MARBURY LAW GROUP, PLLC v. CARL

Plaintiff: MARBURY LAW GROUP, PLLC
Defendant: BERNARD J. CARL
Case Number: 1:2009cv01402
Filed: July 28, 2009
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 3, 2009. (lcckk2 )
July 27, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 27, 2010. (lcckk2 )
August 1, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 1, 2011. (lcckk3)
July 21, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 21, 2013. (lcckk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARBURY LAW GROUP, PLLC v. CARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARBURY LAW GROUP, PLLC
Represented By: John F. Mardula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD J. CARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.