STOVELL v. JAMES et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: LEICESTER BRYCE STOVELL
Defendant: GLORIA M. JAMES and LEBRON R. JAMES, SR.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01059
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2010 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Burlingame, John)
August 30, 2010 8 MOTION to Dismiss by GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR (Burlingame, John)
July 8, 2010 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion to Permit Appearance of Counsel Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah K. Rathke, contingent upon Attorney Rathke certifying to the Court that she is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; and granting 7 Motion to Permit Appearance Pro Hac Vice as to Frederick R. Nance, contingent upon attorney Nance certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 8, 2010. (SM)
July 8, 2010 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Frederick R. Nance, :Firm- Squire, Sanders & Dempsey L.L.P., :Address- 4900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square, Cleveland, OH 44114. Phone No. - 216-479-8623. Fax No. - 216-479-8780 by GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Fred Nance in Support of motion to appear Pro Hac Vice)(Burlingame, John)
July 8, 2010 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah K. Rathke, :Firm- Squire, Sanders & Dempsey L.L.P., :Address- 4900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square, Cleveland, OH 44114. Phone No. - 216-479-8379. Fax No. - 216-479-8780 by GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR (Burlingame, John)
July 6, 2010 Reset (Correct) Deadlines: Answer due by 8/30/2010, (znmw, )
July 2, 2010 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LEBRON R. JAMES, SR. LEBRON R. JAMES, SR waiver sent on 7/1/2010, answer due 8/30/2010. (Burlingame, John) Modified dates on 7/6/2010 (znmw, ).
July 2, 2010 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by GLORIA M. JAMES. GLORIA M. JAMES waiver sent on 7/1/2010, answer due 8/30/2010. (Burlingame, John) Modified dates on 7/6/2010 (znmw, ).
July 2, 2010 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Burlingame on behalf of GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR (Burlingame, John)
June 23, 2010 2 Featured Case ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on June 23, 2010. (SM)
June 23, 2010 Summons (2) Issued as to GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR. (rdj)
June 23, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against GLORIA M. JAMES, LEBRON R. JAMES, SR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030695) filed by LEICESTER BRYCE STOVELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOVELL v. JAMES et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEICESTER BRYCE STOVELL
Represented By: Leicester B. Stovell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA M. JAMES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEBRON R. JAMES, SR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]