ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG v. DOES 1 - 2,094 Featured Case

Plaintiff: ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG
Defendant: DOES 1 - 2,094
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00453
Filed: March 18, 2010
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2011 172 Memorandum in opposition to Doc. No. 171 filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 8, 2011 171 SEALED MOTION to Quash filed by DOE(IP Address 76-186-163-104). Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 7/8/2011 approved filing of these documents by fiat.(These documents are SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 28, 2011 170 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 6/27/11. (SP, )
May 6, 2011 169 Mail Returned as undeliverable. sent to Franklin Johnson; Type of Document Returned: Notice to Counsel for Order re referral filed on 04/20/11 168 ; Resent at new address: no new address. (ldc, )
April 20, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for full case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 4/20/11. (SP, )
April 15, 2011 167 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for full case management. (zsmm)
April 15, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Facciola for full case management. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/15/2010. (KD)
April 15, 2011 166 Featured Case ORDER denying 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 164 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; granting 165 Adrienne Neal's Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default; and setting aside 159 the Clerk's entry of default as to Adrienne Neal. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/15/2010. (KD)
April 14, 2011 165 MOTION to Set Aside 159 Clerk's Entry of Default by ADRIENNE NEAL "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer.(rdj)
April 6, 2011 Leave to File Denied. Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena directed to non-party case. "Leave to file DENIED, Order at DKT 91 precludes anonymity" by Judge RM Collyer. (rdj)
March 11, 2011 164 MOTION to Strike 162 Letter by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (See Docket Entry 163 to view document)(rdj)
March 11, 2011 163 RESPONSE re 162 Letter AND REQUEST TO STRIKE LETTER AND EXHIBITS FILED BY DEFAULTED DEFENDANT ADRIENNE NEAL filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
March 1, 2011 162 Letter with exhibits from From Adrienne D. Neal "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer on 3/1/2011 (rdj)
February 23, 2011 161 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Adrianne Neal by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
February 18, 2011 160 STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO COURTS ORDER OF 11/19/10 [DOC. NO. 143] by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
February 3, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 152 Time Warner's motion for reconsideration of 33 order modifying subpoena and renewed request to quash. Because the controlling law and facts have not changed, the motion for reconsideration and renewed motion to quash 152 are denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/3/2011. (KD)
February 1, 2011 159 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ADRIENNE NEAL (rdj)
January 31, 2011 158 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT re 157 Affidavit for Default ON DEFENDANT ADRIENNE NEAL by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
January 31, 2011 157 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT ON DEFENDANT ADRIENNE NEAL by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
January 13, 2011 156 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ADRIENNE NEAL served on 12/29/2010, answer due 1/19/2011 (Kurtz, Nicholas)
January 11, 2011 155 Mail Returned as undeliverable, sent to Franklin Johnson. Type of Document Returned: Court's order of 12/15/2010. No forwarding address provided. (cdw)
January 6, 2011 154 REPLY to opposition to motion re 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, filed by TIME WARNER CABLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Maltas, Alexander)
December 30, 2010 153 Memorandum in opposition to re 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
December 27, 2010 SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to ADRIENNE NEAL (rdj)
December 21, 2010 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order granting 13 Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena. The subpoena is MODIFIED as specified in this Order.by TIME WARNER CABLE INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Maltas, Alexander) Modified on 12/22/2010 to enhance text and correct linkage (rdj).
December 15, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to 151 Order approving dismissal, the following motions are denied as moot: 48 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 51 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 54 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 60 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 63 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 66 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 71 Motion for Extension of Time to; 77 Motion to Dismiss; 82 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 85 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 89 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 96 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 99 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 102 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 105 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 128 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 132 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 137 Motion to Dismiss; 147 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 148 Motion to Quash; 148 Motion to Vacate; 149 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/15/10. (KD)
December 14, 2010 151 Featured Case ORDER approving 144 Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal of numerous Does and noting that individuals who have filed as Interested Parties are dismissed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/14/10. (KD)
December 14, 2010 150 Mail Returned as undeliverable sent to Franklin Nash. Type of Document Returned: Court's order of 11/4/2010. Resent at new address: None Provided. (cdw)
December 13, 2010 149 MOTION for Protective Order by GRACIELA N. VARGAS "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer.(rdj)
December 13, 2010 148 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by GRACIELA N. VARGAS "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
December 13, 2010 147 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GRACIELA N. VARGAS "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
December 9, 2010 146 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 6/30/10; Page Numbers: 1-63. Date of Issuance:6/26/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystal_pilgrim@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2011.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
December 7, 2010 Summons (1) Issued as to ADRIENNE NEAL. (rdj)
December 6, 2010 145 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADRIENNE NEAL, DOES filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rdj)
December 6, 2010 144 NOTICE OF FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DOE DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO COURTS ORDER OF 11/19/10 by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG re 143 Order on Motion for Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
November 19, 2010 143 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Name and Serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/19/10. (KD)
November 18, 2010 142 Memorandum in opposition to re 140 MOTION for Order FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO NAME AND SERVE DEFENDANTS Opposition to Plaintiffs Further Motion for Extension of Time To Name and Serve Defendants [Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) (Dkt. 140) filed by PETER ANDERSON, TAUNNIA BOCKMEIR, JESSICA BURKE, MARK CHABOTTE, RANDY COBB, KEENAN CONRAD, STEVEN DEMANETT, ANTHONY DEMARCO, ERIC FISCHER, JAMES HERALD, JERRY JOSEPH, DAVID LA, KIRK LARSON, DAVID LYONS, ROBERT SCOTT MASON, JOSEPH J. MAUER, JR, ERNIE MITCHELL, HAFEZ MODI, LOUIS NUYENS, BERNARD OH, DAWN OWEN, DENNIS RIVERA, JOHN SCHLAERTH, NICKOLAS WAYNE SULLIVAN, IVAN SUSHCHIK, MICHELLE SUTTON, C. BRUCE TRZCINSKI, TERRY WHITE, CHRIS WIDMER, MARY WRIGHT. (Diedoardo, Christina)
November 18, 2010 141 Featured Case ORDER denying 138 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/18/10. (KD)
November 18, 2010 140 MOTION for Order FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO NAME AND SERVE DEFENDANTS by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
November 18, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 137 Motion to Quash for the reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. The motion to dismiss set forth in 137 remains pending. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/18/10. (KD)
November 18, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 139 Motion to Seal for the reasons stated in 91 denying John Does' request to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/18/10. (KD)
November 16, 2010 139 MOTION to Seal by BETTY YOUNG "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/16/10 (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Quash, # 2 Declaration of Betty Young, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order to Motion to Quash)(rdj) (exhibits lodged under seal).
November 16, 2010 138 MOTION to Quash by BETTY YOUNG "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/16/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
November 10, 2010 137 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Dismiss by LARRY COLLINS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)"Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer.
November 10, 2010 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. King on behalf of LARRY COLLINS (rdj) "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer.
November 9, 2010 135 Memorandum in opposition to re 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 132 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
November 4, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 107 Motion for Joinder in 77 motion to dismiss; Ernie Mitchell is permitted to join in 77 motion to dismiss; denying 122 Motion to Quash; denying 127 Motion to Quash; denying 127 Motion to Vacate; denying 129 Motion for Protective Order; denying 131 Motion to Quash; denying 131 Motion to Vacate; denying 133 Motion for Protective Order for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion at docket 44 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/4/10. (KD)
November 3, 2010 134 NOTICE of Compliance with Order by MICHAEL E. BILLER re 91 Order (rdj) "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer on 11/3/10
November 2, 2010 Leave to File Denied by Judge RM Collyer. Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Patrick J. King ; Consolidated Motion to Quash and Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Larry Collins. "Let this NOT be filed...must give name, address, phone of defendant" Modified on 11/15/2010 (rdj).
November 1, 2010 133 MOTION for Protective Order by HOLLY A. DAM "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10 (rdj)
November 1, 2010 132 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by HOLLY A. DAM "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
November 1, 2010 131 MOTION to Quash,and/or MOTION to Vacate by HOLLY A. DAM "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Subpoena)(rdj)
November 1, 2010 130 NOTICE of Compliance with Order by NATHAN KILLIAN re 91 Order (rdj) "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10
November 1, 2010 129 MOTION for Protective Order by JEFFREY COLTER WALLACE "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10(rdj)
November 1, 2010 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JEFFREY COLTER WALLACE "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
November 1, 2010 127 MOTION to Quash,and/or MOTION to Vacate by JEFFREY COLTER WALLACE "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 11/1/10 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
October 25, 2010 126 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHELLE P. FELIX (rdj)
October 21, 2010 125 NOTICE indicating name, address, phone number and email address by JEFFERY P. COOK (rdj)
October 15, 2010 124 MEMORANDUM re 110 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Hofmann, Marcia)
October 15, 2010 123 NOTICE OF IDENTIFYING INFORMATION FOR DOE DEFENDANTS, LA, LYONS and SCHLAERTH by DAVID LA, DAVID LYONS, JOHN SCHLAERTH re 119 Reply to opposition to Motion, 118 Notice (Other) (Lening, Carey)
October 12, 2010 122 MOTION to Quash by FRANKLIN JOHNSON"Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer on 10/2010 (rdj)
October 9, 2010 120 NOTICE of Filing Additional Declarations in Support of Omnibus Motion to Quash/Motion to Dismiss by DOES 1 - 4,577 re 119 Reply to opposition to Motion, 118 Notice (Other), 77 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terry White, # 2 Declaration of Steve Demanett, # 3 Declaration Kirk Larson, # 4 Declaration of John Schlaerth)(Patrick, Bradford)
October 9, 2010 119 REPLY to opposition to motion re 77 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss - the Reply is resubmitted in light of identification of John Doe Defendants per Dkt. 91 (Order) and Dkt. 118 (Notice of Filing) filed by DOES 1 - 4,577. (Patrick, Bradford)
October 9, 2010 118 NOTICE OF FILING OF "JOHN DOE" IDENTIFYING INFORMATION as required by Order Dkt. 91 by DOES 1 - 4,577 re 91 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - John Doe Identifying Information)(Patrick, Bradford)
October 8, 2010 121 Featured Case ORDER granting 116 Consent Motion for Order to withdraw motion to quash subpoena/motion to dismiss as it pertains to Samir El-Gindi. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on October 8, 2010. (cdw)
October 7, 2010 117 REPLY to opposition to motion re 77 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss filed by SAMIR EL-GINDI. (rdj)
October 7, 2010 116 Consent MOTION for Order TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA/MOTION TO DISMISS AS IT PERTAINS TO SAMIR EL-GINDI by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
October 6, 2010 Leave to File Denied by Judge RM Collyer. Reply of Bernard Oh and Other Moving Defendants to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss, "Leave to File Denied" (rdj) Modified on 11/15/2010 (rdj).
October 6, 2010 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Chintella on behalf of SAMIR EL-GINDI (znmw, )
October 6, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying Carey Lening's request for leave to file Reply of Bernard Oh and Other Moving Defendants to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss 77 . Pursuant to Order 91 John Does are required to file a notice indicating their identity by name, address, phone number, and email address no later than October 29, 2010. Future filings by John Does will not be permitted without such identification. The proposed Reply does not adequately identify the John Does represented by Ms. Lening. Attorneys who have filed appearances in this case must file using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/6/10. (KD)
October 5, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 110 due by 10/15/2010. Reply to 77 due by 10/18/2010. (cdw)
October 5, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 77 Motion to Dismiss and 109 Plaintiff's opposition to motions to dismiss. Samir El-Gindi shall file a reply no later than 10/18/2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/5/10. (KD)
October 4, 2010 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for John Doe 29 (Samir El-Gindi) by DOES 1 - 4,577 (Lening, Carey)
October 4, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to File response to 110 Plaintiff's statements of good cause. Amici Curiae shall file a response no later than October 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/4/10. (KD)
October 4, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 111 Motion to Quash; denying 112 Motion to Quash; and denying 112 Motion to Vacate for the reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/4/10. (KD)
October 3, 2010 113 MOTION for Leave to File A MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENTS OF GOOD CAUSE by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES OF THE NATION'S CAPITAL, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, PUBLIC CITIZEN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
September 28, 2010 112 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by MARINA FLETCHER "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/28/2010(rdj)
September 28, 2010 111 MOTION to Quash and/or Limit Subpoena by SANDRA MOUAT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) "Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/28/2010(rdj)
September 28, 2010 110 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG re 46 Order. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
September 24, 2010 109 Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Protective Order, 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 107 MOTION for Joinder, 77 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
September 24, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 98 Motion to Quash; denying 98 Motion to Vacate; denying 100 Motion for Protective Order; denying 101 Motion to Quash; denying 101 Motion to Vacate; denying 103 Motion for Protective Order; denying 104 Motion to Quash; denying 104 Motion to Vacate; denying 106 Motion for Protective Order; denying 108 Motion to Quash for reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/24/10. (KD)
September 23, 2010 108 MOTION to Quash by PETE A. FEARNLEY "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/23/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 107 MOTION for Joinder with Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Docket Entry 77 by ERNIE MITCHELL "Leave to file", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 106 MOTION for Protective Order by GALILEO P. SAPITAN "Leave to file", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GALILEO P. SAPITAN "Leave to file", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 104 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by GALILEO P. SAPITAN "Leave to file", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 103 MOTION for Protective Order by PHILLIP EARL POORMAN "Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PHILLIP EARL POORMAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)"Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 101 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by PHILLIP EARL POORMAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)"Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 100 MOTION for Protective Order by BRANDON L. CONRAD "Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BRANDON L. CONRAD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)"Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 98 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by BRANDON L. CONRAD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)"Leave to file GRANTED", by Judge RM Collyer on 9/22/2010(rdj)
September 22, 2010 Leave to File Denied by Judge RM Collyer. Motion to Quash Subpoena by IP Address 24.218.150.165 "Leave to File DENIED, cannot proceed anonymously See Dkt #91" (rdj) Modified on 11/15/2010 (rdj).
September 22, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 95 Motion to Quash; denying 95 Motion to Vacate ; and denying 97 Motion for Protective Order for the reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/22/10. (KD)
September 21, 2010 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 94 Affidavit, was entered in error as counsel needs leave of the Court and counsel was(is) advised that if leave was granted said pleading will be refiled. (rdj)
September 17, 2010 Leave to File Denied by Judge RM Collyer. Motion to Quash/Vacate Subpoena ; Affidavit in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum ; Motion to Quash and/or Vacate Subpoena and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, "Leave to File DENIED, Cannot proceed as John Doe See Order Dkt# 91 " (rdj) Modified on 11/15/2010 (rdj).
September 17, 2010 94 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT re 77 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Ernie Mitchell in Support of and Joinder With Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Dkt#77) by ERNIE MITCHELL. (Diedoardo, Christina) Modified on 9/21/2010 (rdj).
September 16, 2010 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford A. Patrick on behalf of DOES 1 - 4,577 (Patrick, Bradford)
September 16, 2010 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina A. Diedoardo on behalf of DOES 1 - 4,577 (Diedoardo, Christina)
September 16, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 66 Motion for Protective Order; denying 67 Motion to Quash or Vacate; denying 67 Motion for Protective Order; and denying 77 Motion to Quash for the reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motions to dismiss in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/16/10. (KD)
September 16, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 43 Motion to Quash; denying 47 Motion to Quash; denying 49 Motion for Protective Order; denying 50 Motion to Quash; denying 52 Motion for Protective Order; denying 53 Motion to Quash; denying 55 Motion for Protective Order; denying 56 Motion to Quash; denying 58 Motion for Protective Order; denying 59 Motion to Quash; denying 61 Motion for Protective Order; denying 62 Motion to Quash; denying 64 Motion for Protective Order; denying 65 Motion to Quash; denying 68 Motion to Quash; denying 69 Motion to Quash; denying 70 Motion to Quash; denying 72 Motion to Quash; denying 73 Motion to Quash; denying 74 Motion to Quash; denying 80 Motion to Quash; denying 81 Motion to Quash; denying 83 Motion for Protective Order; denying 84 Motion to Quash; denying 86 Motion for Protective Order; denying 87 Motion to Quash; denying 88 Motion to Quash; denying 90 Motion for Protective Order for the reasons stated in 44 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/16/10. (KD)
September 16, 2010 91 Featured Case ORDER denying John Does' request to proceed anonymously and requiring John Does to file a notice indicating their name, address, phone and email address no later than October 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/16/10. (KD) (Main Document 91 replaced on 9/17/2010) (td, ).
September 15, 2010 97 MOTION for Protective Order by MEISHA ESCOFFERY "Let this be FILED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/16/2010 (rdj)
September 15, 2010 96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MEISHA ESCOFFERY "Let this be FILED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 95 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by MEISHA ESCOFFERY "Let this be FILED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/2010(Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 90 MOTION for Protective Order by KALEY M. TWYFORD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10.(rdj)
September 15, 2010 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KALEY M. TWYFORD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 88 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by KALEY M. TWYFORD"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 87 MOTION to Quash by TALAL BARGHOUTHI "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10.(rdj)
September 15, 2010 86 MOTION for Protective Order by KEITH LENHART "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10.(rdj)
September 15, 2010 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KEITH LENHART "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 84 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by KEITH LENHART"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 83 MOTION for Protective Order by MARIE C. MOISSONNIER "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10.(rdj)
September 15, 2010 82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MARIE C. MOISSONNIER"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 15, 2010 81 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by MARIE C. MOISSONNIER "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj) (
September 15, 2010 80 MOTION to Quash by DOE(76.29.149.94)"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Doe Contact Info.)(zrdj)
September 15, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/15/10. (KD)
September 15, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/15/10. (KD)
September 13, 2010 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bradford A. Patrick, :Address- 3001 North Rocky Point Drive East, Suite 200, Tampa FL 33607. Phone No. - (813) 384-8548. by DOE(24.253.45.84), DOE(76.126.176.26), DOE(98.234.169.52), DOE(68.63.76.177), DOE(98.244.108.142), DOE(76.105.202.30), DOE(24.19.133.121),DOE(98.215.215.68), DOE(98.232.152.166), DOE(98.232.14.47), DOE(98.166.240.65),DOE(67.170.74.82), DOE(24.7.185.157), DOE(71.202.253.148), DOE(67.185.180.15),DOE(76.121.211.115), DOE(67.171.17.71), DOE(98.203.134.206), DOE(76.104.162.56),DOE(24.22.62.208), DOE(76.110.116.238), DOE(76.17.14.76), DOE(68.47.5.56), DOE(24.98.27.71), DOE(98.255.9.15), DOE(66.41.149.234), DOE(71.235.60.12), DOE(67.160.123.244),"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christina A. Diedoardo, :Address- 201 Spear Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, Ca 94105. Phone No. - (415) 839-5098. by DOE(24.253.45.84), DOE(76.126.176.26), DOE(98.234.169.52), DOE(68.63.76.177), DOE(98.244.108.142), DOE(76.105.202.30), DOE(24.19.133.121),DOE(98.215.215.68), DOE(98.232.152.166), DOE(98.232.14.47), DOE(98.166.240.65),DOE(67.170.74.82), DOE(24.7.185.157), DOE(71.202.253.148), DOE(67.185.180.15),DOE(76.121.211.115), DOE(67.171.17.71), DOE(98.203.134.206), DOE(76.104.162.56),DOE(24.22.62.208), DOE(76.110.116.238), DOE(76.17.14.76), DOE(68.47.5.56), DOE(24.98.27.71), DOE(98.255.9.15), DOE(66.41.149.234), DOE(71.235.60.12), DOE(67.160.123.244),"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 77 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Dismiss by DOE(24.253.45.84), DOE(76.126.176.26), DOE(98.234.169.52), DOE(68.63.76.177), DOE(98.244.108.142), DOE(76.105.202.30), DOE(24.19.133.121),DOE(98.215.215.68), DOE(98.232.152.166), DOE(98.232.14.47), DOE(98.166.240.65),DOE(67.170.74.82), DOE(24.7.185.157), DOE(71.202.253.148), DOE(67.185.180.15),DOE(76.121.211.115), DOE(67.171.17.71), DOE(98.203.134.206), DOE(76.104.162.56),DOE(24.22.62.208), DOE(76.110.116.238), DOE(76.17.14.76), DOE(68.47.5.56), DOE(24.98.27.71), DOE(98.255.9.15), DOE(66.41.149.234), DOE(71.235.60.12), DOE(67.160.123.244),"Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj, )
September 13, 2010 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey N. Lening on behalf of DOE(24.253.45.84), DOE(76.126.176.26), DOE(98.234.169.52), DOE(68.63.76.177), DOE(98.244.108.142), DOE(76.105.202.30), DOE(24.19.133.121), DOE(98.215.215.68), DOE(98.232.152.166), DOE(98.232.14.47), DOE(98.166.240.65), DOE(67.170.74.82), DOE(24.7.185.157), DOE(71.202.253.148), DOE(67.185.180.15), DOE(76.121.211.115), DOE(67.171.17.71), DOE(98.203.134.206), DOE(76.104.162.56), DOE(24.22.62.208), DOE(76.110.116.238), DOE(76.17.14.76), DOE(68.47.5.56), DOE(24.98.27.71), DOE(98.255.9.15), DOE(66.41.149.234), DOE(71.235.60.12), DOE(67.160.123.244) (rdj)
September 13, 2010 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Tuna Mecit on behalf of DOE(24.8.197.179), DOE(98.228.180.130), DOE(98.194.244.114), DOE(75.75.98.29), DOE(76.114.128.118), DOE(68.12.146.153) (rdj) "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.
September 13, 2010 74 MOTION to Quash by JOHN DOE "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s, # 2 Doe Contact Info.)(zrdj)
September 13, 2010 73 MOTION to Quash by DOROTHY L. JACOBS "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 72 MOTION to Quash by DOE 71.228.52.96 "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 71 MOTION for Extension of Time by DOE 70.178.253.33 "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 70 MOTION to Quash by JOHN KILGORE "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 69 MOTION to Quash (Letter) by ROBERT HUBBARD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 68 MOTION to Quash by REYNALD BOZIL "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 67 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for Protective Order by MICHELLE P. FELIX "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for Protective Order by BOUNHEUANE HOUANGUILAY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 65 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by BOUNHEUANE HOUANGUILAY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 64 MOTION for Protective Order by DONALD MEALEY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DONALD MEALEY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 62 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by DONALD MEALEY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 61 MOTION for Protective Order by MICHAEL E. BILLER "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MICHAEL E. BILLER "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 59 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by MICHAEL E. BILLER "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 58 MOTION for Protective Order by NATHAN KILLIAN "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NATHAN KILLIAN "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 56 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by NATHAN KILLIAN "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 55 MOTION for Protective Order by KENNETH A. EDMUNDS "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10(rdj)
September 13, 2010 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KENNETH A. EDMUNDS "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 53 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by KENNETH A. EDMUNDS "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 52 MOTION for Protective Order by OLEG UDUD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by OLEG UDUD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 50 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by OLEG UDUD "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 49 MOTION for Protective Order by HANNAH M. BULL "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10.(rdj)
September 13, 2010 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by HANNAH M. BULL "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 13, 2010 47 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate by HANNAH M. BULL "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/13/10. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(rdj)
September 10, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than September 30, 2010, why this case should not be dismissed against Mr. Ansell and Mr. Wright for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/10/10. (KD)
September 10, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Motion to Quash filed by Ansell; denying 20 Motion to Quash filed by Wright; denying 21 Motion to Quash filed by Buel, and 35 Motion to Quash filed by John Doe. The Clerk shall UNSEAL 35 Motion to Quash filed by John Doe. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/10/10. (KD)
September 10, 2010 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/10/10. (KD)
September 7, 2010 43 MOTION to Quash, MOTION to Vacate Subpoena by DOE "Let this be filed" by Judge RM Collyer on 9/7/10(rdj)
August 10, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Consent Motion to withdraw pages 1-2 of document #35. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on August 9, 2010. (cdw)
August 6, 2010 41 Consent MOTION for Order TO WITHDRAW PAGES 1-2 OF DOC. NO. 35 (LETTER MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 30, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER amending case caption to state "Does 1 - 4,577" instead of "Does 1 - 2094" pursuant to 12 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/30/10. (KD)
July 22, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. On July 15, 2010, Plaintiff submitted 36 a proposed version of the Court-Directed Notice to be sent by the non-party Internet Service Providers to Doe defendants. On July 15, 2010, Amici Curiae filed a 37 Memorandum, suggesting specific changes to 36 Plaintiff's proposed version. On July 21, 2010, Plaintiff submitted a 40 Supplemental Memorandum in support of 36 Plaintiff's proposed version. Having read and analyzed both arguments, the 36 Plaintiff's proposed version shall be established as the Court-Directed Notice to be sent by the non-party Internet Service Providers to Doe defendants. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/22/10.(lcrmc1)
July 22, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Name and Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall name and serve all defendants no later than November 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/22/10. (lcrmc1)
July 21, 2010 40 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 36 Notice of Proposed Order MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 20, 2010 39 MOTION for Order FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO NAME AND SERVE DEFENDANTS [Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m)] by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 19, 2010 38 Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION to Quash filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 15, 2010 37 MEMORANDUM re 36 Notice of Proposed Order filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hofmann, Marcia)
July 15, 2010 36 NOTICE of Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice pursuant to July 2, 2010 Court Order by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG re 34 Order on Motion to Strike, (Kurtz, Nicholas)
July 2, 2010 35 Featured Case MOTION to Quash Subpoena by JOHN DOE Defendant "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer (rdj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2010: # 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena (Pages 3-5)) (zrdj). Pages 1-2 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 08/10/2010 Unsealed PURSUANT to 09/10/2010 Order 45 by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer (zrdj).
July 2, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike supplemental affidavit 30 ; discharging Court's June 7, 2010 order to show cause; declining to sever Does at this juncture; suspending return dates on subpoenas; and requiring joint proposed notice to be filed by July 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/2/10. (KD)
July 2, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Time Warner Cable Inc.'s Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena. The subpoena is MODIFIED as specified in this Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/2/10. (KD)
June 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2010. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
June 29, 2010 32 ERRATA Re:Request for Judicial Notice (filing inadvertently omitted page 2 in Exhibit A) by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION 26 Amicus Brief, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES OF THE NATION'S CAPITAL, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Hofmann, Marcia)
June 29, 2010 31 MOTION to Strike 30 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SETH SCHOEN by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Kurtz, Nicholas)
June 28, 2010 30 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Amicus Brief, Supplemental Declaration of Seth Schoen by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Hofmann, Marcia)
June 22, 2010 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2010 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
June 21, 2010 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG re Order, AS TO WHY DEFENDANTS 2 THROUGH 4,577 SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR MISJOINDER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Achache)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
June 21, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Motion for Corynne McSherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of amicus filer Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/21/10. (KD)
June 18, 2010 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Corynne McSherry, :Firm- Electronic Frontier Foundation, :Address- 454 Shotwell Street, San Francisco, CA 94110. Phone No. - (415) 436-9333. Fax No. - (415) 436-9993 by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corynne McSherry, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia)
June 18, 2010 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Corynne McSherry, :Firm- Electronic Frontier Foundation, :Address- 454 Shotwell Street, San Francisco, CA 94110. Phone No. - (415) 436-9333. Fax No. - (415) 436-9993 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Corynne McSherry, :Firm- Electronic Frontier Foundation, :Address- 454 Shotwell Street, San Francisco, CA 94110. Phone No. - (415) 436-9333. Fax No. - (415) 436-9993 was entered in error at the request of counsel and counsel will refile said pleading. (rdj)
June 18, 2010 27 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Corynne McSherry, :Firm- Electronic Frontier Foundation, :Address- 454 Shotwell Street, San Francisco, CA 94110. Phone No. - (415) 436-9333. Fax No. - (415) 436-9993 by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corynne McSherry, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) Modified on 6/18/2010 (rdj).
June 7, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause order due by 6/21/2010. (cdw)
June 7, 2010 26 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES OF THE NATION'S CAPITAL, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, PUBLIC CITIZEN. (rdj)
June 7, 2010 25 Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION to Quash filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
June 7, 2010 24 Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION to Quash filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
June 7, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER requiring Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than June 21, 2010 why Doe Defendants 2 through 4,577 should not be dismissed for misjoinder under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/7/10. (KD)
June 7, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Amicus brief. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/7/10. (KD)
June 3, 2010 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by TIME WARNER CABLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Maltas, Alexander)
June 2, 2010 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, PUBLIC CITIZEN, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES OF THE NATION'S CAPITAL (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits, # 2 Schoen Declaration and Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
June 1, 2010 21 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by ELISE BUEL "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer (rdj)
June 1, 2010 20 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by WILLIAM J. WRIGHT "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer (rdj)
May 27, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER approving 18 Stipulation between Plaintiff and COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/27/10. (lcrmc1)
May 24, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Quash due by 5/31/2010. (cdw)
May 24, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION shall file any motion to quash the subopoena no later than May 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/10. (lcrmc1)
May 24, 2010 19 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Quash filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas M. Dunlap, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Kurtz, Nicholas)
May 19, 2010 18 STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND THIRD-PARTY COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC GOVERNING RESPONSES TO RULE 45 SUBPOENA AND THE COURTS MARCH 23 ORDER by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
May 19, 2010 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash by CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Genetski, Christian)
May 19, 2010 16 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Quash filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
May 14, 2010 15 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by RANDY ANSELL "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer(rdj)
May 13, 2010 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Kurtz on behalf of ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Kurtz, Nicholas)
May 13, 2010 13 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by TIME WARNER CABLE INC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
May 12, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion to Quash due by 5/19/2010. (cdw)
May 12, 2010 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 4,577 filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rdj)
May 12, 2010 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kurtz, Nicholas) Modified on 5/13/2010 (rdj).
May 12, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Cablevision Systems Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications, and any other internet service providers (ISPs) who may appear as interested parties in this matter may file motions to quash the subpoena no later than May 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/12/10. (lcrmc1)
May 11, 2010 10 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Motion to Quash by CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
May 11, 2010 9 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate T. ROWE PRICE GROUP, INC. for CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (rdj)
May 11, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian S. Genetski on behalf of CABLEVISION SYSTEMS CORPORATION (rdj)
May 10, 2010 7 STIPULATION Extension of Deadline to File Motion to Quash (Comcast) by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
March 23, 2010 6 Featured Case CORRECTED ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on March 22, 2010. (cdw)
March 19, 2010 5 ERRATA Corrected Proposed Order by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG 3 MOTION for Discovery Pre-Rule 26(f) Conference filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Dunlap, Thomas)
March 19, 2010 NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Motion for Discovery; emailed to tdunlap@dglegal.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. DE 4 is modified to reflect it's a memorandum; Memorandum should've been filed as part of DE 3 . (znmw, )
March 18, 2010 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Pre Rule 26f Conference by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhbit A, # 2 Declaration Exhbit B)(Dunlap, Thomas) Modified event title and link on 3/19/2010 (znmw, ).
March 18, 2010 3 MOTION for Discovery Pre-Rule 26(f) Conference by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Thomas)
March 18, 2010 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG (Dunlap, Thomas)
March 18, 2010 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DOES 1 - 2,094 (dr)
March 18, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 2,094 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616028353) filed by ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG v. DOES 1 - 2,094
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACHTE/NEUNTE BOLL KINO BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG
Represented By: Thomas Mansfield Dunlap
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 2,094
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]