ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION Featured Case

Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00206
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 13 Notice of Appeal, filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER ; USCA Case Number 12-5054. ORDERED that the motion for summary reversal be denied and the motion for summary affirmance be granted. (kb)
February 24, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-5054 for 13 Notice of Appeal, filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (jf, )
February 24, 2012 14 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 13 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, )
February 24, 2012 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 12 Memorandum & Opinion, 11 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616046259. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf, )
February 24, 2012 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/2012. (lcabj2)
February 24, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO; denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/2012. (lcabj2)
February 21, 2012 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Rotenberg, Marc)
February 21, 2012 9 Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Rotenberg, Marc)
February 17, 2012 8 Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Cutini, Drake)
February 17, 2012 7 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutini, Drake)
February 10, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER The parties are advised that defendant may choose to designate its opposition to the motion for TRO/PI due on February 17 as a motion to dismiss the complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) on the grounds that (1) the challenged agency action is non-reviewable because it is committed to its discretion and (2) no final agency action has occurred. Plaintiff's reply to the combined motion and opposition to the motion for TRO/PI would then serve as its opposition to the motion to dismiss on those grounds, and the page limitations applicable to oppositions, rather than those that govern replies, would apply. The filing of a dual pleading will not limit or prejudice defendant in filing a broader responsive pleading under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 on those and other grounds at the time specified under the Rules if such a motion is appropriate after the Court's ruling. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to inform the Court promptly if either becomes aware of any decision by Google to delay implementation of the new policy. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/10/2012. (lcabj2)
February 9, 2012 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Drake S. Cutini on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cutini, Drake)
February 9, 2012 5 NOTICE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER re 1 Complaint (jf, )
February 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2012. Defendant's response is due by 2/17/2012. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/21/2012. (Court Reporter Pat Kaneshiro-Miller) (jth)
February 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/9/2012 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
February 9, 2012 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc)
February 8, 2012 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (jf, )
February 8, 2012 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 65.1 Statement, # 11 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction, # 12 Text of Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
February 8, 2012 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
February 8, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616045876) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Drake S. Cutini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: John Arthur Verdi
Represented By: Marc Rotenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]