ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Featured Case

Under the Freedom of Information Act, Plaintiff Electronic Privacy Information Center seeks records from the US Department of Homeland Security concerning the radiation risks posed by DHS's airport full body scanner program.

Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01992
Filed: November 19, 2010
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Modify Briefing Schedule. The motion for summary judgment will be due 8/12/2011, the opposition to the motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 9/16/2011, the reply to the motion for summary judgment and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 9/26/2011, and the reply to the cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 10/10/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/15/2011. (MT)
July 14, 2011 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefs by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
June 3, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Document Release due by 6/20/2011; Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 7/25/2011, Response to Motion for Summary Judgment andCross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/29/2011, Response to Cross Motion and Reply to the Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/12/2011. Reply to the Cross Motion due by 9/26/2011. (jth)
June 3, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The close of discovery will be extended from 6/6/2011 to 6/20/2011, defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due 7/25/2011, plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment and cross motion for summary judgment will be due 8/29/2011, defendant's reply to the motion for summary judgment and opposition to the cross motion for summary judgment will be due 9/12/2011 and plaintiff's reply to the cross motion for summary judgment will be due 9/26/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/3/11. (MT, )
June 2, 2011 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Release of Documents and to Modify Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
March 30, 2011 Case randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's completion of production of documents by 6/6/2011, Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion (Including a Vaughn Index) due by 7/11/2011; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 8/15/2011, Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 8/29/2011, Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/12/2011. (jth)
January 21, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re 5 Status Report: it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule is approved; and it is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: Defendant's completion of production of documents is due by June 6, 2011; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (including a final Vaughn index) is due by July 11, 2011; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion is due by August 15, 2011; Defendant's Reply and Opposition is due by August 29, 2011; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by September 12, 2011. In the event the parties are able to resolve or further limit the issues before the Court, the parties will promptly inform the Court and propose any appropriate modifications to the schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 21, 2011. (AG)
January 20, 2011 5 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Grauman, Jesse)
January 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/20/2011. (jth)
January 6, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule by January 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 6, 2010. (AG)
January 6, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 3 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 6, 2010. (AG)
January 5, 2011 4 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: FOIA Request)(Grauman, Jesse)
December 21, 2010 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Wells v. Newsome, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
November 19, 2010 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (jf, )
November 19, 2010 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
November 19, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616034354) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: John Arthur Verdi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]