SHELBY COUNTY, ALABAMA v. HOLDER

Plaintiff: SHELBY COUNTY, ALABAMA
Defendant: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00651
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John D. Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/28/2014. (lcjdb1)
September 16, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 7 defendant and 36 defendant-intervenors' request for discovery. See text of Memorandum Opinion & Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/16/2010. (lcjdb1)
September 21, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/21/11. (lcjdb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHELBY COUNTY, ALABAMA v. HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY COUNTY, ALABAMA
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.