YUNG v. IT DISCOVERY, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: KWONG HIU YUNG
Defendant: IT DISCOVERY, INC. and INSTITUTIONAL TRADING CORPORATION
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00857
Filed: May 6, 2011
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John M. Facciola
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 43 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:11-cv-01056. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2011: # 2 Notice to Counsel/Party, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (rdj).
April 28, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 12 Motion to Remand and granting 6 Motion to Transfer (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 26, 2011 40 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 4/26/2011) re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer filed by Institutional Trading Corporation, IT Discovery, Inc, 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 25, 2011 39 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 5/31/2011 Case Management Conference reset to 6/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 22, 2011 38 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative , for Summarny Judgment or Transfer re 6 filed by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 4/22/2011) Modified on 4/25/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 20, 2011 37 Rebuttal to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand and Declaration in Support Thereof re ( 12 ) filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20110321_yung_defendantremand.pdf) (Yung, Kwong) (Filed on 4/20/2011) Text modified on 4/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 20, 2011 36 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Declaration in Support Thereof re ( 6 ) filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 13, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for 6 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 13, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 13, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 14 Motion to Continue (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 13, 2011 Remark: Clerk mailed Pacer Registration Forms and copy of Order Granting ECF Access to Plaintiff (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 13, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for ECF and Library Access (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 5, 2011 32 Proof of Service re ( 29 ) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Back to State Court , ( 30 ) DECLARATION of C. Christine Maloney In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, ( 31 ) DECLARATION of Lauretta Adams in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 5, 2011 31 DECLARATION of Lauretta Adams in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re 29 filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 5, 2011 30 DECLARATION of C. Christine Maloney In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re ( 29 ) filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D continued) (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
April 5, 2011 29 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Back to State Court re 12 filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 30, 2011 28 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 30, 2011 27 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 28 . *** CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 29, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Setting Deadline for Defendant IT Discovery, Inc. To Consent To Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge or To Request Reassignment To a District Judge. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 29, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 25 Proof of Service re ( 22 ), ( 23 ) and ( 24 ) by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Text modified and linkage added on 3/29/2011 incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 24 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for ECF Access and Library Acess (re 16 filed by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 23 DECLARATION of C. Christine Maloney in Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re ( 22 ) led by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 22 Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (re 14 filed by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 21 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 28, 2011 20 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kwong Hiu Yung (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 23, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER Setting Deadline To Consent To Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge or To Request Reassignment To a District Judge. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 17 (Proposed) Order Granting Administrative Motion and Administrative Motion for ECF Access and Library Access re 16 by Kwong Hiu Yung. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 16 Notice of Administrative Motion and Administrative Motion for ECF Access and Library Access filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 15 (Proposed) Order Granting Administrative Motion to Continue Motion to Dismiss re 14 by Kwong Hiu Yung (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 14 Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Administrative Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 13 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Remand Back to Santa Clara County Superior Court re 12 by Kwong Hiu Yung. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 22, 2011 12 Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Back to Santa Clara County Superior Court filed by Kwong Hiu Yung. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2011: # 1 12) (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 16, 2011 11 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/16/2011) Modified on 3/17/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 15, 2011 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer 8 Declaration in Support, 9 Request for Judicial Notice, by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation(Maloney C.) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 14, 2011 9 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer re 6 filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-Statement of Material Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Tab-2, # 3 Exhibit-2) (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 14, 2011 8 Declaration of Mark Cordover in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer to United States District Court for thet District of Columbia re 6 filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 14, 2011 7 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Summary Judgment Or Transfer to United States District Court For The District of Columbia re ( 6 ) filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Text modified on 3/15/2011 incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 14, 2011 6 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment or Transfer filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 11, 2011 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ( 1 ) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ; ( 2 ) Certificate of Service of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court; ( 3 ) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER; ([4} Amended Certificate Of Service of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Linkage added on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 11, 2011 4 Amended Certificate Of Service of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 7, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 7, 2011 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, # 4 Standing Orders Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 7, 2011 2 Certificate of Service of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]
March 7, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS); jury demand; from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 110CV189319. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611009228). Filed by IT Discovery, Inc, Institutional Trading Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/9/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: YUNG v. IT DISCOVERY, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KWONG HIU YUNG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT DISCOVERY, INC.
Represented By: John M. Remy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTITUTIONAL TRADING CORPORATION
Represented By: John M. Remy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]