BUSBY v. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: WANDA BUSBY
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. and DAVID N. PRENSKY
Case Number: 1:2010cv01025
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/6/11. (lcrmu2)
March 28, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/28/11. (lcrmu2)
January 20, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/20/2012. (lcrmu2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUSBY v. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA BUSBY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Represented By: Marjorie B. Manne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID N. PRENSKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]