LU v. LEZELL et al

Plaintiff: YING QING LU
Defendant: MARK LEZELL and ISAM GHOSH
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01815
Filed: October 13, 2011
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 113 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 112 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/27/14. (lcjeb1)
May 29, 2012 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to File its Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/12. (lcjeb4)
January 25, 2013 53 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Lezell's 50 Motion to Dismiss. The claim of Bridges Financial, LLC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the counts of Breach of Contract and Breach of Fiduciary Duty are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and Defendant Lezell shall file an Answer by February 7, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/25/13. (lcjeb4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LU v. LEZELL et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YING QING LU
Represented By: Randy McRae
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LEZELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAM GHOSH
Represented By: Peter L. Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]