LEE v. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Plaintiff: JOSEPH LEE
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2009cv01832
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 1, 2013. (lcrc2)
August 25, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying the defendant's 3 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 08/25/10.(lcrmu1).
February 20, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 83 Plaintiff's Motion for a New Trial. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/20/2014. (lcrc2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH LEE
Represented By: James Charles Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]