R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs challenged the FDA's regulation that required cigarette manufacturers to use graphic warnings on its cigarette packing and advertising. Plaintiffs alleged that the rule was an unconstitutional abridgement of the First Amendment to the United States Constitution.

Plaintiff: SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC., R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED and LIGGETT GROUP LLC
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, MARGARET A. HAMBURG and KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Case Number: 1:2011cv01482
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-5063 for 60 Notice of Appeal, filed by KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, MARGARET A. HAMBURG. (jf, )
March 6, 2012 61 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 60 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, )
March 5, 2012 60 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 59 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, 58 Memorandum & Opinion by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Cutini, Drake)
February 29, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER, For the reasons set forth in the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and based on the Court's review of both parties arguments and the agency record, it is this 29th day of February, 2012 hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 10 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 35 is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the FDA is permanently enjoined, until 15 months following the issuance of new regulations implementing Section 20(a) of the Tobacco Control Act that are substantively and procedurally valid and permissible under the United States Constitution and federal law, from enforcing against Plaintiffs in this action the new textual and graphic warnings required by Section 201 (a) of the Tobacco Control act. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/29/2012. (see order) (kc )
February 29, 2012 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/29/2012. (kc )
February 1, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument Hearing held on 2/1/2012. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
January 24, 2012 57 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2011. (Postman, Warren)
January 24, 2012 56 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/19/2011. (Postman, Warren)
January 24, 2012 55 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS served on 8/19/2011 (Postman, Warren)
January 24, 2012 54 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARGARET A. HAMBURG served on 10/25/2011 (Postman, Warren)
January 24, 2012 53 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 10/17/2011 (Postman, Warren)
January 13, 2012 52 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION, ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS. (znmw, )
January 13, 2012 51 AMICUS BRIEF by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION. (znmw, )
January 13, 2012 50 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEGACY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO FREE KIDS, PUBLIC CITIZEN. (znmw, )
January 13, 2012 NOTICE of Oral Argument on 10 35 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument is set for 2/1/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
January 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/13/2012. (lcrjl3)
January 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/13/2012.(lcrjl3)
January 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/13/2012. (lcrjl3)
January 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Expedite REVIEW. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to expedite review is GRANTED but the motion to submit on the briefs is DENIED. Oral argument on the Motion for Summary Judgment is scheduled for 2/1/2012 at 11 AM. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/13/2012. (lcrjl3)
December 16, 2011 49 RESPONSE re 48 MOTION to Expedite filed by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
December 12, 2011 48 MOTION to Expedite by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francisco, Noel)
December 9, 2011 47 REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
December 5, 2011 USCA Case Number 11-5332 for 45 Notice of Appeal, filed by KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, MARGARET A. HAMBURG. (jf, )
November 30, 2011 46 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 45 Notice of Appeal,. (znmw, )
November 29, 2011 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 39 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, 38 Memorandum & Opinion by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
November 22, 2011 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION, ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
November 21, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 41 Memorandum is entered in error (leave of court is required) and counsel is advised to file a second Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. (znmw, )
November 18, 2011 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (See Docket Entry 42 to view document). (znmw, )
November 18, 2011 42 Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.. (Francisco, Noel)
November 18, 2011 41 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC., LIGGETT GROUP LLC, COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY by AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION, ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS. (Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 11/21/2011 (znmw, ).
November 17, 2011 40 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Samp, Richard)
November 8, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Defendants' Motion To Incorporate Summary Judgment Brief Into Opposition To Motion For Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/8/11. (lcrjl2)
November 7, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER, For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Opinion, it is this 7th day of November, 2011 hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that implementation of the graphic image and textual warning requirements published at 76 Fed. Reg. 36,628 (June 22, 2011) and mandated by Section 201(a) of the Tobacco Control Act, and all related requirements, see Act 101(b), 301, 201(a) of the Tobacco Control Act are stayed until 15 months after a final ruling from this Court on the Merits of the parties' claims; and it is further ORDERED that the FDA, as a consequence of this Order, shall be enjoined from enforcing any of the new requirements contained in its Final Rule until 15 months after a final ruling by this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/7/2011. (kc ) (see order)
November 7, 2011 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/7/2011. (kc ) (kc,
October 26, 2011 37 Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Order for Court to Consider Arguments Made in Summary Judgment Memorandum in Deciding Preliminary Injunction filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francisco, Noel)
October 25, 2011 36 MOTION for Order for Court to Consider Arguments Made in Summary Judgment Memorandum in Deciding Preliminary Injunction by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutini, Drake)
October 21, 2011 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified index of administrative record, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
October 21, 2011 34 Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified index of administrative record, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
October 21, 2011 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEGACY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO FREE KIDS, PUBLIC CITIZEN (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Memorandum of Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, Gregory)
September 30, 2011 32 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.. (Francisco, Noel)
September 30, 2011 31 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 18 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Cutini, Drake) Modified to add link on 10/3/2011 (znmw, ).
September 28, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Joint Motion for Order to Establish Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/28/11. (lcrjl2)
September 27, 2011 30 STIPULATION and Order Establishing Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Cutini, Drake) Modified on 9/28/2011 (kc, ).
September 22, 2011 29 AMICUS BRIEF by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION. (znmw, )
September 22, 2011 28 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION, ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS (znmw, )
September 22, 2011 27 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION, ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS. (znmw, )
September 22, 2011 26 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEGACY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO FREE KIDS, PUBLIC CITIZEN. (znmw, )
September 22, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/22/11. (lcrjl2)
September 22, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/22/11. (lcrjl2)
September 22, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/22/11. (lcrjl2)
September 21, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction held on 9/21/2011. re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - The Court Takes Matter Under Advisement. Supplemental Pleadings if any ( ten pages or less) due by 9/30/2011. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
September 16, 2011 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEGACY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO FREE KIDS, PUBLIC CITIZEN (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
September 16, 2011 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Beck on behalf of AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEGACY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO FREE KIDS, PUBLIC CITIZEN (znmw, )
September 16, 2011 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.. (Francisco, Noel)
September 16, 2011 22 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
September 16, 2011 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Samp on behalf of WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION (znmw, )
September 16, 2011 20 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS, AMERICAN ADVERTISING FEDERATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(znmw, )
September 10, 2011 19 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/10/11. (lcrjl2)
September 9, 2011 18 Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from Institute of Medicine Report (2007), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutini, Drake)
August 25, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 14 Defendants' Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/25/11. (lcrjl2)
August 24, 2011 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anne Barald on behalf of LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY (Barald, Patricia) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/25/2011) (znmw, ).
August 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Scheduling Conference held on 8/23/2011. Preliminary Injunction Schedule: Defendants Response due by 9/9/2011. Plaintiffs Replies due by 9/16/2011. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/21/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (kc, )
August 22, 2011 16 Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Order To Establish Briefing Schedule filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francisco, Noel)
August 22, 2011 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Jonathan Perry on behalf of COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED (Perry, Philip)
August 22, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott Danzis, Floyd Abrams, Joel Kurtzberg, and Kayvan Sadeghi. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Scott Danzis, Floyd Abrams, Joel Kurtzberg, and Kayvan Sadeghi be, and hereby are, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/22/11. (lcrjl2)
August 22, 2011 14 MOTION for Order To Establish Briefing Schedule by MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutini, Drake)
August 19, 2011 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Kres Beach on behalf of R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Beach, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2011 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Postman on behalf of R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Postman, Warren)
August 19, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
August 19, 2011 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David D. Depalma, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Klepper, # 3 Declaration of Victor D. Lindsley, III, # 4 Declaration of William Melton, # 5 Declaration of J. Brice O'Brien, # 6 Declaration of Gregory A. Sulin)(Francisco, Noel)
August 19, 2011 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Francisco, Noel). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 8/22/2011 (znmw, ).
August 18, 2011 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Crane-Hirsch on behalf of All Defendants (Crane-Hirsch, Daniel)
August 18, 2011 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drake S. Cutini on behalf of MARGARET HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Cutini, Drake)
August 18, 2011 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott Danzis, :Firm- COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, :Address- 1201 Pennsylvania Avenue NW. Phone No. - (202) 662-5209. Fax No. - (202) 778-5209 Attorney Names- Floyd Abrams, Joel Kurtzberg, Kayvan Sadeghi : Firm- CAHIL GORDON & REINDEL LLP, :Address- Eighty Pine Street, New York, New York 10005 Phone No. (212) 701-3000 by LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Scott Danzis, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Floyd Abrams, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Joel Kurtzberg, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Kayvan Sadeghi, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barald, Patricia)
August 16, 2011 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent REYNOLDS AMERICAN INC., Corporate Parent BROWN & WILLIAMSON HOLDINGS, INC. for SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (rdj)
August 16, 2011 5 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIGGETT GROUP LLC identifying Corporate Parent VECTOR GROUP LTD. for LIGGETT GROUP LLC. (rdj)
August 16, 2011 4 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED identifying Corporate Parent IMPERIAL TOBACCO GROUP PLC for COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED. (rdj)
August 16, 2011 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LORILLARD, INC. for LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY. (rdj)
August 16, 2011 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent REYNOLDS AMERICAN INC., Corporate Parent BROWN & WILLIAMSON HOLDINGS, INC. for R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. (rdj)
August 16, 2011 SUMMONS (5) Issued as to MARGARET HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj)
August 16, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against MARGARET HAMBURG, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616041481) filed by COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED, LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY, LIGGETT GROUP LLC, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA FE NATURAL TOBACCO COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Geoffrey Kres Beach
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Warren Postman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY
Represented By: Warren Postman
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Geoffrey Kres Beach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY
Represented By: Kayvan Sadeghi
Represented By: Joel L. Kurtzberg
Represented By: Scott Darren Danzis
Represented By: Patricia Anne Barald
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH BRANDS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Philip Jonathan Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIGGETT GROUP LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Daniel K Crane-Hirsch
Represented By: Drake S. Cutini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET A. HAMBURG
Represented By: Daniel K Crane-Hirsch
Represented By: Drake S. Cutini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Represented By: Daniel K Crane-Hirsch
Represented By: Drake S. Cutini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]