court of Appeals pursuant to their Order. (ks)
April 7, 2010 1941 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 666 Notice of Appeal, filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER ; USCA Case Number 08-5424. It is ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that the court's mandate be recalled. The Clerk, United States District Court for the District of Columbia is requested to return the mandate forthwith to the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit. (kb)
April 5, 2010 1938 Featured Case Emergency MOTION for Order administratively enjoining Respondents from attempting to transfer Mr. Belbacha to Algeria before the Court decides his emergency motion of March 7, 2010 on the merits, by AHMED BEN BACHA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - DOJ Media Advisory,, # 2 Exhibit B - Email from Andrew Warden, # 3 Exhibit C - Email from David Remes, # 4 Text of Proposed Order granting emergency motion for administrative stay)(rdj) (Dkt. No. 181 in 05-cv-2349, 1938 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH)
April 5, 2010 1937 Featured Case NOTICE re 1938 of Filing of Incorrect Emergency Motion [Dkt. 181] and substitution of correct Emergency Motion by AHMED BEN BACHA (Remes, David) Modified on 4/5/2010 to enhance text (rdj). (Dkt. No. 182 in 05-cv-2349, 1937 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH)
March 31, 2010 1936 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information & Acknowledgment by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Memorandum of Understanding, # 2 Exhibit B: Acknowledgment)(Escalante, Karen)
March 29, 2010 1935 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information By Rhonda Huczel by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
March 29, 2010 1934 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Hart, Andy)
March 29, 2010 1933 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Grill, Donna)
March 29, 2010 1932 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
March 26, 2010 1931 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL re (1927 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.)
March 24, 2010 1930 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re 1919 MOTION for Reconsideration of Feb. 4, 2010 Order to Reconsider or Vacate filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Remes, David)
March 24, 2010 1929 Featured Case STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean)
March 24, 2010 1928 Featured Case SEALED NOTICE filed by RESPONDENTS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
March 24, 2010 1927 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Of Protected Information - Notice Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Respondents' Opposition To Petitioners' Emergency Motion by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew)
March 19, 2010 1926 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , to reset filing deadline for Petitioner's reply to Doc. 1919, and for other relief by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Tara)
March 17, 2010 1925 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Emergency Motion by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL re (1911 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.)
March 15, 2010 1924 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT re 1923 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
March 15, 2010 1923 Featured Case NOTICE of filing - Respondents' Opposition to Emergency Motion by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew)
March 10, 2010 1922 Featured Case SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/9/10.(gdf)
March 10, 2010 1921 Featured Case ORDER denying in part Emergency Motion to Reconsider (Dkt. No. 168, 05-cv-2349). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/9/10. (lctfh1)
March 8, 2010 1920 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Exhibits C - E in Support of Emergency Motion to Reconsider or Vacate February 4, 2010 Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Crider, Cori)
March 8, 2010 1919 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration of Feb. 4, 2010 Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - June 13, 2008 Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Oct. 28, 2008 Order, # 3 Exhibit F - June 10, 2008 Order, # 4 Exhibit G - Petr's Motion to Govern, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Crider, Cori)
March 5, 2010 1918 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order (Grill, Donna)
March 5, 2010 1917 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
March 5, 2010 1916 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Rhonda Huczel by ADEL AL HAKEEMY re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
March 5, 2010 1915 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by ADEL AL HAKEEMY re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Hart, Andy)
March 5, 2010 1914 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by ADEL AL HAKEEMY re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Grill, Donna)
March 5, 2010 1913 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by ADEL AL HAKEEMY re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward)
March 4, 2010 1912 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITIONER AL-BIHANIS (ISN 893) OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE RECORD by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Clarke, George)
March 1, 2010 1911 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Emergency Motion by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL (Dixon, J.)
February 17, 2010 1910 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Blume, Kevin)
February 5, 2010 1909 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Rhonda Huczel by MUHAMMED RAHIM re (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Warner, Carlos)
February 5, 2010 1908 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by MUHAMMED RAHIM re (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Warner, Carlos)
February 4, 2010 1907 Featured Case SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/4/10.(zlin, )
February 4, 2010 1906 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Warner, Carlos)
February 4, 2010 1905 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH) Order (Hart, Andy)
February 4, 2010 1904 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order (Thompson, Darin)
February 4, 2010 1903 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order (Thompson, Darin)
February 4, 2010 1902 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by MUHAMMED RAHIM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Warner, Carlos)
February 1, 2010 1901 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Herman on behalf of GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Herman, Carl)
January 22, 2010 1900 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI. (Pollack, Barry)
January 22, 2010 1899 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Pollack on behalf of TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI (Pollack, Barry)
January 21, 2010 1898 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Julia)
January 21, 2010 1897 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return by BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Berman, Julia)
January 14, 2010 1896 Featured Case ORDER denying 1868 Press Intervenors' Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/10. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2010 re 1868 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner) (tg, )
January 12, 2010 1895 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. re 1894 Notice (Other) filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zkb)
January 12, 2010 1894 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Gilligan, James)
December 30, 2009 1893 Featured Case NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean)
December 22, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on Press Intervenors' Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt (Dkt. No. 1868) is hereby rescheduled for Thursday, January 14, 2010, at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/22/09. (lctfh1)
December 17, 2009 1892 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. re 1890 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
December 17, 2009 1891 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Wolfe, Kristina)
December 17, 2009 1890 Featured Case NOTICE Filing Under Seal (Status Report regarding ISN 311) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Levin, Scott)
December 16, 2009 1889 Featured Case SEALED MOTION filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(zdr)
December 15, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: On Monday, January 11, 2010, at 2:00 pm, Respondents and Press Intervenors shall appear for a hearing on Press Intervenors' Motion For An Order To Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt (Dkt. No. 1868) in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/15/09. (lctfh1)
December 4, 2009 1888 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Reply by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN re (233 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1880 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.)
December 3, 2009 1887 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order (Thompson, Darin)
December 2, 2009 1886 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return (ISN 10029) by TOM COPERMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Johnson, Timothy)
November 30, 2009 1885 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM (Van Horn, Daniel)
November 30, 2009 1884 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO (Davis, Patrick)
November 30, 2009 1883 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re 1868 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Bead, Jeanette)
November 19, 2009 1882 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (940 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order Respondents' Statement of Legal Justification for Detention filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Government's Detention Authority Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of the Attorney General)(Folio, Joseph)
November 19, 2009 1881 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Folio, Joseph)
November 19, 2009 1880 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Dixon, J.)
November 18, 2009 1879 Featured Case NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission of Classified Supplement to Respondents Opposition to the Press Intervenors Motion for an Order To Show Cause by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re 1878 Memorandum in Opposition, (Gilligan, James)
November 18, 2009 1878 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re 1868 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terry M. Henry, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
November 17, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1877 Respondents' Unopposed Motion For a Second, One-Day Enlargement of Time. Respondents shall have until November 18, 2009, to file their opposition to the press intervenors' motion for an order to show cause. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/17/09. (lctfh1)
November 17, 2009 1877 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Motion by Press Intervenors for Order To Show Cause by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
November 6, 2009 1876 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Haas, Alexander)
November 6, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1871 Respondents' Motion For Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Motion By Press Intervenors For An Order to Show Cause. Respondents shall have until November 17, 2009, to file their opposition to press intervenors' motion. No further extensions of time will be granted absent exceptional cause. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/6/09. (lctfh1)
November 5, 2009 1875 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER OF KEVIN BOGUCKI by MUHAMMED RAHIM (Bogucki, Kevin)
November 2, 2009 1874 Featured Case NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioners Ahmad Tourson (ISN 201), Abdul Ghappar Abdul Rahman (ISN 281), Edham Mamet (ISN 102), Anwar Hassan (ISN 250), Dawut Abdurehim (ISN 289), and Adel Noori (ISN 584) by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Warden, Andrew)
October 30, 2009 1873 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re Motion Hearing,, (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Warner, Carlos)
October 21, 2009 1872 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to Government's Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Bead, Jeanette)
October 20, 2009 1871 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1868 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today (Respondents Motion for Enlargement of Time To Respond toMotion by Press Intervenors for an Order to Show Cause Why the Government Should Not Be Held in Contempt) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
October 13, 2009 1870 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin)
October 13, 2009 1869 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Thompson, Darin)
October 6, 2009 1868 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why The Government Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Schulz in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Schulz Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Schulz Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C-Part 1 to Schulz Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C-Part 2 to Schulz Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Schulz Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Schulz Declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bead, Jeanette)
October 5, 2009 1867 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return for ISN 934 by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Barish, Daniel)
October 2, 2009 1866 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Hart, Andy)
October 2, 2009 1865 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Cleary, Amy)
October 2, 2009 1864 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Bryan, Edward)
October 1, 2009 1863 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Daly, Karen)
October 1, 2009 1862 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Werneke, Vicki)
October 1, 2009 1861 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Warner, Carlos)
October 1, 2009 1860 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Davis, Jillian)
October 1, 2009 1859 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin)
September 28, 2009 1858 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Motion for Order... by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
September 17, 2009 1857 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL, AHMED BEN BACHA, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (242 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 256 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 158 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 243 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 198 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 1436 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Dixon, J.)
September 17, 2009 1856 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re Order,, (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Warner, Carlos)
September 16, 2009 1854 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re Order,, (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Thompson, Darin)
September 16, 2009 1853 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re Order,, (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Hart, Andy)
September 16, 2009 1852 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing the Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MUHAMMED RAHIM re Order,, (1481 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (Warner, Carlos)
September 14, 2009 1851 Featured Case SEALED RESPONSE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zkb)
September 11, 2009 1850 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment [executed by Stewart D. Fried] by ALI LNU, SHARAF AL SANANI (Clay, A.)
September 11, 2009 1849 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment [executed by Stewart D. Fried] by SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA (Clay, A.)
September 10, 2009 1848 Featured Case RESPONDENT'S SEALED NOTICE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zkb)
September 9, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Improper Respondents (Dkt. No. 723, 08-mc-0442). In light of subsequent rulings by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and pending matters before this Court that are related to the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/9/09. (lctfh1)
September 3, 2009 1847 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Stay "Petitioner's Notice of Consent to Stay Pending Executive Review and Unopposed Motion for Stay" by SHARAF AL SANANI (Schulof, Daniel)
September 2, 2009 1846 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Reply to Rule to Show Cause by ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI re (1841 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Sealed Document, (262 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 1299 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL) Sealed Document (Gorman, H.) Modified on 9/3/2009 to correct linkage (tr, ).
August 31, 2009 1845 Featured Case RESPONDENT'S SEALED OPPOSITION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zkb)
August 28, 2009 1855 Featured Case SEALED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION filed by ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
August 28, 2009 1844 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
August 18, 2009 1843 Featured Case ORDER that the Parties shall meet and confer to narrow or resolve Petitioner's requests for discovery pursuant to Section I.E.2 of the Case Management Order, as amended, relating to certain medical records associated with Petitioner's interrogations, photo spreads, interpreter qualifications and proficiency, specific areas of exculpatory information which Petitioner will identify, and issues associated with Petitioner's Motion to Compel relating to the discovery the Court has already ordered pursuant to its February 6, 2009 Order. If the Parties resolve Petitioner's requests and issues, the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before 9/9/2009, indicating the date by which Respondents will produce the discovery agreed upon to Petitioner. If any of Petitioner's requests or any of these issues remain unresolved, Petitioner will file a Motion to Compel Consolidated Discovery on or before 9/9/2009. Respondents shall file an opposition on or before 9/23/2009, and Petitioner shall file a reply on or before 10/5/2009. Respondents shall file a Reply to Petitioner's Response and Supplemental Response to Respondents' 3/13/2009 "Refined" Position as to Their Detention Authority on or before 9/9/2009. Respondents shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 9/23/2009, proposing a date by which they would be able to produce to Petitioner all additional documents on which Respondents intend to rely to rebut the arguments raised in Petitioner's Traverse. The Court shall set additional dates by separate Order for the Parties to submit trial briefs and for a pre-trial hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/15/09. (dot, )
August 17, 2009 1841 Featured Case SEALED MOTION filed by ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztr)
August 14, 2009 1842 Featured Case SEALED REPLY (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
August 14, 2009 1840 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing -- Reply Memorandum by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew)
August 7, 2009 1839 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return for ISN 934 by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO re (11 in 1:09-cv-00904-RMC) Notice (Other) (Soanes, Sherry)
August 7, 2009 1838 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Stay by ABDURAHMAN LNU (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Cleary, Amy)
August 5, 2009 1837 Featured Case SEALED REPLY filed by ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 31, 2009 1836 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOTAI SAIB, NABIL, AHMED BEN BACHA, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1829 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Sealed Order (Dixon, J.)
July 30, 2009 1835 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order by MUHAMMED RAHIM. (Thompson, Darin)
July 30, 2009 1834 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order by MUHAMMED RAHIM. (Warner, Carlos)
July 30, 2009 1833 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order by MUHAMMED RAHIM. (Hart, Andy)
July 21, 2009 1832 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Petitioner's Reply To Government's Opposition To Motion To Compel Discovery Regarding Competence, Knowledge And Voluntariness by EDRESS LNU re (1266 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL) Reply to opposition to Motion, (Thompson, Darin)
July 20, 2009 1830 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information & Acknowledgment by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kolakowski, John)
July 20, 2009 1829 Featured Case SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zlin, )
July 17, 2009 1831 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by HAJJI NASSIM. (tr)
July 17, 2009 1828 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order filed by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED. (Hart, Andy)
July 16, 2009 1827 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM. (Remes, David)
July 14, 2009 1826 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgement of Protective Order by MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, BILAL LNU (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Protective Order)(Moss, John)
July 13, 2009 1825 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, HAMID AL RAZAK, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Ryan, Peter)
July 10, 2009 1824 Featured Case SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 10, 2009 1823 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Of Protected Information by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 1822 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 10, 2009 1821 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 9, 2009 1820 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Unseal Status Report by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Crider, Cori)
July 9, 2009 1819 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Reply by ISMAIL MOHAMED re (57 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) Notice (Other) (Crider, Cori)
July 6, 2009 1818 Featured Case SEALED Joint Statement filed by FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, GEORGE W. BUSH.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(ztr)
July 1, 2009 1816 Featured Case MOTION For An Expedited Ruling On Petitioner's Motion For Direct Contact With Client re (1241 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL) MOTION For Direct Contact With Client by EDRESS LNU (Hart, Andy)
June 29, 2009 1817 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT - Petitioners' Response in Opposition to Respondents' Motion (05cv2386 and 08cv1221).(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ds)
June 29, 2009 1815 Featured Case SEALED OPPOSITION filed by KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
June 29, 2009 1814 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Response in Opposition to Motion by MOTAI SAIB (Winokur, Meghan) Modified on 8/27/2009 to change docket text and seal document pursuant to Protective order 409 at Counsel's request(rdj, ).
June 29, 2009 1813 Featured Case MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Competence, Knowledge, And Voluntariness by EDRESS LNU (Hart, Andy)
June 29, 2009 1812 Featured Case MOTION For Direct Contact With Client by EDRESS LNU (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Next Friend Authorization, # 2 Exhibit B- Grassian Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C- 20 July 2005 ARB, # 4 Exhibit D- 7 April 2006 ARB, # 5 Exhibit E- 17 April 2007 ARB, # 6 Exhibit F- Jennifer Cowan Declaration)(Hart, Andy)
June 29, 2009 1811 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1160 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL) MOTION to Dismiss Due To Lack Of Direct Detainee Authorization Of Representation filed by EDRESS LNU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Next Friend Authorization, # 2 Exhibit B-Grassian Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C-20 July 2005 ARB, # 4 Exhibit D- 7 April 2006 ARB, # 5 Exhibit E- 17 April 2007 ARB, # 6 Exhibit F- E-mail chain accommodation refusal)(Hart, Andy)
June 29, 2009 1810 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING PROTECTED INFORMATION by ALI LNU, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA (Schulof, Daniel)
June 26, 2009 1809 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Motion of June 15, 2009 by SAIF ULLAH (Crider, Cori)
June 23, 2009 1808 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Bryan, Edward)
June 23, 2009 1807 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 19 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB) Order by MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR. (Bryan, Edward)
June 23, 2009 1806 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Bryan, Edward)
June 23, 2009 1805 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Bryan, Edward)
June 22, 2009 1804 Featured Case NOTICE of Consent to Representation by SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Darold W. Killmer Regarding Saad Masir Mukbl Al Azani)(Rich, Sara)
June 22, 2009 1803 Featured Case NOTICE of Consent to Representation by ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Darold W. Killmer Regarding Abdul Rahman Al Qyati)(Rich, Sara)
June 22, 2009 1802 Featured Case STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Crider, Cori)
June 19, 2009 1800 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (217 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA) Notice (Other), (216 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA) MOTION (Dixon, J.)
June 18, 2009 1799 Featured Case NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI (Duncan, Theresa)
June 18, 2009 1798 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rich, Sara)
June 18, 2009 1797 Featured Case MOTION to Lift Stay re (1161 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL) Order on Motion to Stay by ABDURAHMAN LNU (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Werneke, Vicki)
June 17, 2009 1796 Featured Case NOTICE Notice of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI (Duncan, Theresa)
June 17, 2009 1795 Featured Case NOTICE MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING ACCESS TO CLASSIFIED NATIONAL SECURITY INFORMATION AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Natarajan, Ranjana)
June 15, 2009 1794 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Berman, Julia)
June 10, 2009 1793 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1)
June 10, 2009 1792 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM (Bronte, Patricia)
June 10, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 1755 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 1756 Motion for Order; denying 1757 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 1758 Motion for Order; denying 1777 Motion to Strike, by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/9/09. (hs)
June 10, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2009. Bench Opinion issued re 1777 MOTION to Strike, and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force, 1755 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., JAY HOOD, 1756 MOTION for CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, ZAKER CHAN, WADE F. DAVIS, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, 1758 MOTION for CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., 1757 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (hs)
June 9, 2009 1801 Featured Case SEALED SUPPLEMENT To Petitioner's Reply filed by ISMAIL MOHAMED.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ztr)
June 8, 2009 1791 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Undestanding by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memo of Understanding)(Rich, Sara)
June 8, 2009 Featured Case Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2009 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs)
June 5, 2009 1790 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (135 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH) MOTION for Order, (136 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH) MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BARACK OBAMA. (Henry, Terry)
June 5, 2009 1789 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry)
June 2, 2009 1788 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Davis, Jillian)
June 2, 2009 1787 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
June 2, 2009 1786 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Werneke, Vicki)
June 2, 2009 1785 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Cleary, Amy)
June 2, 2009 1784 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Warner, Carlos)
June 2, 2009 1783 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Thompson, Darin)
June 2, 2009 1782 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 235 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Order by ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI. (Hart, Andy)
June 1, 2009 1781 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 1780 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 1779 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Petitioner's Traverse by EDRESS LNU (Hart, Andy)
June 1, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Judge Hogan issued an order on December 1, 2008 dismissing the habeas petition in Civil Action No. 08-1085 because it was duplicative of the habeas proceeding on petitioner's behalf in Civil Action No. 08-1207. See Al-Nashiri v. Obama, Civil Action No. 08-1085, Order, Dkt. No. 71 (D.D.C. December 1, 2008). Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that all pending motions filed in Civil Action No. 08-1085 are denied as moot. In addition, the parties are hereby ordered to remove Civil Action No. 08-1085 from their omnibus filings in the Miscellaneous No. 08-0442 and to make all further filings related to petitioner Al-Nashiri in Civil Action No. 08-1207 only. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 1, 2009. (MA) Modified on 6/1/2009 to reflect that this Order was signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman (jeb, ).
May 30, 2009 1778 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (207 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW) MOTION for Order (Dixon, J.)
May 29, 2009 1777 Featured Case MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZA
May 28, 2009 1776 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A TRAVERSE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul)
May 28, 2009 1775 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (286 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF) Cross MOTION for Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
May 26, 2009 1774 Featured Case ORDER entering TS/SCI Protective Order in Civil Action No. 09-0873. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/26/09. (lctfh1)
May 26, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part Petitioners' Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines (Dkt. No. 1772, 08-mc-0442). Petitioners may file one consolidated opposition to the government's Motion for Reconsideration by Friday, May 29, 2009. The government may file a reply brief by Friday, June 5, 2009. The hearing date is reset from June 8, 2009 to June 9, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/26/09. (lctfh1)
May 26, 2009 1773 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Order to Stay Proceedings by ABD AL ZAHER (Wilson, Richard)
May 22, 2009 1772 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter)
May 22, 2009 1771 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
May 22, 2009 1770 Featured Case ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1)
May 20, 2009 1768 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Compel or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave To Seek Discovery by MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB (Ward, Michael)
May 20, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, May 27, 2009, petitioners shall file one consolidated opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force (Dkt No. 1755, 08-mc-0442). The government's reply is due by Wednesday, June 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/20/09. (lctfh1)
May 20, 2009 1767 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Bronte, Patricia)
May 19, 2009 1766 Featured Case MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
May 19, 2009 1765 Featured Case MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
May 18, 2009 1764 Featured Case MOTION to Strike 1755 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashkind, Paul)
May 18, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Government's Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures (Dkt. No. 1762, 08-mc-0442). The government is ordered to file its reply on or before Friday, May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 05/18/09. (lctfh1)
May 16, 2009 1763 Featured Case NOTICE -- RESPONDENTS' GLOBAL NOTICE REGARDING PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY INFORMATION by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Henry, Terry)
May 15, 2009 1762 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
May 14, 2009 1761 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI (Strauss, Lisa)
May 13, 2009 1760 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Errata Concerning Traverse by MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB (Fee, Jonathan)
May 13, 2009 1759 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Errata Concerning Traverse by ABDULAZIZ LNU (Fee, Jonathan)
May 13, 2009 1758 Featured Case MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 13, 2009 1757 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Guerra Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 13, 2009 1756 Featured Case MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, ZAKER CHAN, WADE F. DAVIS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Guerra Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 1755 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 11, 2009 1754 Featured Case RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWA
May 10, 2009 1753 Featured Case STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
May 8, 2009 1752 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OMAR KHADR. (Thompson, Karl)
May 6, 2009 1751 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memoranda of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding by Karen E. Abravanel, # 2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding by Patrick M. Dowd)(Curnin, Paul)
May 6, 2009 1750 Featured Case NOTICE of Written Authorization by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Curnin, Paul)
May 6, 2009 1749 Featured Case ORDER vacating March 18, 2009 Order to Show Cause. The show cause hearing scheduled for May 11, 2009 is canceled. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/06/09. (lctfh1)
May 4, 2009 1748 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Traverse of Mohammad Ahmed Salam Al Khateeb by MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB (Fee, Jonathan)
May 4, 2009 1747 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Traverse of Abdulaziz LNU by ABDULAZIZ LNU (Fee, Jonathan)
May 4, 2009 1746 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Obtain Written Authorization filed by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Andy)
May 1, 2009 1745 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew)
May 1, 2009 1744 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Stay by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
April 30, 2009 1743 Featured Case NOTICE of Public Filing of Updated Memoranda of Understanding (J. Wells Dixon and Jessica Baen) by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1688 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 162 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW) Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Dixon, J.)
April 28, 2009 1742 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Stay by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
April 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 1724 Petitioner Mingazov's Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 27, 2009. (NP)
April 24, 2009 1769 Featured Case MANDATE RECALLED PURSUANT TO USCA ORDER DATED 4/7/10.....MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 666 Notice of Appeal, filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER ; USCA Case Number 08-5424. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby reversed and the cases are remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(zkb) Modified on 4/22/2010 (ks).
April 23, 2009 1741 Featured Case MOTION To Discharge The Court's Order To Show Cause by AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bronte, Patricia)
April 22, 2009 1740 Featured Case NOTICE of Inadvertent Filing in Case No. 08-0442 by SHAFIIQ (Voorhees, Danielle)
April 22, 2009 1739 Featured Case NOTICE of Inadvertent Filing in Case No. 08-0442 by MOTAI SAIB re (213 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC) Notice (Other), (214 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC) MOTION for Leave to File (Voorhees, Danielle)
April 21, 2009 1738 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Record by SHAFIIQ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Voorhees, Danielle)
April 21, 2009 1737 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Record by MOTAI SAIB (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Voorhees, Danielle)
April 21, 2009 1736 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by SHAFIIQ (Voorhees, Danielle)
April 21, 2009 1735 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by MOTAI SAIB (Voorhees, Danielle)
April 21, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dkt No. 1720, 08-mc-0442; Dkt. No. 144, 05-cv-0765). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/21/09. (lctfh1)
April 20, 2009 1734 Featured Case ORDER granting (120) Privilege Team's Motion to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner's Manuscript in case 1:05-cv-00569-JR;(512)in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 4/20/09. (lcak1)
April 20, 2009 1733 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 20, 2009 1732 Featured Case ORDER granting 1730 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/09. (lin, )
April 17, 2009 1731 Featured Case RESPONSE re (1700 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1700 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 139 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 139 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS) Order, Set Hearings Privilege Team's Opposition to Interim Response to Order to Show Cause filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stafford Smith Salon Radio Interview)(Van Horn, Daniel)
April 16, 2009 1730 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James)
April 15, 2009 1729 Featured Case ORDER. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Habeas Petition Without Prejudice or, Alternatively, to Hold Petition in Abeyance Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See 91 in case 1:05-cv-01244-CKK; 1400 in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. The Government may re-file its motion, if appropriate, upon referral of the charges sworn against Petitioner to a military commission. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 15, 2009. (lcckk2 )
April 13, 2009 1728 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Emergency Supplemental Motion for Preservation Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
April 13, 2009 1727 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Praecipe and Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Jessica Baen (Paralegal) by MOTAI SAIB (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MacLean, Emilou)
April 13, 2009 1726 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MOTAI SAIB (MacLean, Emilou)
April 13, 2009 1725 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by MOTAI SAIB (Voorhees, Danielle)
April 10, 2009 1724 Featured Case MOTION Entry of a Scheduling Order by RAVIL MINGAZOV (Lefrak, Allison)
April 10, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures (Dkt. No. 1705, 08-mc-0442). Petitioners are granted until May 11, 2009, to file a consolidated opposition to the government's motion to amend. The government is directed to file its reply within five days after Petitioners' opposition is filed. While the government's motion to amend the protective orders and counsel access procedures (Dkt. No. 1684, 08-mc-0442) is pending, the Court suspends its orders of January 15, 2009 and January 30, 2009, to the extent they permit a detainee besides Petitioner Tariq Alsawam (ISN 535) to review documents that contain classified statements made by the detainee to agents of the United States government. This suspension may be superseded by Merits Judges entering such orders as they deem necessary in individual cases. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/10/09. (lctfh1)
April 9, 2009 1722 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Traverse, Unopposed MOTION to Stay re (54 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 54 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 54 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC) Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion for Certification for Interlocatory Appeal,, Order on Motion to Stay, (1315 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1315 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1315 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion for Certification for Interlocatory Appeal,, Order on Motion to Stay, by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Hart, Andy)
April 8, 2009 1721 Featured Case RESPONSE / Interim Response to Order to Show Cause re (Dkt. 137, No. 05-cv-0765) Order to Show Cause filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBruin, David)
April 8, 2009 1720 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas P. Sullivan and Patricia Bronte, :Firm- Jenner and Block, :Address- 330 N. Wabash Avenue; Chicago, IL, 60611-7603. Phone No. - (312) 923-2928. Fax No. - (312) 840-7368 by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas P.Sullivan, # 2 Declaration of Patricia Bronte, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBruin, David) Modified on 4/15/2009 entering the correct attorneys and address(td, ).
April 8, 2009 1719 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by David W. DeBruin on behalf of GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (DeBruin, David)
April 8, 2009 1718 Featured Case NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Henry, Terry)
April 8, 2009 1717 Featured Case NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 7, 2009 1716 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Of Acknowledgment by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Bronte, Patricia)
April 7, 2009 1715 Featured Case ORDER denying (108) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-02371-UNA; denying (1528) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/7/2009. (lcrcl1, )
April 3, 2009 1714 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return by ROBERT GATES (Ahern, Paul)
April 3, 2009 1713 Featured Case NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1526, 08-mc-0442). For the reasons set forth during the hearing on March 26, 2009, Press Applicants are permitted to intervene only to oppose the government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1416, 08-mc-0442) before this Court. This order does not permit Press Applicants to intervene in any case before the Merits Judges. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/02/09. (lctfh1)
April 2, 2009 1712 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by ABU RAWDA, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY. (Marshall, David)
April 2, 2009 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings : Telephone Status Conference reset for 4/20/09 at 4:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
April 1, 2009 1711 Featured Case RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
April 1, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re (120 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR) Privilege Team's MOTION for Order to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner's Manuscript. At the request of counsel, the follow up Telephone Status Conference currently set for 4/9/09 is reset for Monday 4/20/09 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 4/1/09. (lcak1)
March 31, 2009 1710 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Hina Shamsi, by SAKI BACHA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
March 31, 2009 1709 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul)
March 31, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1703 Motion to Withdraw 1701 Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/31/09. (lcrmu2)
March 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Return (Dkt. No. 129, 08-cv-01360). The government is ORDERED to file the factual return for Zayn Al Abidin Muhammed Husayn (ISN 10016) on or before April 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/27/09. (lctfh1)
March 26, 2009 1708 Featured Case NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Henry, Terry)
March 26, 2009 1707 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI (MacLean, Emilou)
March 26, 2009 1706 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return (ISN 10016) by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James)
March 25, 2009 1723 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Petitioner Saifullah Paracha's motion for summary judgment (#28 in 04-2022) and renewed motion for summary judgment (#224 in 04-2022). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/25/2009. (mm)
March 25, 2009 Featured Case Set/Reset Hearings : Telephone Status Conference set for 4/9/09 at 4:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
March 24, 2009 1705 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Thompson, Darin)
March 24, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re (120 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR) Privilege Team's MOTION for Order to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner's Manuscript. A follow up Telephone Status Conference is set for Thursday 4/9/09 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/24/09. (lcak1)
March 23, 2009 1704 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Young, Frederick)
March 23, 2009 1703 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw 1701 MOTION for Order Scheduling Status Conference, or, in the Alternative, Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing of Traverse by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
March 20, 2009 1702 Featured Case NOTICE of petitioner's signed authorization by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK; (FILED UNDER SEAL) (td, )
March 18, 2009 1701 Featured Case MOTION for Order Scheduling Status Conference, or, in the Alternative, Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing of Traverse by ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA (Kadidal, Shayana)
March 18, 2009 1700 Featured Case ORDER setting show cause hearing for May 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1)
March 18, 2009 1699 Featured Case ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1)
March 16, 2009 1698 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH) Order by MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA. (Warner, Carlos)
March 16, 2009 1697 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC) Order by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED. (Hart, Andy)
March 16, 2009 1696 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Thompson, Darin)
March 16, 2009 1695 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Werneke, Vicki)
March 16, 2009 1694 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 19 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB) Order by MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR. (Werneke, Vicki)
March 13, 2009 1693 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification filed by MOHAMMED KAMEEN. (Kadidal, Shayana)
March 13, 2009 1692 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing (Opposition to Respondents Motion for Extension of Time to File the Factual Return) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
March 13, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification (Dkt. No. 1655, 08-mc-0442). Respondents are granted a final extension of time, until March 20, 2009, to file the legal justification statements for ISNs 49 (05-cv-2386), 259 (06-cv-1766), 335 (08-cv-1230), 10020 (06-cv-1690), and 10027 (08-cv-1789). Respondents are also granted a final extension of time, until March 31, 2009, to file factual returns AND legal justification statements for ISNs 54 (04-cv-1937), 768 (05-cv-2371), 900 (05-cv-2385), and 10015 (08-cv-1207). Respondents are not required to file factual returns for ISNs 1045 (05-cv-2385) and 10018 (08-cv-2083) while the authorization issues with those petitions remain unresolved. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/13/09. (lctfh1)
March 13, 2009 1691 Featured Case NOTICE Pursuant to Court's December 11, 2008 Order Requiring Filing of Signed Authorization by ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Killmer, Darold)
March 13, 2009 1690 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman)
March 13, 2009 1689 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman)
March 12, 2009 1688 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Updated Memoranda of Understanding (J. Wells Dixon and Jessica Baen) by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Dixon, J.)
March 12, 2009 1687 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Berman, Julia)
March 12, 2009 1686 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Stay by ALI LNU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulof, Daniel)
March 11, 2009 1685 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia)
March 11, 2009 1684 Featured Case MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia)
March 10, 2009 1683 Featured Case NOTICE of Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Petitioner's Traverse to the Government's Factual Return to his Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Lefrak, Allison)
March 10, 2009 1682 Featured Case NOTICE of Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Request for Disclosure, Motion to Compel, and Motion for Discovery by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (Lefrak, Allison)
March 10, 2009 1681 Featured Case ERRATA to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Habeas Petition Without Prejudice or, Alternatively, to Hold Petition in Abeyance Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 9, 2009 1680 Featured Case ORDER in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (81) Motion to Stay in case 1:08-cv-01221-CKK. This case shall be stayed until June 22, 2009. Respondents' obligation to produce additional exculpatory evidence pursuant to section I.D. of the Amended Casement Management Order shall remain in effect during the stay. The Protective Order remains in effect during the stay. Either party may move the Court to lift the stay at any time and on any grounds provided the moving party gives the non-moving party written notice ten (10) days prior to the date of filing the motion. The parties shall file a joint status report on June 22, 2009, advising the Court of any change in circumstances and, if circumstances have not changed, proposing changes to the Amended Case Management Order and requesting a status conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/9/09. (dot, )
March 9, 2009 1679 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent/Clarification Regarding Stay of Proceedings in Petitioner's Case by ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI (Charlick, Shereen)
March 9, 2009 1678 Featured Case STATUS REPORT and Joint Motion for a Stay by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 9, 2009 1677 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Return as "Protected" by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 9, 2009 1676 Featured Case MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns to Include Additional Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 6, 2009 1675 Featured Case STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, RIAD NARGERI. (Kadidal, Shayana)
March 6, 2009 1674 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Order, Joint Response to the Court's February 23, 2009 Minute Order filed by MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
March 6, 2009 1673 Featured Case ERRATA declaration of Scott L. Fenstermaker, Esq. correcting factual misstatement in document number 1666 by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION 1624 First MOTION for Leave to File letter from Petitioner to Counsel under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Fenstermaker, Scott)
March 6, 2009 1672 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC) Order by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED. (Hart, Andy)
March 6, 2009 1671 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Thompson, Darin)
March 6, 2009 1670 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 19 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB) Order by MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR. (Werneke, Vicki)
March 6, 2009 1669 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Werneke, Vicki)
March 6, 2009 1668 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH) Order by MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA. (Warner, Carlos)
March 6, 2009 1667 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (1531 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 71 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF) MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re (1529 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 70 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re (1529 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 70 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss, (1529 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 70 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO. (Wolfe, Kristina)
March 5, 2009 1666 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re 1624 First MOTION for Leave to File letter from Petitioner to Counsel under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Fenstermaker, Scott)
March 5, 2009 1665 Featured Case NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DUPLICATE FILED MOTION by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re 1664 MOTION RENEWED MOTION FOR DIRECT CONTACT WITH CLIENT (Gunn, Carlton)
March 3, 2009 1664 Featured Case MOTION RENEWED MOTION FOR DIRECT CONTACT WITH CLIENT by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Gunn, Carlton)
March 3, 2009 1663 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
March 2, 2009 1662 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina)
March 2, 2009 1661 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1624 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Leave to File letter from Petitioner to Counsel under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration, (27 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF) First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 2, 2009 1660 Featured Case NOTICE RENEWED MOTION FOR DIRECT CONTACT WITH CLIENT by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Gunn, Carlton)
March 2, 2009 1659 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification filed by SAKI BACHA. (Shamsi, Hina)
February 28, 2009 1658 Featured Case ERRATA Respondents Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification, (also filed as Dkt. No. 1656 in Misc. No. 08-442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (72 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 30 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 101 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 147 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 101 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 1043 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 52 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 85 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 45 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, DONALD RUMSFELD, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT GATES, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE. (Berman, Julia)
February 28, 2009 1657 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (122 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return filed by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI. (Curnin, Paul)
February 27, 2009 1656 Featured Case STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1655 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
February 27, 2009 1655 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
February 27, 2009 1654 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT GATES (Ahern, Paul)
February 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: On Thursday, March 26, 2009, at 2:00 pm, the parties shall appear for a hearing on Respondents' Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1416, 08-mc-0442) AND Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1526, 08-mc-0442) in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Each party (Petitioners, Respondents, and Press Applicants) shall designate one counsel to speak on their behalf. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 27, 2009 1653 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA (Kadidal, Shayana)
February 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Return (Docket #111, 08-cv-1360). Respondents are granted until March 27, 2009, to file a factual return for Petitioner Zayn Husayn (ISN 10016). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 27, 2009 1652 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return (ISN 10016) by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas)
February 26, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Court finds that there is no longer a need to hold in abeyance Petitioner El Falesteny's (ISN 519) Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (docket #446, 05-cv-2386). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS in part Petitioner El Falesteny's Motion to Reconsider and Modify Order Holding in Abeyance his Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (docket #538, 05-cv-2386; docket #248, 08-mc-0442). The Court ORDERS the abeyance lifted. The Merits Judge will address the merits of Petitioner's request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/26/09. (lctfh1)
February 26, 2009 1651 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (1530 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 160 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION to Dismiss, (161 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION to Hold in Abeyance filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
February 26, 2009 1650 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (109 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL) MOTION to Hold in Abeyance, (1528 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 108 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold Petition in Abeyance filed by HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
February 25, 2009 1649 Featured Case NOTICE --Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Henry, Terry)
February 25, 2009 1648 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING CLASSIFIED TRAVERSE by SHAFIIQ (Bosch, Nadya)
February 25, 2009 1647 Featured Case NOTICE and Filing Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement by MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, BILAL LNU (Moss, John)
February 24, 2009 1646 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing - Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA (Ahern, Paul)
February 24, 2009 1645 Featured Case NOTICE Re Memorandum of Understanding of Abraham Rein Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Sarkessian, Juliet)
February 24, 2009 1644 Featured Case NOTICE Re Memorandum of Understanding of Alexander Breckinridge Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Breckinridge, Alexander)
February 23, 2009 1643 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Discovery Requests by RAVIL MINGAZOV (Lefrak, Allison)
February 23, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 1640 MOTION for Discovery was entered in error at the request of counsel.(tg, )
February 20, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re (512 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Privilege Team's MOTION for Order to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner's Manuscript. A follow up Telephone Status Conference is set for Friday 2/27/09 at 4:30 p.m. Please note that the start time has been pushed back slightly from what was discussed due to another matter before the Court that afternoon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 2/20/09. (lcak1)
February 20, 2009 1642 Featured Case NOTICE of Inadvertent Filing in Case No. 08-0442 by SHAFIIQ re (1640 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 148 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC) MOTION for Discovery (Bosch, Nadya)
February 19, 2009 1641 Featured Case NOTICE -- RESPONDENTS' GLOBAL NOTICE REGARDING PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY INFORMATION by DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Henry, Terry)
February 19, 2009 1640 Featured Case ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Discovery by SHAFIIQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bosch, Nadya) Modified on 2/23/2009 (tg, ).
February 18, 2009 1639 Featured Case USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 666 Notice of Appeal, filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER ; ORDERED and Adjudged that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby reversed and the cases are remanded for further proceedings. (USCA No. 08-5424) (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(mmh, )
February 18, 2009 1638 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1528 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 108 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL) MOTION to Dismiss filed by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Curnin, Paul)
February 18, 2009 1637 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1530 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 160 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition or, Alternatively, to Hold it in Abeyance pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings filed by MOHAMMED KAMEEN. (Kadidal, Shayana)
February 18, 2009 1636 Featured Case NOTICE -- RESPONDENTS GLOBAL NOTICE REGARDING PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY INFORMATION by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Henry, Terry)
February 18, 2009 1635 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1530 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 160 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION to Dismiss The Habeas Petition of Mohammed Jawad or, Alternatively, to Hold it in Abeyance Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings filed by SAKI BACHA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J.R. Frakt)(Shamsi, Hina)
February 18, 2009 1634 Featured Case NOTICE OF CORRECTED FILING re: Petitioner's Traverse to the Government's Factual Return to His Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ re (1629 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (O'Hara, Matthew)
February 18, 2009 1633 Featured Case NOTICE OF CORRECTED FILING re: Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Motion for Discovery by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ re (1630 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (O'Hara, Matthew)
February 17, 2009 1632 Featured Case STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Kadidal, Shayana)
February 17, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re (120 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR) Privilege Team's MOTION to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner Salahi's Manuscript. A telephonic status conference is set for Friday 2/20/09 at 4:00 p.m. Parties are directed to set up a conference call and jointly contact chambers at (202) 354-3030 at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 2/17/09. (lcak1)
February 17, 2009 1631 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI (Strauss, Lisa)
February 17, 2009 1630 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING re: Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Motion for Discovery by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (O'Hara, Matthew)
February 17, 2009 1629 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING re: Petitioner's Traverse to the Government's Factual Return to His Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ (O'Hara, Matthew)
February 17, 2009 1628 Featured Case NOTICE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON RETURN by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR re (82 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (77) MOTION to Vacate (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 16, 2009 1627 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Motion for an Order Authorizing Petitioner's Medical Expert to Evaluate Him by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI (Duncan, Theresa)
February 16, 2009 1626 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Respondents' Response to the Court's Order of January 23, 2009 by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI re (169 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR) Response to Order of the Court (Duncan, Theresa)
February 15, 2009 1625 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Memorandum)(Fenstermaker, Scott)
February 15, 2009 1624 Featured Case First MOTION for Leave to File letter from Petitioner to Counsel under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion for an Order directing Petitioner to file document under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte review, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fenstermaker, Scott)
February 13, 2009 1623 Featured Case NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production Of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Henry, Terry)
February 13, 2009 1622 Featured Case MOTION for Expedited Judgment on the Government's Record by MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 13, 2009 1621 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified Traverse by SHAFIIQ (Bosch, Nadya)
February 13, 2009 1620 Featured Case NOTICE of Authorization to Represent Petitioner by MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter B. Ellis, # 2 Next Friend Authorization)(Ghia, Usha-Kiran)
February 13, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER in case 1:05-cv-02371-RCL; granting (1617) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Petitioner has until February 18, 2009, to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/13/2009. (lcrcl1, )
February 13, 2009 1619 Featured Case ORDER in case 1:05-cv-02371-RCL; granting (1564) Motion for extension of time, nunc pro tunc, in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/13/2009. (lcrcl1, )
February 13, 2009 Featured Case Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:petitioner's response is due on or before February 18, 2009. (jwd)
February 12, 2009 1618 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re 1542 First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 sua sponte order denying Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief without prejudice filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Fenstermaker, Scott)
February 12, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (194) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:05-cv-02385-RMU; granting (1614) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. It is hereby ordered that the petitioner's response is due on or before February 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 2/12/09. (lcrmu2)
February 12, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking (1616) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; striking (31) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:08-cv-01828-RMU. The court hereby strikes the petitioner's unopposed motion for failing to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c). Furthermore, counsel is reminded that motions for extensions of time should not be filed in 08mc442. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 2/12/09. (lcrmu2)
February 12, 2009 1617 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (109 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL) MOTION to Hold in Abeyance, (1530 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Dismiss by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI (Curnin, Paul)
February 12, 2009 1616 Featured Case STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 2/12/2009.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Authorization or Counsel's Declaration Regarding His Representation by MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI (Sullivan, Patricia) Modified on 2/13/2009 (nmw, ).
February 12, 2009 1615 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Classified Traverse by SHAFIIQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Bosch, Nadya)
February 12, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (185) Consent Request for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Discovery Requests 1:05-cv-02479-HHK; (1612) 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 12, 2009. (NP)
February 12, 2009 1614 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1528 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Dismiss, (160 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SAKI BACHA (Kadidal, Shayana)
February 11, 2009 1613 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Authorizations Pursuant to December 11, 2008 Order by ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rich, Sara)
February 11, 2009 1612 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Discovery Requests by RAVIL MINGAZOV (Lefrak, Allison)
February 11, 2009 1611 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION SEAL UNCLASSIFIED TRAVERSE AND EXHIBITS by MOTAI SAIB (Voorhees, Danielle)
February 11, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: After considering Petitioner Khan's (ISN 10020) Motion for Reconsideration (Docket #134, 06-cv-1690) and Respondents' response, Petitioner's motion is DENIED. Respondents are granted a final extension, until February 27, 2009, to file a factual return for Petitioner. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/11/09. (lctfh1)
February 11, 2009 1605 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET re (1527 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance, (84 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
February 10, 2009 1604 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by HOUMAD WARZLY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY re (63 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) Order to Show Cause,. (Gunn, Carlton)
February 10, 2009 1603 Featured Case MOTION Motion for De-Designation of Protected Information in Unclassified Return re (1215 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) by ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 9, 2009 1610 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 1535 Notice (Other) by MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1609 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (1535 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 149 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH) Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1608 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (919 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 1535 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other), filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1607 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (1535 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) filed by BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1606 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (1535 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR) filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1601 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (1535 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
February 9, 2009 1600 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (134 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW) MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
February 9, 2009 1599 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1598 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1597 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1596 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1595 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1594 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Supplement to Respondents' January 21, 2009 Filing of Detainee Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Davis, Patrick)
February 9, 2009 1593 Featured Case NOTICE DECLARATION RE: AUTHORIZATION OF REPRESENTATION by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 9, 2009 1592 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re 1526 MOTION to Intervene of The Associated Press, The New York Times Company and USA Today filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Bead, Jeanette)
February 9, 2009 1591 Featured Case NOTICE DECLARATION RE: AUTHORIZATION OF REPRESENTATION by HOUMAD WARZLY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 9, 2009 1590 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1542 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 sua sponte order denying Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief without prejudice, (21 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF) First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 Sua Sponte Denial of Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
February 9, 2009 1589 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING UNCLASSIFIED TRAVERSE by MOTAI SAIB (Voorhees, Danielle)
February 9, 2009 1588 Featured Case MOTION for Order Confirming Designation of Unclassified Factual Return as "Protected" by BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
February 9, 2009 1587 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Petitioners Reply To Respondents Opposition To Petitioners Motion for An Order Directing Preservation Of Discoverable And Relevant Evidence by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
February 8, 2009 1586 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (135 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW) Order,,, filed by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Dixon, J.)
February 6, 2009 1585 Featured Case NOTICE to the Court by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Wolfe, Kristina)
February 6, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Respondents shall respond by Monday, February 9, 2009, to Petitioner Khan's (ISN 10020) Motion for Reconsideration (Docket #134, 06-cv-1690). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/06/09. (lctfh1)
February 6, 2009 1584 Featured Case NOTICE Consent to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Pugliese, Donald)
February 5, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (155) Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Traverse to Respondents' Amended Factual Return in case 1:05-cv-00247-HHK; 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Accordingly, petitioner's traverse is due on March 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 5, 2009. (NP)
February 5, 2009 1583 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to Appoint Counsel. Stephen R. Sady appointed for ALI HUSSAIN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/5/09. (dot, )
February 5, 2009 1582 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse to Respondents' Amended Factual Return by MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED (Kauffman, Samuel)
February 5, 2009 1581 Featured Case NOTICE of Authorization by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Crider Decl.)(Crider, Cori)
February 4, 2009 1580 Featured Case NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
February 4, 2009 1579 Featured Case ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
February 4, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: A telephone conference was held on February 4, 2009, regarding Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns (Docket #1571, 08-mc-0442) for Petitioners Abdulmalik (08-cv-1440) and Mohamed (08-cv-1789) AND Petitioners' Cross-Motion for Petitioners' CSRT Records (Docket #1574, 08-mc-0442). For the reasons set forth during the hearing, Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time is granted and Petitioners' Cross-Motion for CSRT Records is granted in part. Respondents are granted a final extension of time, until February 27, 2009, to file factual returns for both Petitioners. With respect to Petitioners' Cross-Motion, if counsel for Petitioners file a signed authorization from Petitioners to pursue this action or a declaration that states Petitioners directly authorized counsel to pursue this action, the government is ordered to produce Petitioners' unclassified CSRT Records by 5 p.m. on Friday, February 6, 2009, as well as the portions of Petitioners' classified CSRT Records that can be released by that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/04/09. (lctfh1)
February 4, 2009 1578 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Deadline for Filing Traverse Pending Resolution of Motions and Agreement to Rescheduling of Deadline for Government Oppositions by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 4, 2009 Featured Case ORDER granting (1576) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (43) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:08-cv-01923-GK; counsel shall have up to and including March 31, 2009 to obtain and file a signed authorization from Petitioner or a declaration by counsel that states that Petitioner directly authorized counsel to pursue this action and explains why counsel was unable to secure a signed authorization; Section I(G) of the Case Management Order is amended in this matter; Petitioner has up to and including April 27, 2009 in which to file a traverse. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/4/09. (CL, )
February 4, 2009 1577 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Thomas F. Hogan of proceedings held on 08/26/08; Page Numbers: 1-41. Date of Issuance:02/04/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2009.(Kerr, Catalina)
February 3, 2009 1576 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadline in Case Management Order and for an Extension of Time to Obtain Client Authorization by MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strauss, Lisa)
February 3, 2009 1575 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION to Stay Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
February 2, 2009 1602 Featured Case ORDER granting Petitioner Ibrahim al Qosi's Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Habeas Petition Without Prejudice, or Alternatively, to Hold Petition In Abeyance Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings (#77 in CA 04-1937). Ordered that Petitioner shall have through and including 2/13/2009 in which to respond to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/2/2009. (mm)
February 2, 2009 Featured Case Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The petitioners' response to the government's motion to dismiss or hold in abeyance is due on or before February 13, 2009. (jwd )
February 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification (Docket #1571, 08-mc-0442). Respondents are granted until February 27, 2009, to file the legal justification statements required to be submitted with the factual returns for ISNs 22 (08-cv-1221), 49 (05-cv-2386), 259 (06-cv-1766), and 335 (08-cv-1230). Respondents are also granted until February 27, 2009, to file factual returns for ISNs 10016 (08-cv-1360) and 10020 (06-cv-1690). With respect to ISNs 10025 (08-cv-1440) and 10027 (08-cv-1789), at 3:00 pm on Wednesday, February 4, 2009, the court will hear telephonic argument on Respondents' request for an extension of time to file the factual returns for those two Petitioners. The parties in those two cases shall jointly contact chambers at (202) 354-3420 at that time. The parties are advised to contact chambers if a scheduling conflict exists with that date and time. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/2/09. (lctfh1)
February 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (169) Motion to Continue in case 1:05-cv-02385-RMU; granting (1562) Motion to Continue in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. The petitioners' response to the government's motion to dismiss or hold in abeyance is due on or before February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 2/2/09. (lcrmu2)
January 31, 2009 1574 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (45 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1571 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 37 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File, and Emergency Cross-Motion for Petitioners' CSRT Records filed by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, ISMAIL MOHAMED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit correspondence re: CSRT records, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crider, Cori)
January 30, 2009 1573 Featured Case STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1571 in No. 08-mc-0442) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
January 30, 2009 1572 Featured Case NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (Henry, Terry)
January 30, 2009 1571 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
January 30, 2009 1570 Featured Case ERRATA TO PETITIONERS AND RESPONDENTS JOINT MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO HOLD PETITION IN ABEYANCE PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS FILED PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS FILED JANUARY 30, 2009, DOCKET #1566 (08-mc-442) & #94 (08-cv-1207) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (94 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul)
January 30, 2009 1569 Featured Case ORDER denying Respondents' Motion to Vacate (Docket #120, 1:05-cv-01244-CKK; Docket #1563, 1:08-mc-00442-TFH). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/30/09. (lctfh1)
January 30, 2009 1568 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Ahern, Paul)
January 30, 2009 1567 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia)
January 30, 2009 1566 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to PETITIONERS AND RESPONDENTS JOINT MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO HOLD PETITION IN ABEYANCE PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Turner, Paul)
January 30, 2009 1565 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING CLASSIFIED TRAVERSE by MOTAI SAIB (Voorhees, Danielle)
January 29, 2009 1564 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Continue by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executive Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curnin, Paul)
January 29, 2009 1563 Featured Case First MOTION to Vacate January 15, 2009, Authorization Order by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
January 29, 2009 1562 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Continue by MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SAKI BACHA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executive Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
January 29, 2009 1561 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment of Caroline Scott (Administrative Assistant) Pursuant to Protective Order dated September 11, 2008 by WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR (Ghia, Usha-Kiran)
January 29, 2009 1560 Featured Case NOTICE of Petitioner's Request for 30 Days' Notice of Transfer by WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID (Ghia, Usha-Kiran)
January 29, 2009 1559 Featured Case NOTICE Re Joseph Hetrick's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Hetrick, Joseph)
January 28, 2009 1558 Featured Case NOTICE Re Juliet Sarkessian's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Sarkessian, Juliet)
January 28, 2009 1557 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery Notice of Filing of Motion Under Seal Requesting Discovery by ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED (Rushforth, Brent)
January 28, 2009 1556 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Petras, Mary)
January 28, 2009 1555 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Rachlin, Robert)
January 27, 2009 1554 Featured Case ERRATA / Notice of Errata Regarding Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Mohammed Idris as Next Friend, with exhibit by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS (159 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 1543 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Errata, filed by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, (158 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 1541 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Leave to Appear Next Friend filed by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS. (Cowan, Jennifer)
January 27, 2009 1553 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Cleary, Amy)
January 27, 2009 1552 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH) Order by MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
January 27, 2009 1551 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 20 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC) Order by KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
January 27, 2009 1550 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
January 27, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting motions for extension of time 168 and 169 in case 1:05-cv-00270-JR; granting motions for extension of time 136 and 140 in case 1:05-cv-00492-JR; granting motion for extension of time 152 in case 1:05-cv-00569-JR; granting motion for extension of time 102 in case 1:05-cv-00877-JR; granting motion for extension of time 79 in case 1:05-cv-01189-JR; granting motion for extension of time 140 in case 1:05-cv-01555-JR; granting motion for extension of time 132 in case 1:05-cv-02185-JR; granting motions for extension of time 113 and 119 in case 1:05-cv-02379-JR; granting motions for extension of time 41 and 42 in case 1:08-cv-01232-JR; and granting motion for extension of time 1421 in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 27, 2009. (MT)
January 27, 2009 1549 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information & Acknowledgment by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Michael)
January 27, 2009 1548 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Adam R. Chiss by MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, BILAL LNU (Chiss, Adam)
January 26, 2009 1547 Featured Case MOTION for Order Allowing Disclosure of Unclassified Factual Return to Military Commissions Defense Counsel by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bender, Jonathan)
January 26, 2009 1546 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information & Acknowledgment by JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kolakowski, John)
January 26, 2009 1545 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Praecipe and Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Jessica Baen (Paralegal) by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER EL FALESTENY, SHARGOWI LNU, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, ABDURAHMAN LNU, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, SHARAF AL SANANI, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, ABD AL ZAHER, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABDULAZIZ LNU, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, BILAL LNU, ADEL LNU, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, RIAD NARGERI, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE (Kadidal, Shayana)
January 26, 2009 1544 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 19 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB) Order by MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR. (Cleary, Amy)
January 26, 2009 1543 Featured Case ERRATA (Corrected) Motion for Appointment of Mohammed Idris as Next Friend, with exhibits, together with (Proposed) Order by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS (158 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 1541 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Leave to Appear Next Friend filed by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS. (Cowan, Jennifer)
January 25, 2009 1542 Featured Case First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 sua sponte order denying Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief without prejudice by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Directing Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 sua sponte order denying Petitioner's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief without prejudice)(Fenstermaker, Scott)
January 23, 2009 1541 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Next Friend //Motion for Appointment of Mohammed Idris as Next Friend, with exhibits, with (Proposed) Order by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS (Cowan, Jennifer)
January 23, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By February 2, 2009, the government shall respond to the Privilege Team's Motion to Maintain Protected Designation of Petitioner Slahi's Manuscript (docket #120, 05-cv-0569; docket #512, 08-mc-0442) and Petitioner's Opposition. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/23/09. (lctfh1)
January 23, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (43) Motion for Extension of Time to File Authorization in case 1:08-cv-01228-RMC; granting (1422) Motion for Extension of Time to File Authorization in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Accordingly, counsel shall file an authorization or declaration by February 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/23/09. (lctfh1)
January 22, 2009 1540 Featured Case NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
January 22, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of Judge John D. Bates' November 24, 2008 order granting respondents' motion to hold the petition in abeyance pending the completion of military commission proceedings (docket #238, 04-cv-1136), the Court GRANTS respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of January 2, 2009 Minute Order as it pertains to petitioner Khadr (ISN 766)(docket #254, 04-cv-1136-JDB; docket #1525, 08-mc-0442-TFH). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/22/09. (lctfh1)
January 22, 2009 1539 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Petitioner Mohammed Ahmed Saeed Al-Adahi's Objection Regarding Consolidation by MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ(As next friend of Muhammad Al-Adahi), MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1463 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 231 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Status Report,, (Spahn, Brian)
January 22, 2009 1538 Featured Case ORDER regarding transferred or released petitioners in 08-mc-0442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/22/09. (lctfh1)
January 22, 2009 1536 Featured Case MOTION to Compel Compliance With Section I.E.1. of Case Management Order by HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Charles)
January 21, 2009 1537 Featured Case ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Declassified, Protected Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 1/22/2009 Please disregard as clerk has entered this in error. (tr ).
January 21, 2009 1535 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
January 21, 2009 1534 Featured Case NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
January 21, 2009 1533 Featured Case NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner and Withdrawal of Request for Designation of Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
January 21, 2009 1532 Featured Case NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO (Folio, Joseph)
January 16, 2009 1531 Featured Case MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re (1529 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 70 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO; (See the docket entries indicated above to view document) (td, )
January 16, 2009 1530 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
January 16, 2009 1529 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
January 16, 2009 1528 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
January 16, 2009 1527 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
January 16, 2009 1525 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration of January 2, 2009 Minute Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
January 16, 2009 1524 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Judgment on the Record by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Lefrak, Allison)
January 16, 2009 1523 Featured Case NOTICE of filing of Acknowledgements by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Acknowledgements)(Rich, Sara)
January 15, 2009 1522 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners' Report in Opposition to the Government's Appendix in Support of Consolidation by MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Breckinridge, Alexander)
January 15, 2009 1521 Featured Case ORDER granting (100) Motion for Authorization to Review Petitioner's Statements with Petitioner in case 1:05-cv-01244-CKK. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/15/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By 4:00 p.m. on Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall reply to Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket # 1526, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/21/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 1526 Featured Case MOTION to Intervene by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Corporate Disclosure)(nmw, )
January 14, 2009 1519 Featured Case ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 1518 Featured Case ORDER granting (145) Motion for Hearing; granting (145) Motion to Vacate in case 1:05-cv-01592-RCL. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/14/2009. (lcrcl1, )
January 14, 2009 1517 Featured Case NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, Acknowledgement and Affirmation by ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN (Mickum, George)
January 14, 2009 1514 Featured Case NOTICE of Classified Filing of Classified Supplemental Position re Government's Request for Consolidation by SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR (Harbaugh, Craig)
January 13, 2009 1513 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, SAAD AL QAHTAANI (Bronte, Patricia)
January 13, 2009 1512 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI (Bronte, Patricia)
January 13, 2009 1511 Featured Case NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER (MacLean, Emilou)
January 13, 2009 1510 Featured Case NOTICE of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI (MacLean, Emilou)
January 13, 2009 1509 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (100 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 100 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK) MOTION for Order MOTION to Expedite Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Authorization to Review Petitioner's Statements With Petitioner filed by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Smith, Emily)
January 13, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1013 Consent Motion to Stay. The proceedings for petitioner Ahmmed Rabbani are hereby STAYED until January 21, 2009. It is further ordered that the protective order and 30-day notice orders remain in effect during the pendency of the stay. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 11/19/08. (lcrmu2)
January 13, 2009 1507 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 1506 Notice of Proposed Order, 1505 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Motion, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Fenstermaker, Scott)
January 13, 2009 1506 Featured Case NOTICE of Proposed Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re 1505 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Fenstermaker, Scott)
January 13, 2009 1505 Featured Case First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Fenstermaker, Scott)
January 12, 2009 1520 Featured Case AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.) filed by SAKI BACHA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(tr)
January 12, 2009 1504 Featured Case ORDER requiring briefing on transferred or released petitioners. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/12/09. (Brief due by 2/6/2009. Replies due by 2/20/2009.) (lctfh1)
January 12, 2009 1503 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (150 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 226 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 40 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 378 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 92 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 134 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 425 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 55 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 105 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 828 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 42 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 87 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 14 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 183 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 86 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 111 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 94 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 124 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 60 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 157 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 76 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 159 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 118 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 78 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 174 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 31 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 113 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 155 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 105 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 101 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 316 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 153 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 137 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 101 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 127 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 61 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 179 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 95 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 73 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 107 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 95 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 120 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 44 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 94 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 12 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 157 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 77 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 137 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 223 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 133 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 176 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 130 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 118 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 128 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 166 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 135 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 69 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 112 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 120 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 22 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 75 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 120 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 100 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 117 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 78 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 7 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 31 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 154 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 68 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 132 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 46 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 185 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 131 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 60 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB) MOTION for Order, (166 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) MOTION for Order to Designate Unclassified Returns as "Protected" Information filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
January 12, 2009 1502 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Leave to File Discovery Requests by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Lefrak, Allison)
January 12, 2009 1501 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Arthur Spitzer of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by SAKI BACHA (Shamsi, Hina)
January 12, 2009 1500 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of David Frakt of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by SAKI BACHA (Shamsi, Hina)
January 12, 2009 1499 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Jonathan Hafetz of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by SAKI BACHA (Shamsi, Hina)
January 12, 2009 1498 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Hina Shamsi of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by SAKI BACHA (Shamsi, Hina)
January 12, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Authorization to Review Petitioner's Statements with Petitioner (docket # 100, 05-cv-1244) on Wednesday, January 14, 2009, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2009 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan.) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/12/09. (lctfh1)
January 9, 2009 1497 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgments by ABDULAZIZ LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB (Fee, Jonathan)
January 9, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying (857) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-02386-RBW; denying (1474) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. The Court having considered the Motion for Leave to File out of Time filed by the respondents on January 7, 2009, and in light of the minute order entered earlier this same date by the Honorable Thomas F. Hogan of this Court denying the respondents' motion to stay the habeas petition of Abdul Aziz Naji (ISN 744) and denying as moot the cross-motion for parole field by that same petitioner, it is ORDERED that the respondents' motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/09/09. (lcrbw3, )
January 9, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's motion to stay proceedings for Petitioner Abdul Aziz Naji (ISN 744) (Notice of Filing docket # 793, 05-2386) is DENIED. Accordingly, the Court further ORDERS that Petitioner's Cross-Motion For Parole (Notice of Filing docket # 800, 05-cv-2386), which Petitioner presented as an alternative form of relief if the Court were to grant the government's motion to stay, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/9/09. (lctfh1)
January 9, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's Motion to Stay All Proceedings for Petitioner who is Approved for Transfer or Release (docket # 868, 05-cv-2386) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/9/09. (lctfh1)
January 9, 2009 1496 Featured Case ORDER amending the Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION entered on January 7, 2009, and Amended Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION (attached as Exhibit 1). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/9/09. (lctfh1)
January 8, 2009 1516 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (1346 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) to Stay, (868 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
January 8, 2009 1495 Featured Case OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PAROLE re (1436 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 114 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK) Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL).
January 8, 2009 1494 Featured Case REPLY in Support re (1346 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 110 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK) MOTION to Stay filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
January 8, 2009 1493 Featured Case PLEADING INADVERTENTLY FILED IN 08-mc-442.....Pursuant to the Minute Order of January 8, 2009, this pleading should only be filed in 05-cv-1555 and 05-cv-2185.....MEMORANDUM re (140 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 132 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI. (Cowan, Jennifer) Modified on 1/9/2009 (lctfh1).
January 8, 2009 1492 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing (under seal) Respondents' Reply by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1344 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 793 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice (Other), (1424 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 831 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Memorandum in Opposition (Folio, Joseph)
January 8, 2009 1491 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing (under seal) of Respondents' Reply and Opposition to Petitioner's Cross-Motion by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1436 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 114 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK) Notice (Other), (1346 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 110 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK) MOTION to Stay (Folio, Joseph)
January 8, 2009 1490 Featured Case STATUS REPORT / Supplement to the Joint Filing Pursuant to This Court's 12/17/08 Order by FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, FAHD ABDULLAH AHMED GHAZY, EDRESS LNU, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY. (Cowan, Jennifer)
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that all filings related to the November 6, 2008, Case Management Order, as amended by the Court's December 16, 2008, order ("Amended Case Management Order"), shall only be filed in the individual civil case(s) to which they apply. For example, filings related to discovery, presumptions, use of hearsay, and extensions of time to comply with the Amended Case Management Order need not be filed in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/8/09. (lctfh1)
January 8, 2009 1488 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Doherty, Ronan)
January 8, 2009 1487 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Bondurant, Emmet)
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER vacating 1/8/09 Minute Order signed by Judge Collyer as this order will be entered in the individual case to which it applies only. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/8/09. (KD) Modified to correct the year of the order being vacated on 1/8/2009 (tg, ).
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (860) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:05-cv-02386-RBW. The Court having considered The Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) filed on January 7, 2009, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested by the respondents based upon the consent of the sole petitioner subject to the motion, Jabbarov Oybek Jamolovich (ISN 452), as represented to the Court by the respondents, but that further requests for an extension of time to provide discovery to this petitioner in accordance with Section I.E.1(3) of the amended case management order entered on January 16, 2008, shall be looked upon with extreme disfavor, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that on or before January 30, 2009, the respondents shall provide the discovery required by Section I.E.1(3) of the amended case management order entered on December 16, 2008, to the petitioner described above. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/08/09. (lcrbw3, )
January 8, 2009 1486 Featured Case NOTICE of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE (MacLean, Emilou)
January 8, 2009 1485 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Emilou MacLean on behalf of DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (MacLean, Emilou)
January 8, 2009 1484 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Emilou MacLean on behalf of MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (MacLean, Emilou)
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings (docket # 152, 05-cv-1353; docket # 1354, 08-mc-442 (filed under seal)) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/8/09. (lctfh1)
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's Motion to Stay All Habeas Proceedings (docket # 108, 05-cv-1497; docket # 1355, 08-mc-442 (filed under seal)) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/8/09. (lctfh1)
January 8, 2009 Featured Case VACATED pursuant to Minute Order entered 1/8/2009.....MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3), see Misc. No. 08-442 Dkt. # 1432, and 52 Respondents' Notice of Prior Disclosure of Exculpatory Evidence and Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for disclosing exculpatory evidence and discovery material under the Amended Case Management Order has passed. It is hereby ORDERED that Respondents shall disclose all discovery material required to be disclosed under Section I.E.1 of the Amended Case Management Order no later than January 12, 2009; and it is further ORDERED that Respondents shall disclose all exculpatory evidence required to be disclosed under Section I.D.1 of the Amended Case Management Order no later than January 12, 2009; and it is further ORDERED that, pursuant to Section I.D.1 of the Amended Case Management Order, Respondents shall file a notice certifying either that it has disclosed the exculpatory evidence or that it does not possess any exculpatory evidence no later than January 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/8/09. (lcrmc1) Modified on 1/8/2009 (tg, ).
January 8, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (180) the government's unopposed motion for extension of time in case 1:05-cv-00520-RMU. On or before 01/30/2009, the government shall disclose to petitioner Shalabi "all reasonably available evidence in its possession that tends materially to undermine the information presented to support the government's justification for detaining the petitioner." On or before 01/30/2009, the government shall file a notice certifying either that it has disclosed the exculpatory evidence or that it does not possess any exculpatory evidence. See Judge Hogan's Amended Case Management Order, Section I.D.1. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 01/08/2009. (lcrmu1)
January 7, 2009 1515 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (868 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) to Stay and OPPOSITION to Petitioner's Cross Motion for Parole filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the discovery provisions of the Case Management Order entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Motion to Compel Answers to Third Set of Interrogatories (docket # 179, 04-cv-2022) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Case Management Order entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Motion for Transfer to Judge Urbina (docket # 114, 05-cv-1220; docket # 345, 08-mc-442) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's order of December 16, 2008, and in light of the fact that the government filed a factual return for Petitioner on December 30, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Cross-Motion for an Exception to Sequencing Based on Exceptional Circumstances (docket # 407, 08-mc-442; docket # 29, 08-cv-1153), is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioners' Motion to Transfer Case (docket # 550, 08-mc-442; docket # 384, 02-cv-828) and Petitioners' Motion for Status Conference (docket # 329, 02-cv-828) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 1483 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications, (129 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) MOTION for Extension of Time to, (130 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1432 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended CMO Section I.E.1(3) filed by MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, RIAD NARGERI. (Kadidal, Shayana)
January 7, 2009 1482 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications, (159 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU) MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Disclosure of Exculpatory Evidence filed by ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA. (Kadidal, Shayana)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of the Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving Top Secret/Sensitive Compartmented Information ("TS/SCI Protective Order") (docket # 118, 06-cv-1690; docket # 1481, 08-mc-442), the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Motion for Order Directing the Court Security Office to File Supplemental Status Report (docket # 62, 06-cv-1690; docket # 238, 08-mc-442) is DENIED. If counsel wishes to file the supplemental status report, counsel shall do so in accordance with Section I.F.48 of the TS/SCI Protective Order. The Court further ORDERS that Petitioner's request for an order authorizing counsel's disclosure of presumptively classified information to security-cleared counsel for other Guantanamo petitioners is DENIED. If counsel wishes to share presumptively TS/SCI information with counsel for other petitioners, counsel shall follow the procedures set forth in Section I.D.29 of the TS/SCI Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of the Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving Top Secret/Sensitive Compartmented Information and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving Top Secret/Sensitive Compartmented Information (docket # 1481, 08-mc-442), the Court ORDERS that the government's Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order Pertaining to Top Secret/Sensitive Compartmented Information (docket # 266, 08-mc-442; docket # 65, 06-cv-1690; docket # 19, 08-cv-1207; docket # 6, 08-cv-1360) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 1481 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA, IN HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 1480 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information filed by FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, PRIVILEGE TEAM, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAM
January 7, 2009 1479 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (339 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 1000 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Discovery filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Order Entered by Judge Urbina in 05-1429))(Livingston, Schuyler)
January 7, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (371) Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time in case 1:04-cv-01254-HHK; granting (1317) Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 7, 2009. (NP)
January 7, 2009 1478 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications indicating petitioners' non-opposition but requesting scheduling conference filed by MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI. (Woodward, Gordon)
January 7, 2009 1477 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery by SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
January 7, 2009 1476 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
January 7, 2009 1475 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing (under seal) Respondents' Reply and Opposition to Petitioner's Cross-Motion by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1344 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 793 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice (Other), (1379 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 800 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice (Other) (Folio, Joseph)
January 7, 2009 1474 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Opposition/Reply Out of Time by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
January 7, 2009 1473 Featured Case ORDER denying (157) petitioner Hatim's motion for additional discovery in case 1:05-cv-01429-RMU; denying (1001) petitioner Hatim's motion for additional discovery in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 01/07/2009. (lcrmu1)
January 6, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying (846) Motion for Extension of Time to; granting (855) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:05-cv-02386-RBW. The Court having considered The Government's Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) filed on January 5, 2009, as well as the prior motion filed by the respondents on January 2, 2009, requesting the same relief and the opposition thereto filed by Abdul Aziz Naji (ISN 744) on January 4, 2009, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested by the respondents, but that further requests for an extension of time to provide discovery in accordance with Section I.E.1(3) of the amended case management order entered on January 16, 2008, shall be looked upon with extreme disfavor, it is ORDERED that the respondents' January 5, 2009 motion is GRANTED with respect to those petitioners subject to the respondents' motion whose habeas corpus petitions are before the undersigned member of the Court, and that their January 2, 2009 motion is DENIED as moot with respect to those same petitioners. It is further ORDERED that on or before January 30, 2009, the respondents shall provide the discovery required by Section I.E.1(3) of the amended case management order entered on December 16, 2008, to the petitioners described above. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/06/09. (lcrbw3, )
January 6, 2009 1472 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Petitioners' Amended Supplement to the Joint Filing Pursuant to The Court's 12/17/08 Order on Behalf of Petitioner Bisheer Nasser al Marwalah (relates to Docket # 329 in 04 CV 1194) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Havens, Sarah)
January 6, 2009 1471 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Petitioners' Supplement to the Joint Filing Pursuant to The Court's 12/17/08 Order on Behalf of Petitioner Bisheer Nasser al Marwalah (relates to Docket # 329 in 04 CV 1194) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Havens, Sarah)
January 6, 2009 1470 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Anna E. Cross of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS (Cross, Anna)
January 6, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (docket #1425, in 08-mc-442; docket #95, in 06-cv-1684) Consent Motion for Order to Reset Status Conference filed by Mohammed Ahmed Taher. The Status Conference has been reset, and will now take place on January 14, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/31/08. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/6/09. (tth)
January 6, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (docket # 1415, 08-mc-442; docket # 165, 04-cv-1164) Motion to Stay. The Court having considered the Consent Motion for Stay of Proceedings filed by the petitioner, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested therein based upon the consent of the respondents as represented to the Court by the petitioner, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the initial status hearing in this case scheduled for January 15, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 4, 2009, and every thirty days thereafter until ordered otherwise by the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/05/09. (lcrbw3)
January 6, 2009 1469 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART the Government's [409, 1060] Motion to Hold in Abeyance the habeas petitions of Fouad Mahmoud Al Rabiah and Fayiz Mohammed Ahmen Al Kandari (collectively, "Petitioners"), and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Government's 407 Motion to Dismiss. A stay shall be entered as to the Petitioners' habeas petitions, to commence upon the Convening Authority's referral of charges against Petitioners to military commissions. Unless and until such charges are referred by the Convening Authority, the parties must continue to proceed fully with Petitioners' habeas cases. If and when such charges are referred to military commissions, the Government shall file a notice with the Court and shall file Status Reports every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 5, 2009 1489 Featured Case ORDER (UNDER SEAL). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (jeb, )
January 5, 2009 1468 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Consolidation Pursuant to the Court's 12/17/08 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit, # 2 Appendix Redacted version of classified appendix)(Dean, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1467 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of the Al-Mithali Petitioners' Renewed First Request for the Production of Documents to the Court Security Officer by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Cowan, Jennifer)
January 5, 2009 1466 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Consolidation pursuant to the Court's Order of 12/17/08 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted version of Classified appendix)(Dean, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1465 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Consolidation pursuant to the Court's 12/17/08 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted version of classified appendix)(Dean, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1464 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Consolidation Pursuant to the Court's 12/17/08 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted version of classified appendix)(Dean, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1463 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Consolidation Pursuant to the Court's 12/17/08 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through M, # 2 Exhibit Redacted version of classified appendix)(Dean, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1462 Featured Case NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S 12/17/08 ORDER (08-cv-1207; 06-cv-1690; 08-1cv-1360) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (1323 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (109 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 63 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR) Order (Turner, Paul)
January 5, 2009 1461 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of a Classified Supplement to the Joint Status Report with the Court Security Officer on behalf of the Al-Mudafari Petitioners by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Karp, David)
January 5, 2009 1460 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, (524 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 210 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order Petitioner's Response to Court Orders to Provide Evidence of Authorization filed by SHARAF AL SANANI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bogan, James)
January 5, 2009 1459 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of a Classified Supplement to the Joint Status Report with the Court Security Officer on behalf of Ibrahim Osman Ibrahim Idris by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Karp, David)
January 5, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Petitioner Abu Rawda's Motion for More Time for Reports (docket # 1439, 08-mc-442; docket # 840, 05-cv-2386) is GRANTED in part. Specifically, by January 13, 2009, Petitioner shall submit his position on the suitability of this matter for consolidation in accordance with this Court's December 17, 2008, order (docket # 1323, 08-cv-442). The remainder of Petitioner's request---i.e., that the parties be given until January 13, 2009, to submit their joint status report in accordance with the Merits Judge's December 19, 2008, order---is for the Merits Judge's consideration. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 5, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Agreement Regarding Petitioners' Motion for Direct Contact (docket # 1457, 08-mc-442), the Court ORDERS that the petitioners' motions for direct contact with client (docket ## 1377 & 1378, 08-mc-442; docket # 120, 05-cv-2385; docket # 52, 08-cv-1235; docket # 47, 08-cv-1237) and for expedited briefing and ruling/hearing on their motions for direct contact with client (docket ## 1398 & 1399; docket # 121, 05-cv-2385; docket # 54, 08-cv-1235; docket # 48, 08-cv-1237) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 5, 2009 1458 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Re: Consolidation filed by KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA. (Morgan, J.)
January 5, 2009 1457 Featured Case NOTICE (JOINT) OF AGREEMENT REGARDING PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR DIRECT CONTACT by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO re (121 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1398 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 48 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact With Client re (120 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 47 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION for Order MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact With Client re (120 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 47 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION for Order, (54 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 1399 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact with Client re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) MOTION for Order MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact with Client re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) MOTION for Order (O'Donnell, Sean)
January 5, 2009 1456 Featured Case NOTICE of Authorization by WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter B. Ellis)(Ghia, Usha-Kiran)
January 5, 2009 1455 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Classified Supplement to the Joint Status Report on Behalf of Petitioner Al Razehi (relates to 04 CV 1194) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Havens, Sarah)
January 5, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's order of July 29, 2008, lifting the stay entered in this matter, and in light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's Order of December 16, 2008, the Court DENIES as moot Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Orders Staying Action and Denying Petitioner's Motion for Discovery, and for an Order Requiring Respondents to Comply with Petitioner's Discovery Requests (docket # 161, 04-cv-2022; docket # 4, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 5, 2009 1454 Featured Case RESPONSE re (134 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK) MOTION for Extension of Time to to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) filed by MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED. (Kauffman, Samuel)
January 5, 2009 1453 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SAKI BACHA. (Kadidal, Shayana)
January 5, 2009 1452 Featured Case RESPONSE re (1432 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) filed by ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Greenberg, Eldon)
January 5, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying (docket # 405, 08-mc-442) the Petitioners' Motion for Order for Procedures to Govern October 7, 2008 Hearing in case 1:05-cv-01509-UNA. 28 U.S.C. § 2243 requires the government to produce a person in its custody at a habeas hearing "[u]nless the application for the writ and return present only issues of law." Even assuming that § 2243 applies to detainees at Guantanamo and putting all security concerns and practical considerations aside, the petitioners fail to describe any outstanding factual issues related to the legality of their detention. Accordingly, the court denies their motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/29/08. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-01509-UNA, 1:05-cv-01602-UNA, 1:05-cv-01704-UNA, 1:05-cv-02370-UNA, 1:05-cv-02398-UNA, 1:08-cv-01310-UNA (lcrmu2)
January 2, 2009 1451 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to (1355 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 108 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL) MOTION to Stay filed by ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
January 2, 2009 1450 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to (1354 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Stay, (152 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC) MOTION to Stay filed by MOTAI SAIB. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified to correct linkage on 1/5/2009 (tg, ).
January 2, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Mediation Telephone Conference held on 1/2/2009. (lcak1)
January 2, 2009 1449 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Protected Information by ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI (Han, Suhana)
January 2, 2009 1448 Featured Case NOTICE of Military Commission Charges by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Needle, Jonathan)
January 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's minute order of January 2, 2009, setting a date by which factual returns are due for petitioners approved for transfer or release, and in light of the Case Management Order entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioners' motion requesting a status conference and a date by which the government is to file factual returns in their cases (docket # 268, 04-cv-1194; docket # 78, 05-cv-748; docket # 86, 05-cv-999; docket # 74, 05-cv-994; docket # 77, 05-cv-1347; docket # 119, 05-cv-1353; docket # 104, 05-cv-1504; docket # 96, 05-cv-1505; docket # 79, 05-cv-2349; docket # 617, 05-cv-2386; docket # 67, 05-cv-2385; docket # 118, 05-cv-2479; docket # 670, 08-mc-442; docket # 35, 08-cv-1185; docket # 20, 08-cv-1221) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners approved for transfer or release for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. The Court further ORDERS that, by Friday, February 27, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners charged with violations of the laws of war under the Military Commission Act of 2006 for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 1447 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Prince on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Prince, Robert)
January 2, 2009 1446 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Prince on behalf of BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Prince, Robert)
January 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's Motion To Stay All Proceedings For Petitioner Who Is Approved For Transfer Or Release (docket # 133, 05-cv-392; docket # 1337, 08-mc-442) is DENIED. Accordingly, the Court further ORDERS that Petitioner's Cross-Motion For Parole (docket # 137, 05-cv-392), which Petitioner presented as an alternative form of relief if the Court were to grant the government's motion to stay, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's Motion To Stay All Proceedings For Petitioners Approved For Transfer Or Release (docket # 374, 04-cv-1254; docket # 165, 05-cv-270; docket # 86, 05-cv-998; docket # 156, 05-cv-1220; docket # 790, 05-cv-2386; docket # 57, 08-cv-1233; docket # 1335, 08-mc-442) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the government's Motion for Exception from Sequencing (docket # 1444, 08-mc-442; docket # 115, 06-cv-1690; docket # 73, 08-cv-1360; docket # 35, 08-cv-1440; and docket # 26, 08-cv-1789) is GRANTED. Accordingly, by January 30, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for the petitioners in 06-cv-1690, 08-cv-1360, 08-cv-1440, and 08-cv-1789. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/08. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 1445 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1335 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 790 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings filed by ALI LNU. (Schulof, Daniel)
December 31, 2008 1444 Featured Case MOTION for Exception from Sequencing Regarding Factual Returns (also filed as dkt. no. 1443 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [docket # 991, 08-mc-442] Petitioner's Motion for Order Permitting Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the November 25, 2008 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/31/08. (lctfh1)
December 31, 2008 1443 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns for December 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 1442 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Amended Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Barish, Daniel)
December 31, 2008 1441 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns and Amended Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (Barish, Daniel)
December 31, 2008 1440 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT of 12/19/08 and Joinder In Memorandum of Law Concerning the Appropriate Definition of "Enemy Combatant" filed by NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY. (Marshall, David)
December 31, 2008 1439 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reports by ABU RAWDA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of David S. Marshall In Support of Motion for More Time for Reports, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting More Time for Joint Status Report, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting More Time for Report on Consolidation)(Marshall, David)
December 31, 2008 1438 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing of Respondents' Statement Of Facts On Which They Intend To Rely In Making Their Case-In-Chief For The Continued Lawful Detention Of Hayal Aziz Ahmed Al-Mithali (ISN 840) by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Avila, David)
December 31, 2008 1437 Featured Case ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan)
December 31, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (docket # 838, 05-cv-2386; docket # 1433, 08-mc-442) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Accordingly, attorney Brian C. Lewis is terminated as counsel for petitioners Walid Ibrahim Mustafa Abu Hijazi (ISN 049), Umar Hamzayevich Abdulayev (ISN 257), and Maasoum Abdah Mouhammad (ISN 330). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/31/08. (lctfh1)
December 31, 2008 1436 Featured Case NOTICE of Petitioner's filing with Court Security Office of opposition to Respondents' motion for stay by FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED (Cohen, Jerry)
December 31, 2008 1435 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Motion to Stay by MOTAI SAIB, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Winokur, Meghan)
December 31, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Because the government's Notice of Prior Disclosure of Exculpatory Evidence and Motion for Extension of Time (docket # 1431, 08-mc-442) and Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) (docket # 1432, 08-mc-442) are motions to amend the Case Management Order this Court entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, as well as case management orders entered by many of the Merits Judges, pursuant to this Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Merits Judges will address the motions in their individual cases. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the motions are DENIED in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/31/08(lctfh1)
December 31, 2008 1434 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI (Fee, Jonathan)
December 31, 2008 1433 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, BILAL LNU (Lewis, Brian)
December 30, 2008 1432 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
December 30, 2008 1431 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan)
December 30, 2008 1430 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO (Barish, Daniel)
December 30, 2008 1429 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1335 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 156 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU) MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings filed by ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA. (Kadidal, Shayana)
December 30, 2008 1428 Featured Case NOTICE of filing of reply in support of petitioners' renewal and updating of petitioner's motion for summary judgment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 30, 2008 1427 Featured Case NOTICE of filing of petitioners' renewal and updating of petitioner's motion for summary judgment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 30, 2008 1426 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
December 30, 2008 1425 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Order To Reset Status Conference by MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
December 30, 2008 1424 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1331 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 788 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW)TO MOTION to Stay all proceedings for petitioner who is approved for transfer or Release filed by Petitioner ABDULAYEV (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
December 30, 2008 1422 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Authorization to Proceed by SALEM AHMED HADI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, William)
December 30, 2008 1421 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Authorization to Proceed by MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, William)
December 30, 2008 1420 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (797 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order, filed by SANAD AL KAZIMI, ISN 1453. (jeb, )
December 30, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the parties' Stipulation and Consent Request to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion to Stay (docket # 1417, 08-mc-442; docket # 167, 05-cv-270), the Court ORDERS that the date by which Petitioner shall respond to the government's motion to stay is extended to January 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/30/08. (lctfh1)
December 30, 2008 1419 Featured Case REPLY re (173 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 1381 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Compel filed by HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Carpenter, Charles)
December 30, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, January 7, 2009, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the government's Motion To Confirm Designation Of Unclassified Factual Returns As Protected (docket # 1416, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/30/08. (lctfh1)
December 30, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of Petitioner Ravil Mingazov (ISN 702) having duplicate petitions in 05-cv-2010 and 05-cv-2479, and in light of Petitioner Mingazov's consent to the dismissal of 05-cv-2010, see Petitioners' Status Report at 4-5 (docket # 97, 05-cv-2479), the Court ORDERS that 05-cv-2010 is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/30/08. (lctfh1)
December 30, 2008 1417 Featured Case STIPULATION re 1335 MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings and Consent Request to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion to Stay in No. 05-270, on behalf of Petitioner Algazzar, by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Sergent, Randolph)
December 29, 2008 1423 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (120 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 512 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) to Motion to Maintain protected designation of Petitioner Mohamedou Ould Slahi's Written Narrative. filed by MOHAMEDOU OULD SLAHI. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
December 29, 2008 1418 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to (120 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 512 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order filed by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI. (tg, ) (Cleared for Public Filing UNDER SEAL by the Court Security Officer)
December 29, 2008 1416 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
December 29, 2008 1415 Featured Case Consent MOTION to Stay of Proceedings by FALEN GHEREBI (Wilson, Richard)
December 29, 2008 1414 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (790 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings for Petitioners Approved for Transfer or Release [with Proposed Order] filed by JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Detainee Status Notification)(Mone, Michael)
December 29, 2008 1413 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Lefrak, Allison)
December 29, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting mediation telephone conference for 1/2/09 at 12:30 p.m. re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Direct Contact with Client, (1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Direct Contact with Client. The parties shall jointly contact chambers at (202) 354-3030 at that time. The parties are advised to contact chambers if a scheduling conflict exists with that date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/29/08. (lcak1)
December 29, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (docket # 607, 05-cv-2386; docket # 582, 08-mc-442) Petitioner Sharaf Al Sanani's Motion For Extension Of Time To Provide Evidence Of Authorization. Accordingly, by January 5, 2009, Counsel for Petitioner Al Sanani (ISN 170) shall file a signed authorization from Petitioner to pursue this action or a declaration by counsel that states Petitioner directly authorized counsel to pursue this action and explains why counsel was unable to secure a signed authorization. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/29/08. (lctfh1)
December 29, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of the Case Management Order (docket # 89, 05-cv-763) and the amendments thereto (docket # 108, 05-cv-763), the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Motion To Compel Production Of Unclassified Factual Return (docket # 81, 05-cv-763; docket # 629, 08-mc-442) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/29/08. (lctfh1)
December 29, 2008 1412 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Ellis on behalf of WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID (Ellis, Peter)
December 29, 2008 1411 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Declaration by MAHER EL FALESTENY re (1407 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 818 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Memorandum in Opposition (Carpenter, Charles)
December 26, 2008 1410 Featured Case NOTICE of FIling Declaration by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Truitt, Stephen)
December 24, 2008 1409 Featured Case NOTICE OF PETITIONERS SUBMISSION OF INVESTIGATORS SIGNED MEMORANDUM by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 19 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC, 19 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 20 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 24, 2008 1408 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED EXHIBITS FOR PUBLIC RECORD by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) MOTION for Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Exs A - D)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 24, 2008 1407 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1335 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 790 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings filed by MAHER EL FALESTENY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Carpenter, Charles)
December 24, 2008 1406 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5.4(f) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) MOTION for Order (Gunn, Carlton)
December 24, 2008 1405 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED EXHIBITS FOR PUBLIC RECORD by HOUMAD WARZLY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (120 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 47 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION for Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits A - E)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 24, 2008 1404 Featured Case NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5.4(f) by HOUMAD WARZLY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY re (120 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 47 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION for Order (Gunn, Carlton)
December 23, 2008 1401 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment)(Sherman, Deming)
December 23, 2008 1400 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
December 23, 2008 1399 Featured Case MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact with Client re (1378 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB) MOTION for Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 23, 2008 1398 Featured Case MOTION Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling/Hearing on Motion for Direct Contact With Client re (120 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 1377 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 47 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION for Order by ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 23, 2008 1397 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Ivey, Timothy)
December 23, 2008 1396 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Ivey, Timothy)
December 23, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Consent Motion For Stay Of Proceedings (docket # 749, 05-cv-2386; docket # 1159, 08-mc-442) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court further ORDERS that, in accordance with the terms agreed upon in the consent motion, habeas proceedings for Petitioner Maasoum Abdah Mouhammad (ISN 330) are STAYED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/23/08. (lctfh1)
December 23, 2008 1395 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
December 23, 2008 1394 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Witmer-Rich, Jonathan)
December 23, 2008 1393 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Werneke, Vicki)
December 23, 2008 1392 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Werneke, Vicki)
December 23, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the parties' Stipulation To Stay Habeas Petition (docket # 1374, 08-mc-442; docket # 799, 05-cv-2386), the Court ORDERS that, in accordance with the terms agreed upon in the Stipulation, habeas proceedings for Petitioner Noor Uthman Muhammed (ISN 707) are STAYED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/23/08. (lctfh1)
December 23, 2008 1391 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Warner, Carlos)
December 23, 2008 1390 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Warner, Carlos)
December 23, 2008 1389 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Thompson, Darin)
December 23, 2008 1388 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Thompson, Darin)
December 23, 2008 1387 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Hart, Andy)
December 23, 2008 1386 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Hart, Andy)
December 23, 2008 1385 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by ABDURAHMAN LNU. (Cleary, Amy)
December 23, 2008 1384 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Order by EDRESS LNU. (Cleary, Amy)
December 22, 2008 1383 Featured Case STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's December 15, 2008 Order by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Needle, Jonathan)
December 22, 2008 1382 Featured Case MOTION for Order Directing Respondents to Permit the Petitioner to See His Own Alleged Statements Contained in the Factual Return by SAAD AL QAHTAANI, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bronte, Patricia)
December 22, 2008 1381 Featured Case MOTION to Compel and For Expedited Consideration by HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Expedited Consideration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Carpenter, Charles)
December 22, 2008 1380 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Loewenstein on behalf of WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID (Loewenstein, Andrew)
December 22, 2008 1379 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Protected Information Under Seal by ABDUL AZIZ NAJI (Lubell, Ellen)
December 22, 2008 1378 Featured Case MOTION for Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 22, 2008 1377 Featured Case MOTION for Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton)
December 22, 2008 1376 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Usha-Kiran K. Ghia on behalf of WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID (Ghia, Usha-Kiran)
December 22, 2008 1375 Featured Case STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER. (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
December 22, 2008 1374 Featured Case STIPULATION to Stay Habeas Petition Re: Noor Uthman Muhammed (Samir DOE) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD. (Westby, Jane)
December 22, 2008 1373 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Schwartz, James)
December 22, 2008 1372 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on CMO Re: Abdul Zahir by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER. (Westby, Jane)
December 22, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Because the Court previously granted Petitioner's motion to extend the time within which to respond to the Court's order to show cause from December 5, 2008, to December 19, 2008, the Court denies as moot (docket # 122, 05-cv-1505; docket # 1368, 08-mc-442) Petitioner Abbar Sufian Al Hawary's Unopposed Motion For Second Extension Of Time To Respond To Order To Show Cause, in which Petitioner again requests an extension to December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/22/08. (lctfh1)
December 22, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 1331 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/22/08. (lctfh1)
December 22, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the government's Consent Motion To Stay Proceedings (docket # 111, 05-cv-999; docket # 1332, 08-mc-442) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court further ORDERS that, in accordance with the terms agreed upon in the consent motion, habeas proceedings for Petitioner Asim Ben Thabit al-Khalaqi (ISN 152) are STAYED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/22/08. (lctfh1)
December 21, 2008 1371 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Petitioner's Status December 21, 2008 status report (Ammar al-Baluchi) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Fenstermaker, Scott)
December 21, 2008 1370 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Oldham on behalf of ROBERT GATES (Oldham, Nicholas)
December 19, 2008 1508 Featured Case REPLY in support of (1001 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 157 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU) MOTION for Discovery filed by SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI. (jf, )
December 19, 2008 1403 Featured Case CROSS MOTION for parole by DJAMEL AMEZIANE. (jf, )
December 19, 2008 1402 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re ( 1337 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION MOTION to Stay all proceedings for petitioner who is approved for transfer or release by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, ( 133 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH) MOTION to Stay filed by DJAMEL AMEZIANE. (jf, )
December 19, 2008 1369 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by DJAMEL AMEZIANE, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (1330 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice (Other) (Dixon, J.)
December 19, 2008 1368 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause by ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Winokur, Meghan)
December 19, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the government's Consent Motion To Stay Proceedings (docket # 128, 04-cv-2215; docket # 113, 05-cv-748; docket # 136, 05-cv-1504; docket # 102, 05-cv-2349; docket # 788,05-cv-2386; docket # 1331, 08-mc-442) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court further ORDERS that, in accordance with the terms agreed upon in the consent motion, habeas proceedings for the following petitioners are STAYED: Aamer (ISN 239, 04-cv-2215); Salman (ISN 251, 05-cv-748); Hadjarab (ISN 238, 05-cv-1504); Belbacha (ISN 290, 05-cv-2349); Yafie (ISN 34, 05-cv-2386); Abdullah (ISN 46, 05-cv-2386); Mabrouk (ISN 148, 05-cv-2386). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/19/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/19/08)
December 19, 2008 1367 Featured Case ORDER. The Court grants in part and denies in part 117 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:05-cv-02186-ESH; grants in part and denies in part 1310 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH. The Court denies without prejudice petitioner's requests for additional discovery. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/19/2008. (lcesh1)
December 19, 2008 1366 Featured Case ORDER amending the Court's December 2, 2008 Order. (lcesh1)
December 19, 2008 1365 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/19/2008. (lcesh1)
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5510 for (1050 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 122 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH. (td, )
December 19, 2008 1364 Featured Case NOTICE of Errata by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Smith, Emily)
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5512 for (1044 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 99 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (td, )
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5515 for (1051 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 712 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (td, )
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5517 for (714 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 1053 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (td, )
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5516 for (1052 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 713 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (td, )
December 19, 2008 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-5518 for (1048 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 711 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (td, )
December 19, 2008 1363 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgments by OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI (Attachments: # 1 Acknowledgments)(Fee, Jonathan)
December 19, 2008 1362 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT TO SHOW CAUSE dated SEPTEMBER 5, 2008 filed by MAHBUB RAHMAN. (Morgan, J.)
December 19, 2008 1361 Featured Case RESPONSE re 1360 Response to Document in 08-cv-1185/08-mc-442 / 090108 Order (ecf filed 090508) To Show Cause Why Petition Shoudl Not be Dismissed as Moot / Proposed Order to Accompany Response at DN 1360 filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Cohen, Jerry)
December 19, 2008 1360 Featured Case RESPONSE by Petitioner Mohammed Abd Al Al Qadir to 9/1/08 (ECF filed 9/5/08) to Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot (08-cv-1185) filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Cohen, Jerry)
December 19, 2008 1359 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (222 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 1335 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings for Petitioners Approved for Transfer or Release filed by MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Murphy, Richard)
December 19, 2008 1358 Featured Case STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's December 17, 2008 Order by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
December 19, 2008 1357 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse by SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
December 19, 2008 1356 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverses by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
December 18, 2008 1355 Featured Case MOTION to Stay All Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
December 18, 2008 1354 Featured Case MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
December 18, 2008 1353 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI (Attachments: # 1 Acknowledgements and Memorandums of Understanding)(Rich, Sara)
December 18, 2008 1352 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Connor, Anupama)
December 18, 2008 1351 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Connor, Anupama)
December 18, 2008 1350 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Connor, Anupama)
December 18, 2008 1349 Featured Case STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's December 11, 2008 Order by ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI. (Rich, Sara)
December 18, 2008 1348 Featured Case MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
December 18, 2008 1347 Featured Case STATUS REPORT by MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI. (Sullivan, Patricia)
December 18, 2008 1346 Featured Case MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
December 18, 2008 1345 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 18, 2008 1344 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 18, 2008 1343 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 18, 2008 1342 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 18, 2008 1341 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 18, 2008 1340 Featured Case REPLY to opposition to motion re (1060 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 407 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
December 18, 2008 1339 Featured Case NOTICE Re Memorandum of Understanding of Peter Ryan Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Ryan, Peter)
December 18, 2008 1338 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Anthony J. Phillips of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF (Livingston, Schuyler)
December 17, 2008 1337 Featured Case MOTION to Stay all proceedings for petitioner who is approved for transfer or release by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (jf, )
December 17, 2008 1336 Featured Case NOTICE / Notice of Filing of Requests for Additional Discovery by HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI (Cowan, Jennifer)
December 17, 2008 1335 Featured Case MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ambassador Williamson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
December 17, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the government's motions for exception from sequencing (docket ## 604, 917, and 1157, 08-mc-442; docket # 259, 04-cv-1194; docket # 306, 04-cv-1254; docket # 148, 05-cv-520; docket # 122, 05-cv-569; docket # 70, 05-cv-877; docket # 153, 05-cv-1048; docket # 135, 05-cv-1124; docket # 124, 05-cv-1601; docket # 148, 05-cv-2367; docket # 139, 05-cv-2384; docket ## 686 and 747, 05-cv-2386; docket # 133, 05-cv-2479) are GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS that, by December 31, 2008, the government shall file factual returns for the following petitioners: Anam (ISN 569); Mohammad (ISN 27); Slahi (ISN 760); Al Zaher (ISN 89); Al Sanani (ISN 170); and Saeed (ISN 728). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1)
December 17, 2008 1334 Featured Case Emergency MOTION For An Order Enjoining Transfer Of Petitioner To Libya, And Authorities In Support by ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Thomas)
December 17, 2008 1333 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgments)(Bronte, Patricia)
December 17, 2008 1332 Featured Case Consent MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
December 17, 2008 1331 Featured Case Consent MOTION to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
December 17, 2008 1330 Featured Case NOTICE of filing (under seal) Motion to Stay Habeas Proceedings by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Folio, Joseph)
December 17, 2008 1329 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Karp, David)
December 17, 2008 1328 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Cowan, Jennifer)
December 17, 2008 1325 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Cowan, Jennifer)
December 17, 2008 1324 Featured Case NOTICE //Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Cowan, Jennifer)
December 17, 2008 1323 Featured Case ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1)
December 17, 2008 1322 Featured Case STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's December 10, 2008 Minute Order by MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI. (Strauss, Lisa)
December 17, 2008 1321 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Missing, John)
December 17, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Case Management Order first entered on November 6, 2008, in 08-mc-442 (docket # 940), as amended by the Court's December 16, 2008, Order in 08-mc-442 (docket # 1315), shall govern habeas corpus proceedings in 08-cv-1828, 08-cv-1923, 08-cv-2019, and 08-cv-2083. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1)
December 17, 2008 1320 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Missing, John)
December 17, 2008 1319 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Missing, John)
December 17, 2008 1318 Featured Case NOTICE Re Memorandum of Understanding of Daniel Malone Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HAMID AL RAZAK, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL HAQ (Sarkessian, Juliet)
December 16, 2008 1327 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1326 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 100 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH) MOTION for Discovery filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
December 16, 2008 1326 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery by YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf)
December 16, 2008 1317 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Livingston, Schuyler)
December 16, 2008 1316 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Livingston, Schuyler)
December 16, 2008 1315 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order andSupplemental Amended Orders or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certification for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and to Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution of the Motion and any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/16/08. (lctfh1)
December 16, 2008 1314 Featured Case ORDER STAYING Civil Action 02-02337. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 16, 2008. (NP)
December 16, 2008 1313 Featured Case ORDER STAYING Civil Action 06-01765. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 16, 2008. (NP)
December 16, 2008 1312 Featured Case Unopposed MOTION for Order to File Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Cox, James)
December 16, 2008 1311 Featured Case STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's December 11, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Needle, Jonathan)
December 15, 2008 1310 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Avila, David)
December 15, 2008 1309 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of December 2, 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
December 15, 2008 1308 Featured Case NOTICE Notice of Filing Protected Information by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Matheny, Steve)
December 15, 2008 1307 Featured Case STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's December 10, 2008 Minute Order by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Davis, Patrick)
December 15, 2008 1306 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Protected Information by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Young, Frederick)
December 15, 2008 1305 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re 409 Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Leder, Paul)
December 15, 2008 1304 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re 409 Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Leder, Paul)
December 15, 2008 1303 Featured Case Memorandum in opposition to re (1157 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 141 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR) MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) Second Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Exception from the Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order Regarding Sequencing filed by MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI. (Royce, Sylvia)
December 15, 2008 1302 Featured Case NOTICE of Supplemental Proposal and Notice Regarding Government's "Encounters" with Exculpatory Evidence by ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI (Gorman, H.)
December 15, 2008 1301 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
December 15, 2008 Featured Case NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 1210 MOTION to Seal Document was corrected to reflect the filer as the petitioner.(jeb, )
December 15, 2008 1298 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing - Declaration of Samuel C. Kauffman by MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED (Kauffman, Samuel)
December 15, 2008 1295 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Smart, James)
December 15, 2008 1294 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Smart, James)
December 15, 2008 1292 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Smart, James)
December 15, 2008 1291 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Protected Information by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Matheny, Steve) Modified on 12/15/2008 (tr)(ATTACHMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL).
December 15, 2008 1290 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Schwartz, James)
December 13, 2008 1289 Featured Case NOTICE Of Service Of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON (Avila, David)
December 13, 2008 1288 Featured Case NOTICE Of Service Of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Avila, David)
December 12, 2008 1287 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO (Belhorn, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1286 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 1285 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Truman, Phillip)
December 12, 2008 1284 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 1283 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Truman, Phillip)
December 12, 2008 1282 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Marconda, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1281 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 1280 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Kanellis, William)
December 12, 2008 1279 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected, Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH (Kanellis, William)
December 12, 2008 1278 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 1277 Featured Case NOTICE Filing Unclassified Protected Amended Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dalton, Robert)
December 12, 2008 1276 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Ahern, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1275 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Ahern, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1274 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Ahern, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1273 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Ahern, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1272 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Patton, Rodney)
December 12, 2008 1271 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Martin, Edward)
December 12, 2008 1270 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Martin, Edward)
December 12, 2008 1269 Featured Case RESPONSE to Respondent's Request for Exception from Sequencing filed by JAMIL AHMAD SAEED. (Rashkind, Noah)
December 12, 2008 1268 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Westby, Jane)
December 12, 2008 1267 Featured Case NOTICE of service of unclassified return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Apperson, Jay)
December 12, 2008 1266 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Farnham, David)
December 12, 2008 1265 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return (ISN 552) by GEORGE W. BUSH (Battaglia, John)
December 12, 2008 1264 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Farnham, David)
December 12, 2008 1263 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Palmer, Joseph)
December 12, 2008 1262 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH (Battaglia, John)
December 12, 2008 1261 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Smith, Emily)
December 12, 2008 1260 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Stander, David)
December 12, 2008 1259 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Marconda, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1258 Featured Case NOTICE by GEORGE W. BUSH (Siemietkowski, John)
December 12, 2008 1257 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Cirino, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1256 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Ahern, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1255 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Farnham, David)
December 12, 2008 1254 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Servatius, Kathleen)
December 12, 2008 1253 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Cirino, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1252 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FILING OF UNCLASSIFIED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Branman, Robert)
December 12, 2008 1251 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dalton, Robert)
December 12, 2008 1250 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Battaglia, John)
December 12, 2008 1249 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Belhorn, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1248 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by DONALD RUMSFELD (Eltringham, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1247 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Respondents Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Leave for Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Prince, Robert)
December 12, 2008 1246 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Protected Information(Narrative-Faraj) by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Lohrer, John)
December 12, 2008 1245 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified Protected Amended Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (McVeigh, Peter)
December 12, 2008 1244 Featured Case NOTICE Notice of Filing of Protected Information (Narrative-al Warafi) by JAY HOOD (Lohrer, John)
December 12, 2008 1243 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Shoemaker, Martin)
December 12, 2008 1242 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Servatius, Kathleen)
December 12, 2008 1241 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified Protected Amended Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (McVeigh, Peter)
December 12, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting (docket # 21, 08-cv-1733) Petitioner's Unopposed Motion on Behalf of Petitioner Hassan Abdul Said for Extension of Time to File Authorization. Accordingly, by March 16, 2009, Petitioner's counsel shall file a signed authorization from Petitioner to pursue this action or a declaration by counsel that states that Petitioner directly authorized counsel to pursue the action and explains why counsel was unable to secure a signed authorization. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/12/08. (lctfh1)
December 12, 2008 1240 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Cox, James)
December 12, 2008 1239 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER (Cox, James)
December 12, 2008 1238 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified Protected Factual Return by HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD (McVeigh, Peter)
December 12, 2008 1237 Featured Case NOTICE Of Filing Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Avila, David)
December 12, 2008 1236 Featured Case NOTICE of service of unclassified protected return by GEORGE W. BUSH (Groner, Arlene)
December 12, 2008 1235 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (LaVicka, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2008 1234 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Dalton, Robert)
December 12, 2008 1233 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Marconda, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1232 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Cox, James)
December 12, 2008 1231 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Marconda, Scott)
December 12, 2008 1230 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Cirino, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1229 Featured Case NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER (Westby, Jane)
December 12, 2008 1228 Featured Case NOTICE of Filing Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Cirino, Paul)
December 12, 2008 1227 Featured Case NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNCLASSIFIED, PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy)