STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR.
Movant: JAMES DUBOSE, JUNIOR GLOVER, FAMILY UNIT, INC., BRENDA C. WILLIAMS and AMANDA WOLF
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00203
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
0 Judge: John D. Bates
1 Judge: Brett M. Kavanaugh
2 Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 64 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/26/12. CONCURRING STATEMENT. Signed by District Judge John D. Bates and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/26/12. (lcckk2)
April 25, 2012 63 RESPONSE to April 24, 2012 Order by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA re 61 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bartolomucci, Howard) Modified on 4/26/2012 to edit event used (dr).
April 25, 2012 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Michael Slade on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Slade, Jared)
April 24, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER. By no later than April 25, 2012 at 4:00 PM, South Carolina shall submit a notice detailing its position on the issues outlined in the attached order. The parties shall continue to engage in discovery as expediently as reasonably possible while the Court continues to evaluate South Carolina's request to expedite the proceedings. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/24/12. (lcckk2)
April 24, 2012 60 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Response to Court's April 20, 2012 Inquiries by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Time-Stamped Letter)(Bartolomucci, Howard)
April 24, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance as to Douglas H. Flaum, Michael B. de Leeuw, and Adam M. Harris. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 24, 2012. (SM)
April 24, 2012 NOTICE OF ERROR re 57 Status Report; emailed to cbartolomucci@bancroftpllc.com, cc'd 34 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Entered in error; Incorrect format (letter); Refile in accordance with Local Rules. (znmw, )
April 23, 2012 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Douglas H. Flaum, Michael B. de Leeuw, Adam M. Harris, :Firm- Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, :Address- One New York Plaza, 24th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-859-8259. by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas H. Flaum, # 2 Declaration of Michael B. de Leeuw, # 3 Declaration of Adam M. Harris, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Dale)
April 23, 2012 58 NOTICE Statement of Defendant-Intervenors on the Obstacles Voters Will Encounter Upon Implementation of Act R54 by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, CRAIG DEBOSE, JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., DELORES FREELON, JUNIOR GLOVER, NAOMI GORDON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, EVIN PERCIVAL, JOSEPH RILEY, RAYMOND RUTHERFORD, SOUTH CAROLINA PROGRESSIVE NETWORK, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (McCombs, Theodore)
April 23, 2012 57 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's Questions from April 20, 2012 Conference Call by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Bartolomucci, Howard) Modified on 4/24/2012 (znmw, ).
April 20, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh and Judge John D. Bates: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2012. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (dot )
April 20, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Presently before the Court is Defendant-Intervenors' 56 Motion for Leave to Submit Information on the Impact of Act R54 as to South Carolina Voters Lacking Photo ID. Plaintiff and Defendants do not oppose the motion. Therefore, Defendant-Intervenors' motion is GRANTED. By no later than April 23, 2012 at 2:00 PM, Defendant-Intervenors may file a notice not to exceed five (5) pages addressing the steps that South Carolina voters must take under Act R54 to qualify to vote after the State has implemented the Act pursuant to its terms. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/20/12. (lcckk2)
April 20, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Elise C. Boddie. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 20, 2012. (SM)
April 20, 2012 56 MOTION for Leave to File Information on the Impact of Act R54 as to South Carolina Voters Lacking Photo ID by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, CRAIG DEBOSE, JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., DELORES FREELON, JUNIOR GLOVER, NAOMI GORDON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, EVIN PERCIVAL, JOSEPH RILEY, RAYMOND RUTHERFORD, SOUTH CAROLINA PROGRESSIVE NETWORK, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (McCombs, Theodore)
April 19, 2012 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elise C. Boddie, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600. Phone No. - 212-965-2200. Fax No. - 212-226-7592 by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elise C. Boddie, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Dale)
April 16, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). While the Court is considering the issue of expedition and a schedule for proceeding in this matter, the parties are to forthwith commence discovery. As agreed by the parties in the 49 Joint Status Report, by no later than April 20, 2012, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1). Furthermore, at a minimum, by no later than April 20, 2012, Plaintiff shall produce the relevant databases not in dispute between the parties as identified in the United States' March 28, 2012 and April 9, 2012 Letters, ECF Nos. [49-2, 49-3]. The parties are expected to meet and confer prior to production of the databases to resolve any potential technical issues. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/16/12. (lcckk2)
April 13, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh and District John Bates: Status Conference held on 4/13/2012. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (dot )
April 13, 2012 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Baldwin on behalf of All Defendants (Baldwin, Anna)
April 13, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/13/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, Judge John Bates and Judge Brett Bavanaugh. (dot )
April 12, 2012 53 RESPONSE re 47 Affidavit, 49 Meet and Confer Statement by Defendant-Intervenors, filed by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, CRAIG DEBOSE, JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., DELORES FREELON, JUNIOR GLOVER, NAOMI GORDON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, EVIN PERCIVAL, JOSEPH RILEY, RAYMOND RUTHERFORD, SOUTH CAROLINA PROGRESSIVE NETWORK, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF. (Posner, Mark)
April 12, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan P. Haygood, Natasha Mohan Korgaonkar, and Lea C. Aden. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 12, 2012. (SM)
April 12, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION AND PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND OTHER DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/12/12. (lcckk2)
April 12, 2012 51 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/12/12. (lcckk2)
April 12, 2012 50 RESPONSE re 47 Affidavit, 49 Meet and Confer Statement filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bill Status Info - Act R54, # 2 Exhibit Section 5 Administrative Submission, # 3 Exhibit DOJ More Information Request Letter, # 4 Exhibit DOJ Follow-Up Letter re: More Information Request, # 5 Exhibit Response to More Information Request, # 6 Exhibit Attorney General's Objection Letter, # 7 Exhibit Letter from Marci Andino to C. Havird Jones, # 8 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion of Oct. 28, 2011 in Florida v. US (Case No. 1:11-CV-1428), # 9 Exhibit Declaration of Robert S. Berman)(Heard, Bradley)
April 11, 2012 49 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Bartolomucci, Howard)
April 11, 2012 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Debo P. Adegbile on behalf of KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER (Adegbile, Debo)
April 10, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of Defendant Intervenors' 46 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Participate Telephonically, Defendant Intervenors' motion is GRANTED. The counsel listed on page one of Defendant Intervenors' motion may participate by telephone in the April 13, 2012 status hearing in this matter. Defendant Intervenors shall promptly contact Judge Kollar-Kotelly's Courtroom Deputy Dorothy Patterson at 202-354-3189 in order to coordinate the logistics of counsel's participation. The Court notes that due to limitations with the Courtroom telephone system, Defendant Intervenors will likely need to arrange a conference call that the Court can join. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/10/12. (lcckk2)
April 10, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Presently before the Court is the Family Unit Defendant-Intervenors' 39 Motion to Add Parties. Pursuant to the Court's April 5, 2012 Minute Order, Plaintiff was required to file its response, if any, to the motion by no later than April 9, 2012, otherwise the Court would assume Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. No response was filed. Therefore, the Court assumes Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Accordingly, the Family Unit Defendant-Intervenors' motion is GRANTED. Defendant Intervenors Delores Freelon, Naomi Gordon, Joseph Riley, Raymond Rutherford, and the South Carolina Progressive Network shall review and comply with the requirements of the Court's March 21, 2012 Order. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/10/12. (lcckk2)
April 10, 2012 47 AFFIDAVIT re 12 Order,,, by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Bartolomucci, Howard)
April 10, 2012 46 Unopposed MOTION to participate telephonically in the April 13 scheduling conference by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, CRAIG DEBOSE, JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
April 9, 2012 45 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Heard, Bradley)
April 9, 2012 44 NOTICE of Filing of Certifications of Familiarity with the Local Rules (pro hac docket entries 20, 21, 23, & 24) by CRAIG DEBOSE, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Cert. of Familiarity with Local Rules - Garrard Beeney, # 2 Supplement Cert. of Familiarity with Local Rules - Theodore McCombs, # 3 Supplement Cert. of Familiarity with Local Rules - Dul Sambo, # 4 Supplement Cert. of Familiarity with Local Rules - Sean Camoni)(Posner, Mark)
April 6, 2012 43 NOTICE of Errata (Corrected Answer) by CRAIG DEBOSE, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA re 34 Answer to Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Posner, Mark)
April 6, 2012 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- RYAN P. HAYGOOD, NATASHA M. KORGAONKAR, and LEAH C. ADEN, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600. Phone No. - (212) 965-2200. Fax No. - (212) 226-7592 by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan P. Haygood, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Natasha M. Korgaonkar, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Leah C. Aden, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Dale)
April 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Family Unit Defendant-Intervenors filed a 39 Motion to Add Parties on April 5, 2012. The motion indicates the Defendants and other Defendant-Intervenors do not oppose the motion, and that the Plaintiff did not anticipate opposing the motion, but reserved judgment pending filing of the actual motion. Ordinarily, Plaintiff's opposition to the motion would be due April 23, 2012. In order to allow the Panel sufficient time to consider and resolve the motion before the parties are required to submit a joint status report on April 11, 2012, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to add parties by no later than April 9, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. If no response is filed, the Panel shall assume Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Movants shall file their reply, if any, by no later than April 10, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/5/12. (lcckk2)
April 5, 2012 41 NOTICE of filing certification by Susan K. Dunn of familiarity with local rules by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Certification of familiarity with local rules)(Spitzer, Arthur)
April 5, 2012 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale E. Ho on behalf of KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER (Ho, Dale)
April 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Susan K. Dunn, CONTINGENT upon Attorney Dunn certifying to the Court that she is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 5, 2012. (SM)
April 5, 2012 39 MOTION to add additional parties by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
April 5, 2012 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan K. Dunn, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of South Carolina, :Address- 40 Calhoun Street, Suite 210, Charleston, SC 29401. Phone No. - (843) 720-1425. Fax No. - (843) 720-1428 by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certification, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
April 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: The League of Women Voters and the NACCP answers due by 4/9/2012, (clv, )
April 4, 2012 37 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP (znmw, )
April 4, 2012 36 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, SEQUIOA WALLER.(znmw, )
April 4, 2012 35 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (znmw, )
April 4, 2012 34 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, CRAIG DEBOSE.(znmw, )
April 4, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Garrard R. Beeney, CONTINGENT upon Attorney Beeney certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Sean A. Camoni, CONTINGENT upon Attorney Camoni certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Sambo Dul, CONTINGENT upon Attorney Dul certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; and granting 24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore A. B. McCombs, CONTINGENT upon Attorney McCombs certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 4, 2012. (SM)
April 4, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Keesha Maulana Gaskins; granting 26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Elisabeth Genn; granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mimi Marziani; and granting 28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Weiser. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 4, 2012. (SM)
April 4, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Michael A. Cooper. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 4, 2012. (SM)
April 4, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER. The League of Women Voters' [19, 31] Amended Motion to Intervene as Defendants and the NAACP's 29 Motion to Intervene as Defendants are GRANTED pursuant to Rule 24(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The League of Women Voters, the NAACP, and the Family Unit group (collectively "Defendant-Intervenors") shall confer with each other and Defendants prior to the filing of any motion, responsive filing, brief, or discovery request to determine whether Defendant-Intervenors' positions can be set forth in a consolidated fashion so that duplication of effort and redundant filings are avoided. Separate filings by Defendant-Intervenors shall include certificates of compliance with this requirement and a brief description of the need for separate filings. The League of Women Voters and the NACCP shall file their Answers to the 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by no later than April 9, 2012. Pursuant to the Court's March 21, 2012 Order, only one representative of the Defendant-Intervenors as defined in this Order shall be permitted to speak during the April 13, 2012 scheduling conference. The League of Women Voters, the NAACP, and the Family Unit group shall review and comply with the meet and confer requirements outlined in the Court's March 21, 2012 Order regarding the Joint Status Report due April 11, 2012. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/4/12. (lcckk2)
April 4, 2012 32 RESPONSE re 19 MOTION to Intervene, 29 MOTION to Intervene filed by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Clement, Paul)
April 3, 2012 31 NOTICE Amendment to Motion to Intervene by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA re 19 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Posner, Mark)
April 2, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Kenyda Bailey, Charmaine Beal, Kiaka Davis, Evin Percival, and Sequioa Waller filed a 29 Motion to Intervene as Defendants on March 30, 2012. The motion indicates the Defendant-Intervenors do not oppose the motion, the Defendants do not oppose permissive intervention, and movants were unable to ascertain Plaintiff's position as to the motion. Ordinarily, Plaintiff's opposition to the motion would be due April 16, 2012. In order to allow the Panel sufficient time to consider and resolve the motion before the parties are required to submit a joint status report on April 11, 2012, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to intervene by no later than April 4, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. If no response is filed, the Panel shall assume Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Movants shall file their reply, if any, by no later than April 5, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/2/12. (lcckk2)
April 2, 2012 30 NOTICE of filing certifications of familiarity with local rules by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certification of familiarity by Nancy Abudu, # 2 Certification of familiarity by Katie O'Connor)(Spitzer, Arthur)
March 30, 2012 29 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, KENYDA BAILEY, CHARMAINE BEAL, KIAKA DAVIS, EVIN PERCIVAL, SEQUIOA WALLER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Proposed Answer, # 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
March 27, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Katie O'Connor, CONTINGENT upon Attorney O'Connor certifying to the Court that she is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court; and granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Nancy G. Abudu, CONTINGENT upon Attorney Abudu certifying to the Court that she is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 27, 2012. (SM)
March 27, 2012 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy Robin Weiser, :Firm- Brennan Center for Justice, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12 New York, New York 10013. Phone No. - 646 292-8310. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mimi Murray Digby Marziani, :Firm- Brennan Center for Justice, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12 New York, New York 10013. Phone No. - 646 292-8310. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elisabeth Genn, :Firm- Brennan Center for Justice, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12 New York, New York 10013. Phone No. - 646 292-8310. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Keesha Maulana Gaskins, :Firm- Brennan Center for Justice, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12 New York, New York 10013. Phone No. - 646 292-8310. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Theodore A. B. McCombs, :Firm- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, :Address- 125 Broad Street New York, New York 10004. Phone No. - 212 558-4000. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sambo Dul, :Firm- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, :Address- 125 Board Street New York, New York 10004. Phone No. - 212 558-4000. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael A. Cooper, :Firm- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, :Address- 125 Broad Street New York, New York 10004. Phone No. - 212 558-4000. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean August Camoni, :Firm- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, :Address- 125 Broad Street New York, New York 10004. Phone No. - 212 558-4000. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Garrard R. Beeney, :Firm- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, :Address- 125 Board Street New York, New York 10004. Phone No. - 212 558-4000. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The League of Women Voters of South Carolina filed a 19 Motion to Intervene as Defendant on March 26, 2012. The motion indicates the Defendant-Intervenors do not oppose the motion, the Defendants do not oppose permissive intervention, and movant was unable to ascertain Plaintiff's position as to the motion. Ordinarily, Plaintiff's opposition to the motion would be due April 12, 2012. In order to allow the Panel sufficient time to consider and resolve the motion before the parties are required to submit a joint status report on April 11, 2012, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to intervene by no later than April 4, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. If no response is filed, the Panel shall assume Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Movant shall file its reply, if any, by no later than April 5, 2012 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/27/12. (lcckk2)
March 26, 2012 19 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Answer, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
March 22, 2012 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy G. Abudu, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc., :Address- 230 Peachtree Street NW, Suite 1440, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - (404)523-2721. Fax No. - (404) 653-0331 by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
March 22, 2012 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katie O'Connor, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc., :Address- 230 Peachtree Street NW, Suite 1440, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - (404)523-2721. Fax No. - (404) 653-0331 by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
March 22, 2012 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Christopher Bartolomucci on behalf of STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Bartolomucci, Howard)
March 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/11/2012. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot )
March 21, 2012 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley E. Heard on behalf of All Defendants (Heard, Bradley)
March 21, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER. A scheduling conference shall be held on April 13, 2012, at 3:00 P.M. before the Panel in Courtroom 28A of the Courthouse for the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall promptly meet and confer, and by no later than April 11, 2012 at 4:00 P.M., file a Joint Status Report briefly addressing the issues outlined herein. South Carolina shall, by no later than April 10, 2012, file an affidavit identifying the latest date on which the photo identification law must become effective if it is to apply to elections in November 2012 and providing a detailed explanation therefor. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/21/12. (lcckk2)
March 20, 2012 14 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FAMILY UNIT, INC. (znmw, )
March 20, 2012 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by JAMES DUBOSE, FAMILY UNIT, INC., JUNIOR GLOVER, BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF.(znmw, )
March 20, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Establishing Procedures for Filing for 3-Judge Panel Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on March 20, 2012. (SM)
March 20, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER. Putative Intervenors' 7 Motion to Intervene as Defendants is GRANTED pursuant to Rule 24(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant-Intervenors shall confer with Defendants prior to the filing of any motion, responsive filing, brief, or discovery request to determine whether Defendant-Intervenors' positions can be set forth in a consolidated fashion so that duplication of effort and redundant filings are avoided. Separate filings by Defendant-Intervenors shall include certificates of compliance with this requirement and a brief description of the need for separate filings. Defendant-Intervenors shall file their Answer(s) to the 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by no later than April 9, 2012. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge John D. Bates, and District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/12. (lcckk2)
March 9, 2012 9 RESPONSE re 7 MOTION to Intervene filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Meza, Catherine)
March 9, 2012 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Meza on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Meza, Catherine)
February 24, 2012 7 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by JAMES DUBOSE, JUNIOR GLOVER, FAMILY UNIT, INC., BRENDA C. WILLIAMS, AMANDA WOLF (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Proposed Answer, # 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
February 16, 2012 6 USCA ORDER filed in US Court of Appeals on 02/16/2012 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT: designating Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh and District Judge John D. Bates to hear and determine this case with District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (ds)
February 15, 2012 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 US Mail Return Receipt Proof)(Clement, Paul)
February 13, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Convene Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/13/12. (lcckk2)
February 8, 2012 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/8/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2012. (Clement, Paul)
February 8, 2012 2 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (dr)
February 8, 2012 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (U.S. Attorney General), and U.S. Attorney(dr)
February 8, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616045870) filed by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Paul Clement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR.
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JAMES DUBOSE
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JUNIOR GLOVER
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: FAMILY UNIT, INC.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: BRENDA C. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: AMANDA WOLF
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]